EP1630772 - Method and device for dithering [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.05.2007 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.05.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.06.2007 [2007/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DEUTSCHE THOMSON-BRANDT GMBH Hermann-Schwer-Strasse 3 78048 Villingen-Schwenningen / DE | [2006/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Thebault, Cédric c/o Thomson, 46 Quai Alphonse Le Gallo 92648 Boulogne Cedex / FR | 02 /
Correa, Carlos c/o Thomson, 46 Quai Alphonse Le Gallo 92648 Boulogne Cedex / FR | 03 /
Weitbruch, Sébastien c/o Thomson, 46 Quai Alphonse Le Gallo 92648 Boulogne Cedex / FR | [2006/09] | Representative(s) | Le Dantec, Claude, et al TECHNICOLOR 1-5, rue Jeanne d'Arc 92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2006/09] | Le Dantec, Claude, et al Thomson, 46, Quai Alphonse Le Gallo 92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR | Application number, filing date | 04292087.6 | 25.08.2004 | [2006/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1630772 | Date: | 01.03.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.02.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G09G3/20, G09G3/28 | [2006/09] | CPC: |
G09G3/2055 (EP,US);
G09G3/20 (KR);
G09G3/296 (KR);
G09G2320/0247 (EP,US);
G09G2320/0276 (EP,US);
G09G3/2018 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2006/45] |
Former [2006/09] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Halbtonzittern | [2006/09] | English: | Method and device for dithering | [2006/09] | French: | Procédé et dispositif de tremblement de demi-teinte | [2006/09] | Examination procedure | deleted | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.09.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/23] | 29.12.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2007/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 10.10.2006 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 10.10.2006 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 10.10.2006 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 10.10.2006 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 10.10.2006 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 10.10.2006 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 10.10.2006 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 10.10.2006 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 10.10.2006 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 10.10.2006 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 10.10.2006 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 10.10.2006 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 10.10.2006 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 10.10.2006 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 10.10.2006 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 10.10.2006 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 10.10.2006 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 10.10.2006 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 10.10.2006 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 10.10.2006 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 10.10.2006 | PL   M01   Not yet paid | 10.10.2006 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 10.10.2006 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 10.10.2006 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 10.10.2006 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 10.10.2006 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 10.10.2006 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 10.10.2006 | M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2000023181 ; | [A]EP1324305 (SEIKO EPSON CORP [JP]) [A] 1,7 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20000831), vol. 2000, no. 04, & JP2000023181 A 20000121 (HITACHI LTD) [A] 1,7 * abstract * |