EP1503220 - Position determination of mobile terminals by means of assistance data transmitted on request [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.12.2007 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.09.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, TR | published on 28.10.2009 [2009/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Alcatel Lucent 54, rue la Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2007/14] | For all designated states Alcatel Lucent 54 rue La Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2005/05] | For all designated states ALCATEL 54, rue la Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Monnerat, Michel 11 rue St Aubin 31000 Toulouse / FR | 02 /
Masson, Arnaud 25 Avenue Pierre Mendes France 31170 Tournefeuille / FR | 03 /
Lobert, Bruno 6 rue Henri Russel 31320 Pechabou / FR | [2005/06] |
Former [2005/05] | 01 /
Monnerat, Michel 11 rue St Aubin 31000 Toulouse / FR | ||
02 /
Masson, Arnaud 25 Avenue Pierre Mendes France 31170 Tournefeuille / FR | |||
03 /
Lobert, Bruno 15 rue Saint Antoine 31320 Castanet / FR | Representative(s) | Hedarchet, Stéphane, et al Alcatel Lucent Intellectual Property & Standards 54 Rue La Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2005/05] | Hedarchet, Stéphane, et al COMPAGNIE FINANCIERE ALCATEL Département Propriété Industrielle 54, rue La Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 04291781.5 | 12.07.2004 | [2005/05] | Priority number, date | FR20030009509 | 01.08.2003 Original published format: FR 0309509 | FR20040050480 | 10.03.2004 Original published format: FR 0450480 | [2005/05] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1503220 | Date: | 02.02.2005 | Language: | FR | [2005/05] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1503220 | Date: | 09.02.2005 | [2005/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1503220 | Date: | 14.02.2007 | Language: | FR | [2007/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.12.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G01S5/14 | [2005/05] | CPC: |
G01S19/258 (EP,US);
G01S19/072 (EP,US);
G01S19/23 (US);
G01S19/235 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/05] | Title | German: | Positionsbestimmung einer Mobilendgerät mittels auf Anfrage gesendeten Hilfsdaten | [2005/05] | English: | Position determination of mobile terminals by means of assistance data transmitted on request | [2005/05] | French: | Détermination de positions de terminaux mobiles à l'aide de données d'assistance transmises sur requète | [2005/05] | Examination procedure | 09.08.2005 | Examination requested [2005/40] | 02.09.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.04.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 18.05.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.08.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.12.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 27.12.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP06118126.9 / EP1724607 | EP06118130.1 / EP1724608 | Opposition(s) | 15.11.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/04] | Request for further processing for: | 18.05.2006 | Request for further processing filed | 18.05.2006 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 06.06.2006 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 14.02.2007 | CY | 14.02.2007 | CZ | 14.02.2007 | DK | 14.02.2007 | EE | 14.02.2007 | FI | 14.02.2007 | IE | 14.02.2007 | NL | 14.02.2007 | PL | 14.02.2007 | RO | 14.02.2007 | SI | 14.02.2007 | SK | 14.02.2007 | TR | 14.02.2007 | SE | 14.05.2007 | BG | 15.05.2007 | GR | 15.05.2007 | LU | 12.07.2007 | PT | 16.07.2007 | BE | 31.07.2007 | MC | 31.07.2007 | HU | 15.08.2007 | [2009/44] |
Former [2009/40] | AT | 14.02.2007 | |
CY | 14.02.2007 | ||
CZ | 14.02.2007 | ||
DK | 14.02.2007 | ||
EE | 14.02.2007 | ||
FI | 14.02.2007 | ||
IE | 14.02.2007 | ||
NL | 14.02.2007 | ||
PL | 14.02.2007 | ||
RO | 14.02.2007 | ||
SI | 14.02.2007 | ||
SK | 14.02.2007 | ||
SE | 14.05.2007 | ||
BG | 15.05.2007 | ||
GR | 15.05.2007 | ||
LU | 12.07.2007 | ||
PT | 16.07.2007 | ||
BE | 31.07.2007 | ||
MC | 31.07.2007 | ||
Former [2009/35] | AT | 14.02.2007 | |
CY | 14.02.2007 | ||
CZ | 14.02.2007 | ||
DK | 14.02.2007 | ||
EE | 14.02.2007 | ||
FI | 14.02.2007 | ||
IE | 14.02.2007 | ||
NL | 14.02.2007 | ||
PL | 14.02.2007 | ||
RO | 14.02.2007 | ||
SI | 14.02.2007 | ||
SK | 14.02.2007 | ||
SE | 14.05.2007 | ||
BG | 15.05.2007 | ||
GR | 15.05.2007 | ||
PT | 16.07.2007 | ||
BE | 31.07.2007 | ||
MC | 31.07.2007 | ||
Former [2009/11] | AT | 14.02.2007 | |
CZ | 14.02.2007 | ||
DK | 14.02.2007 | ||
EE | 14.02.2007 | ||
FI | 14.02.2007 | ||
IE | 14.02.2007 | ||
NL | 14.02.2007 | ||
PL | 14.02.2007 | ||
RO | 14.02.2007 | ||
SI | 14.02.2007 | ||
SK | 14.02.2007 | ||
SE | 14.05.2007 | ||
BG | 15.05.2007 | ||
GR | 15.05.2007 | ||
PT | 16.07.2007 | ||
BE | 31.07.2007 | ||
MC | 31.07.2007 | ||
Former [2008/40] | AT | 14.02.2007 | |
CZ | 14.02.2007 | ||
DK | 14.02.2007 | ||
FI | 14.02.2007 | ||
IE | 14.02.2007 | ||
NL | 14.02.2007 | ||
PL | 14.02.2007 | ||
RO | 14.02.2007 | ||
SI | 14.02.2007 | ||
SK | 14.02.2007 | ||
SE | 14.05.2007 | ||
BG | 15.05.2007 | ||
GR | 15.05.2007 | ||
PT | 16.07.2007 | ||
BE | 31.07.2007 | ||
MC | 31.07.2007 | ||
Former [2008/22] | AT | 14.02.2007 | |
CZ | 14.02.2007 | ||
DK | 14.02.2007 | ||
FI | 14.02.2007 | ||
IE | 14.02.2007 | ||
NL | 14.02.2007 | ||
PL | 14.02.2007 | ||
RO | 14.02.2007 | ||
SI | 14.02.2007 | ||
SK | 14.02.2007 | ||
SE | 14.05.2007 | ||
BG | 15.05.2007 | ||
GR | 15.05.2007 | ||
PT | 16.07.2007 | ||
MC | 31.07.2007 | ||
Former [2008/04] | AT | 14.02.2007 | |
CZ | 14.02.2007 | ||
DK | 14.02.2007 | ||
FI | 14.02.2007 | ||
IE | 14.02.2007 | ||
NL | 14.02.2007 | ||
PL | 14.02.2007 | ||
RO | 14.02.2007 | ||
SI | 14.02.2007 | ||
SK | 14.02.2007 | ||
SE | 14.05.2007 | ||
BG | 15.05.2007 | ||
PT | 16.07.2007 | ||
Former [2008/02] | AT | 14.02.2007 | |
CZ | 14.02.2007 | ||
DK | 14.02.2007 | ||
FI | 14.02.2007 | ||
IE | 14.02.2007 | ||
NL | 14.02.2007 | ||
PL | 14.02.2007 | ||
SI | 14.02.2007 | ||
SK | 14.02.2007 | ||
SE | 14.05.2007 | ||
BG | 15.05.2007 | ||
PT | 16.07.2007 | ||
Former [2007/51] | AT | 14.02.2007 | |
DK | 14.02.2007 | ||
FI | 14.02.2007 | ||
IE | 14.02.2007 | ||
NL | 14.02.2007 | ||
PL | 14.02.2007 | ||
SI | 14.02.2007 | ||
SK | 14.02.2007 | ||
SE | 14.05.2007 | ||
BG | 15.05.2007 | ||
PT | 16.07.2007 | ||
Former [2007/49] | AT | 14.02.2007 | |
DK | 14.02.2007 | ||
FI | 14.02.2007 | ||
IE | 14.02.2007 | ||
NL | 14.02.2007 | ||
PL | 14.02.2007 | ||
SI | 14.02.2007 | ||
SE | 14.05.2007 | ||
BG | 15.05.2007 | ||
PT | 16.07.2007 | ||
Former [2007/47] | AT | 14.02.2007 | |
DK | 14.02.2007 | ||
FI | 14.02.2007 | ||
NL | 14.02.2007 | ||
PL | 14.02.2007 | ||
SI | 14.02.2007 | ||
SE | 14.05.2007 | ||
BG | 15.05.2007 | ||
Former [2007/43] | FI | 14.02.2007 | |
NL | 14.02.2007 | ||
PL | 14.02.2007 | ||
SE | 14.05.2007 | ||
BG | 15.05.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5726659 (KEE CHANGDON [US], et al) [A] 40,41* column 4, line 43 - column 8, line 49; figures 1,2 *; | [X]US6075987 (CAMP WILLIAM O JR [US], et al) [X] 1-4,15,16,26,35-38 * column 6, lines 6-56; figures 1-3 *; | [XY]EP1008862 (LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]) [X] 1-8,10,11,14-20,22,26-31,35-38 * column 5, paragraph 23 - column 8, paragraph 31; figures 4-7 * [Y] 24,25; | [X]US6133874 (KRASNER NORMAN F [US]) [X] 1-4,15,16,26,35-38 * column 14, line 64 - column 16, line 36; figure 3 *; | [Y]US6323803 (JOLLEY EDWARD VINCENT [US], et al) [Y] 39 * column 5, line 7 - column 6, line 57; figures 1-3 *; | [Y]US2002050944 (SHEYNBLAT LEONID [US], et al) [Y] 40,41 * paragraph [0053] - paragraph [0087]; figures 4,5 *; | [X]US6400319 (CASTELLOE MICHAEL [US], et al) [X] 1-4,15,16,26,35-38 * abstract *; | [Y]US2002169550 (PERLMUTTER MICHAEL S [US], et al) [Y] 24,25 * abstract *; | [Y]US2002196181 (FALL KEVIN R [US]) [Y] 39 * paragraph [0040] - paragraph [0043]; figure 4 *; | [Y]US6529830 (ESCHENBACH RALPH [US]) [Y] 39 * column 4, line 23 - column 8, line 62; figures 7-9 * * column 16, line 15 - column 17, line 14 *; | [A] - GAUTHIER L ET AL, "EGNOS: THE FIRST STEP IN EUROPE'S CONTRIBUTION TO THE GLOBAL NAVIGATION SATELLITE SYSTEM", ESA BULLETIN, ESA SCIENTIFIC AND PUBLICATIONS BRANCH. NOORDWIJK, NL, (200102), no. 105, ISSN 0376-4265, pages 35 - 42, XP001025014 [A] 39 * the whole document * | [Y] - RODNEY WALKER AND JIZHANG SANG, "Mission Planning for High Precision RTK GPS Surveying Using Accurate Digital Terrain Information", INSTITUTE OF NAVIGATION, NTM 97, (1997), pages 367 - 373, XP002308325 [Y] 40,41 * the whole document * |