EP1566981 - Method of facilitating downloading, storing and forwarding of ring tones and other services in a mobile terminal [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.05.2008 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.05.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.06.2008 [2008/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Axalto S.A. 50, avenue Jean Jaurès 92120 Montrouge / FR | [2005/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sharma, Vineet, c/o Axalto SA Intellectual Property Dept. 50, avenue Jean-Jaurès 92120 Montrouge / FR | [2005/34] | Representative(s) | Cour, Pierre, et al Gemalto SA Intellectual Property Department 6, rue de la Verrerie 92197 Meudon Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2006/23] | Cour, Pierre, et al Axalto SA IP & Licensing Department 6, rue de la Verrerie 92197 Meudon Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 04291406.9 | 04.06.2004 | [2005/34] | Priority number, date | EP20040290448 | 19.02.2004 Original published format: EP 04290448 | [2005/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1566981 | Date: | 24.08.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.06.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q7/32 | [2005/34] | CPC: |
H04M19/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/34] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Ermöglichung des Herunterladens, zum Speichern und Übertragen von Ruftönen und für andere Dienste in einem mobilen Endgerät | [2005/34] | English: | Method of facilitating downloading, storing and forwarding of ring tones and other services in a mobile terminal | [2005/34] | French: | Procédé pour faciliter le téléchargement, le stockage et l'envoi de tonalités d'appel et d'autres services dans un terminal mobile | [2005/34] | Examination procedure | 24.02.2006 | Examination requested [2006/16] | 03.01.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/26] | 11.02.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2008/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2007 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP1233635 (MICROSOFT CORP [US]) [Y] 5,7,8,13 * paragraphs [0002] - [0004] * * paragraphs [0005] , [0006] , [0009] * * paragraphs [0017] , [0019] , [0020] * * paragraphs [0022] - [0026] ** column 7, lines 10-24 *; | [XY]US2003219110 (TSAI SHIH-KUANG [TW], et al) [X] 1-4,6,9-12 * paragraphs [0002] , [0006] , [0009] * * paragraphs [0013] - [0015] * * paragraphs [0023] , [0028] , [0029] * * paragraphs [0032] , [0033] * [Y] 5,7,8,13 |