EP1491335 - Printing machine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.06.2010 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.06.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.07.2010 [2010/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MACHINES DUBUIT 10/12, rue du Ballon ZI des Richardets 93160 Noisy le Grand / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2005/01] | For all designated states MACHINES DUBUIT 10/12, rue du Ballon, ZI des Richardets 93160 Noisy le Grand / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dumenil, François 18 Villa Alexandre 77390 Chaumes en Brie / FR | [2005/01] | Representative(s) | Habasque, Etienne J. Jean-François, et al Cabinet Lavoix 2, Place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2005/01] | Habasque, Etienne Joel Jean-François, et al Cabinet Lavoix 2, Place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cédex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 04291534.8 | 17.06.2004 | [2005/01] | Priority number, date | FR20030007583 | 23.06.2003 Original published format: FR 0307583 | [2005/01] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1491335 | Date: | 29.12.2004 | Language: | FR | [2004/53] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.08.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B41F15/08 | [2005/01] | CPC: |
B41F15/0872 (EP,US);
B41F15/0863 (EP,US);
B41J3/40733 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, IT [2005/38] |
Former [2005/01] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Druckmaschine | [2005/01] | English: | Printing machine | [2005/01] | French: | Machine d'impression d'objets | [2005/01] | Examination procedure | 21.01.2005 | Examination requested [2005/12] | 30.06.2005 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 24.10.2005 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GR, HU, IE, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 14.09.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.01.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/29] | 02.03.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2010/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 05.08.2005 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 05.08.2005 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 05.08.2005 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 05.08.2005 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 05.08.2005 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 05.08.2005 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 05.08.2005 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 05.08.2005 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 05.08.2005 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 05.08.2005 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 05.08.2005 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 05.08.2005 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 05.08.2005 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 05.08.2005 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 05.08.2005 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 05.08.2005 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 05.08.2005 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 05.08.2005 | PL   M01   Not yet paid | 05.08.2005 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 05.08.2005 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 05.08.2005 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 05.08.2005 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 05.08.2005 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 05.08.2005 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2553085 (GROCE GEORGE R) [A] 1-22 * column W *; | [A]US5711216 (TIEMANN GERHARD [DE], et al) [A] 1-22* column W *; | [A]US5996486 (KARLYN WILLIAM M [US], et al) [A] 1-22 * column W * | by applicant | FR2782292 |