EP1615340 - Method for realising an electronic circuit having a desired filter transfer function and electronic circuit architecture for realising such a filter transfer function [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 15.12.2006 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.12.2006 | Withdrawal of application | published on 17.01.2007 [2007/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALCATEL 54, rue la Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | [2006/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Moons, Elve Desiderius Jozef Krekelstraat 10 3560 Lummen / BE | 02 /
Redoute, Jean-Michel Vladimir Roest d'Alkemadelaan 2 Bus K1 2600 Berchem / BE | [2006/02] | Representative(s) | Narmon, Gisèle Marie Thérèse, et al Alcatel-Lucent Bell N.V. Intellectual Property Department Copernicuslaan 50 2018 Antwerpen / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/02] | Narmon, Gisèle Marie Thérèse, et al Alcatel Bell N.V., Francis Wellesplein 1 2018 Antwerpen / BE | Application number, filing date | 04291764.1 | 09.07.2004 | [2006/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1615340 | Date: | 11.01.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.01.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H03H11/04 | [2006/02] | CPC: |
H03H11/04 (EP,US);
H03H11/36 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/02] | Title | German: | Methode zur Erstellung eines elektronischen Schaltkreises mit einer erwünschten Filtertransferfunktion sowie Struktur zur Realisierung derselben | [2006/02] | English: | Method for realising an electronic circuit having a desired filter transfer function and electronic circuit architecture for realising such a filter transfer function | [2006/02] | French: | Procédé de réalisation d'un circuit électronique avec fonction de transfer desirée et arrangement obtenu selon ce procédé | [2006/02] | Examination procedure | 11.07.2006 | Examination requested [2006/34] | 16.08.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.12.2006 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2007/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0377300 (RAYTHEON CO [US]) [X] 1-10,12,13 * figure 4 *; | [A]US5001441 (GEN-KUONG FERNANDO [US]) [A] 1-13* the whole document *; | [X]WO0110023 (ROXBURGH ELECTRONICS LTD [GB], et al) [X] 1,13 * figure 1 *; | [X]EP1401095 (CIT ALCATEL [FR]) [X] 1,13 * figures 1,2 *; | [X]US6748076 (ELO HARRI [FI]) [X] 1-13 * the whole document *; | [A] - WALTER E. HEINLEIN AND W. HARVEY HOLMES, Active filters for integrated circuits, R. OLDENBOURG, (1974), ISBN 3486344617, XP002311632 [A] 1-13 * page 108 - page 127 * |