EP1503192 - Spectrophotometer comprising an interferometer and a dispersive system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.03.2014 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.03.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.04.2014 [2014/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ASTRIUM SAS 12 rue Pasteur 92150 Suresnes / FR | [2013/23] |
Former [2005/46] | For all designated states EADS ASTRIUM SAS 31, rue des Cosmonautes 31402 Toulouse Cedex 4 / FR | ||
Former [2005/05] | For all designated states EADS ASTRIUM SAS 37, avenue Louis Bréguet 78140 Velizy-Villacoublay / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pasternak, Frédérick En Bladet 31590 Gaure / FR | [2005/05] | Representative(s) | Plasseraud IP 66, rue de la Chaussée d'Antin 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2012/36] | Cabinet Plasseraud 52, rue de la Victoire 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | ||
Former [2005/05] | Bérogin, Francis Cabinet Plasseraud 65/67 rue de la Victoire 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 04291708.8 | 06.07.2004 | [2005/05] | Priority number, date | FR20030009443 | 31.07.2003 Original published format: FR 0309443 | [2005/05] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1503192 | Date: | 02.02.2005 | Language: | FR | [2005/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1503192 | Date: | 01.05.2013 | Language: | FR | [2013/18] | Type: | B8 Corrected title page of specification | No.: | EP1503192 | Date: | 03.07.2013 | [2013/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.09.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G01J3/453 | [2005/05] | CPC: |
G01J3/12 (EP);
G01J3/4532 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, IT, NL [2005/42] |
Former [2005/05] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Spektrophotometer mit einem Interferometer und einem dispersiven System | [2005/05] | English: | Spectrophotometer comprising an interferometer and a dispersive system | [2005/05] | French: | Spectrophotomètre comprenant un interferomètre et un système dispersif | [2005/05] | Examination procedure | 03.06.2005 | Examination requested [2005/31] | 05.07.2005 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 15.07.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.09.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.11.2005 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GR, HU, IE, LU, MC, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 20.06.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.10.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.01.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.05.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 13.05.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.10.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.01.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.07.2005 | Opposition(s) | 04.02.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 08.09.2005 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 08.09.2005 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 08.09.2005 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 08.09.2005 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 08.09.2005 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 08.09.2005 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 08.09.2005 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 08.09.2005 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 08.09.2005 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 08.09.2005 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 08.09.2005 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 08.09.2005 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 08.09.2005 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 08.09.2005 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 08.09.2005 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 08.09.2005 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 08.09.2005 | PL   M01   Not yet paid | 08.09.2005 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 08.09.2005 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 08.09.2005 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 08.09.2005 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 08.09.2005 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 08.09.2005 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4538910 (DOYLE WALTER M [US]) [A] 1-12 * abstract * * column 2, line 40 - column 5, line 36 *; | [A]US4681445 (PERKINS CHARLES V [GB]) [A] 7-12 * abstract ** column 4, line 29 - column 6, line 45 *; | [XA]US6351307 (ERSKINE DAVID J [US]) [X] 1-6 * abstract * * column 7, line 51 - column 9, line 56 * [A] 7-12 |