EP1615352 - Estimation of transmission power without macrodiversity in a CDMA network [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.03.2007 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 06.08.2008 [2008/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FRANCE TELECOM 6 Place d'Alleray 75015 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2006/02] | For all designated states FRANCE TELECOM 6 Place d'Alleray 75015 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Vignault, Emmanuelle 60 boulevard Galliéni 92130 Issy les Moulineaux / FR | 02 /
Lugara, Delphine 9 rue Boulitte 75014 Paris / FR | [2006/02] | Representative(s) | Gevers & Orès Immeuble le Palatin 2 3 Cours du Triangle CS 80165 92939 Paris La Défense Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/32] | Cabinet Martinet & Lapoux BP 405 78055 Saint Quentin Yvelines Cédex / FR | ||
Former [2006/02] | Cabinet Martinet & Lapoux 43, boulevard Vauban, B.P. 405 Guyancourt 78055 St. Quentin Yvelines Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 04291716.1 | 07.07.2004 | [2006/02] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1615352 | Date: | 11.01.2006 | Language: | FR | [2006/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.11.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H04B7/005 | [2006/02] | CPC: |
H04W52/34 (EP);
H04W52/40 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | [2006/37] |
Former [2006/02] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Schätzung von Sendeleistung ohne Makrodiversität in einem CDMA-Netwerk | [2006/02] | English: | Estimation of transmission power without macrodiversity in a CDMA network | [2006/02] | French: | Estimation de puissance d'émission sans macrodiversité dans un réseau CDMA | [2006/02] | Examination procedure | 12.01.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/14] | 07.11.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2007/14] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 18.08.2006 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 18.08.2006 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 18.08.2006 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 18.08.2006 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 18.08.2006 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 18.08.2006 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 18.08.2006 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 18.08.2006 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 18.08.2006 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 18.08.2006 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 18.08.2006 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 18.08.2006 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 18.08.2006 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 18.08.2006 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 18.08.2006 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 18.08.2006 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 18.08.2006 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 18.08.2006 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 18.08.2006 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 18.08.2006 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 18.08.2006 | PL   M01   Not yet paid | 18.08.2006 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 18.08.2006 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 18.08.2006 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 18.08.2006 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 18.08.2006 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 18.08.2006 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 18.08.2006 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2006 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US6553016 (ROXBERGH JAN [SE]) [A] 1,5,8 * column 4, line 62 - column 5, line 43 *; | [A] - WANG L-C ET AL, "PERFORMANCE COMPARISONS OF POWER ALLOCATION MECHANISMS FOR DOWNLINK HANDOFF IN THE WCDMA SYSTEM WITH MICROCELLULAR ENVIRONMENTS", PROCEEDINGS 6TH. ACM INTERNATIONAL WORKSHOP ON MODELING, ANALYSIS AND SIMULATION OF WIRELESS AND MOBILE SYSTEMS. ACM MSWIM 2003. SAN DIEGO, CA, SEPT. 19, 2003, ACM INTERNATIONAL WORKSHOP ON MODELING, ANALYSIS AND SIMULATION OF WIRELESS AND MOBILE SYS, (20030919), ISBN 1-58113-766-4, pages 2 - 10, XP001186200 [A] 1,5,8 * paragraphs [03.4] , [0005]; figure 4 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/940991.940994 | [DA] - Y. CHEN ET AL., "Downlink performance of different soft handover algorithms in 3G multi-service environments", MOBILE AND WIRELESS COMMUNICATION NETWORK, 4TH INT'L WORKSHOP, (20021109), pages 406 - 410, XP002305314 [DA] 1,5,8 * paragraphs [0003] , [04.4] * |