EP1521288 - Magnetron for microwave oven [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.07.2009 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 12.08.2009 [2009/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Toshiba Hokuto Electronics Corporation 1975-Banchi, 23-chome, Minami 5-Jo Asahikawa-shi Hokkaido 078-8335 / JP | [2008/36] |
Former [2005/14] | For all designated states Toshiba Hokuto Electronics Corporation 1975-Banchi, 23-chome, Minami 5-Jo Asahikawa-shi, Hokkaido 078-8335 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Higashi, Masatoshi, Toshiba Hokuto Elect. Co. 1975-banchi 23-chome Minami 5-Jo Asahikawa-shi Hokkaido 078-8335 / JP | [2005/14] | Representative(s) | Uchida, Kenji, et al Fédit-Loriot 38, avenue Hoche 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2005/14] | Uchida, Kenji, et al S.A. Fedit-Loriot et Autres Conseils en Propriété Industrielle 38, avenue Hoche 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 04291898.7 | 26.07.2004 | [2005/14] | Priority number, date | JP20030203546 | 30.07.2003 Original published format: JP 2003203546 | [2005/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1521288 | Date: | 06.04.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/14] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1521288 | Date: | 09.01.2008 | [2008/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1521288 | Date: | 03.09.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.12.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H01J23/54, H01J25/587 | [2008/02] | CPC: |
H01J23/40 (EP,KR);
H01J23/15 (KR);
H01J23/44 (KR);
H01J23/54 (KR);
H01J25/587 (EP,KR)
|
Former IPC [2005/14] | H01J25/587, H01J23/54 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2008/36] |
Former [2005/14] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Magnetron fur Mikrowellenherd | [2005/14] | English: | Magnetron for microwave oven | [2005/14] | French: | Magnétron pour four à micro-ondes | [2005/14] | Examination procedure | 24.01.2008 | Examination requested [2008/10] | 22.04.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.07.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 15.07.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.06.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS61288347 (TOSHIBA CORP) [A] 1,4,6,7 * abstract *; | [DA]JPH04167334 (TOSHIBA CORP) [DA] 1 * figure 1 *; | [PA]EP1391909 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [PA] 1,2,4,6,7* paragraphs [0001] , [0003]; figure 2 * |