EP1484704 - Method for helping oilfield management decision making in the presence of technically and economically uncertain parameters [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 07.04.2017 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.04.2017 | Refusal of application | published on 10.05.2017 [2017/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Institut Français du Pétrole 1 & 4 avenue de Bois Préau 92852 Rueil-Malmaison Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2004/50] | For all designated states Institut Français du Pétrole 1 & 4 avenue du Bois Préau 92852 Rueil-Malmaison Cedex / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Feraille, Mathieu 6, Place du Maréchal Foch 92000 Nanterre / FR | 02 /
Manceau, Emmanuel 91, rue des Rosiers 92500 Rueil Malmaison / FR | 03 /
Zabalza-Mezghani, Isabelle 23-25, rue du Gué 92500 Rueil Malmaison / FR | [2004/51] |
Former [2004/50] | 01 /
Feraille, Mathieu 6, Place du Maréchal Foch 92000 Nanterre / FR | ||
02 /
Manceau, Emmanuel 14 rue d'Estienne d'Orves 92500 Rueil-Malmaison / FR | |||
03 /
Zabalza-Mezghani, Isabelle 23-25, rue du Gué 92500 Rueil Malmaison / FR | Application number, filing date | 04291263.4 | 17.05.2004 | [2004/50] | Priority number, date | FR20030006636 | 02.06.2003 Original published format: FR 0306636 | [2004/50] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1484704 | Date: | 08.12.2004 | Language: | FR | [2004/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.10.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/60 | [2004/50] | CPC: |
G06Q10/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/50] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Entscheidungshilfe für die Verwaltung von Erdölvorkommen bei Vorliegen unsicherer technischer und ökonomischer Parameter | [2004/50] | English: | Method for helping oilfield management decision making in the presence of technically and economically uncertain parameters | [2004/50] | French: | Méthode d'aide à la prise de décision pour la gestion d'un gisement pétrolier en présence de paramètres techniques et économiques incertains | [2004/50] | Examination procedure | 08.06.2005 | Examination requested [2005/32] | 15.03.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.09.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.11.2016 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2017/19] | 18.11.2016 | Date of oral proceedings | 19.12.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2017/19] | 19.12.2016 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.03.2006 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 02.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 01.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 31.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5444619 (HOSKINS JOSIAH C [US], et al) [A] 1-13* abstract *; | [X]EP0881357 (HALLIBURTON ENERGY SERV INC [US]) [X] 1-13 * abstract * * page 2, line 3 - line 4 * * page 3, line 20 - line 33 *; | [X]US5992519 (RAMAKRISHNAN TERIZHANDUR S [US], et al) [X] 1-13 * abstract * * column 1, line 7 - line 12 * * column 2, line 1 - line 50 * * column 3, line 9 - line 67 * * figure 1 *; | [X] - PALLISTER I & PONTING D, "Asset Optimization Using Multiple Realizations and Streamline Simulation", SPE, XX, XX, (20000425), no. 59460, XP002261290 [X] 1-13 * the whole document * |