EP1586587 - Compositions and methods for detecting angiogenesis [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.12.2006 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.08.2008 | Change - representative | published on 24.09.2008 [2008/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Exonhit Therapeutics SA 26, rue Brunel 75017 Paris / FR | [2005/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kearsey, Jonathan Résidence Orée de Senart, Bâtiment du Bellay 1 91210 Draveil / FR | [2005/42] | Representative(s) | Becker, Philippe, et al Cabinet Becker & Associés 25 Rue Louis Le Grand 75002 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/39] | Becker, Philippe, et al Cabinet Becker & Associés 25, rue Louis Le Grand 75002 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2005/42] | Becker, Philippe, et al Cabinet BECKER & ASSOCIES 25, rue Louis Le Grand 75002 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 04291020.8 | 16.04.2004 | [2005/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1586587 | Date: | 19.10.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.01.2005 | Classification | IPC: | C07K14/81, C07K16/38, C12Q1/68, G01N33/574, G01N33/68 | [2005/42] | CPC: |
C07K14/8114 (EP);
C12Q1/6886 (EP);
G01N33/574 (EP);
G01N33/68 (EP);
C12Q2600/112 (EP);
C12Q2600/136 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | [2006/26] |
Former [2005/42] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Zusammensetzungen und Verfahren zum Nachweis der Angiogenese | [2005/42] | English: | Compositions and methods for detecting angiogenesis | [2005/42] | French: | Préparations et méthodes pour détecter l'angiogenèse | [2005/42] | Examination procedure | 20.04.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/05] | 18.08.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2007/05] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 29.05.2006 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 29.05.2006 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 29.05.2006 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 29.05.2006 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 29.05.2006 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 29.05.2006 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 29.05.2006 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 29.05.2006 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 29.05.2006 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 29.05.2006 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 29.05.2006 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 29.05.2006 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 29.05.2006 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 29.05.2006 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 29.05.2006 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 29.05.2006 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 29.05.2006 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 29.05.2006 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 29.05.2006 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 29.05.2006 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 29.05.2006 | PL   M01   Not yet paid | 29.05.2006 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 29.05.2006 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 29.05.2006 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 29.05.2006 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 29.05.2006 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 29.05.2006 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 29.05.2006 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2006 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]WO9946403 (EXONHIT THERAPEUTICS SA [FR], et al) [AD] 1-22 * the whole document *; | [XY]WO03046180 (GENSET SA [FR], et al) [X] 1-5,7-18,21,22 * page 127 - page 130, paragraph 2 * * page 132 - page 133 * * SEQ ID NO:27 (DNA) and SEQ ID NO:28 (protein) : HAI-2 with exon 2 deleted * [Y] 6; | [Y]US6583108 (TAMBURINI PAUL P [US], et al) [Y] 6 * abstract * * column 15, line 22 - line 33 * * column 16, line 18 - line 46 * * column 18, line 41 - column 19, line 3 *; | [X]EP1374891 (BAYER AG [DE]) [X] 1-5 * paragraph [0053] *; | [XY]WO2004023973 (INCYTE CORP [US], et al) [X] 1-5,7-16,21,22 * claims 1,4-6,13,14,27,28 * * page 74, line 16 - line 32 * * page 105 - page 112, line 25 * * page 143, line 8 - line 11 * * page 149, line 18 - page 150, line 16 * * page 154, line 24 - page 156, line 16 * * tables 1-4 * * SEQ ID NO: 2118 (DNA) and SEQ ID NO: 4840 (protein) : HAI-2 with exon 3 deleted * [Y] 6; | [X] - ITOH H. ET AL., "Hepatocyte growth factor activator inhibitor type 2 lacking the first Kunitz-type serine proteinase inhibitor domain is a predominant product in mouse but not in human.", BIOCHEM. BIOPHYS. RES. COMM., (1999), vol. 255, pages 740 - 748, XP002311333 [X] 12-16 * abstract * * page 744 * * page 745, column 1 * * figures 1-5 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/bbrc.1999.0268 | [AD] - KAWAGUCHI T. ET AL., "Purification and cloning of hepatocyte growth factor activator inhibitor type 2, a Kunitz-type serine protease inhibitor.", J. BIOL. CHEM., (19971031), vol. 272, no. 44, pages 27558 - 27564, XP002311334 [AD] 1-22 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.272.44.27558 | [A] - MARLOR C.W. ET AL., "identification and cloning of human placental bikunin, a novel serine protease inhibitor containing two Kunitz domains.", J. BIOL. CHEM., (19970502), vol. 272, no. 18, pages 12202 - 12208, XP001149667 [A] 1-22 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.272.18.12202 | [A] - BRACCO L. ET AL., "The relevance of alternative RNA splicing to pharmacogenomics.", TRENDS BIOTECHNOL., (200308), vol. 21, no. 8, pages 346 - 353, XP004442025 [A] 1-22 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0167-7799(03)00146-X |