EP1526591 - Method for connecting a current collector to a battery terminal [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.12.2017 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.2019 | Change - classification | published on 13.02.2019 [2019/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SAFT 12, rue Sadi Carnot 93170 Bagnolet / FR | [2005/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Freluche, Jean-Pierre 30 rue Waldeck Rousseau 16000 Angouleme / FR | 02 /
Foulquier, Jérome 8 place des Essarts, Appt 40, Les Essarts 16000 Angouleme / FR | 03 /
Dupuy, Christian Appt no 13 pétale no 2, rue des Ecoles La Foucaudie, 16440 Nersac / FR | 04 /
Saunier, Pierre Les Genèvriers 16730 Trois Palis / FR | 05 /
Charollais, Philippe 2 rue des Métives 86600 St Sauvant / FR | [2005/17] | Representative(s) | Hirsch & Associés 154 Boulevard Haussmann 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2005/17] | Cabinet Hirsch 58, avenue Marceau 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 04292132.0 | 03.09.2004 | [2005/17] | Priority number, date | FR20030011010 | 19.09.2003 Original published format: FR 0311010 | [2005/17] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1526591 | Date: | 27.04.2005 | Language: | FR | [2005/17] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1526591 | Date: | 11.04.2007 | [2007/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.03.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H01M2/26 | [2005/17] | CPC: |
H01M10/0431 (EP,US);
H01M50/528 (EP,US);
H01M50/533 (EP,US);
H01M50/534 (EP,US);
H01M50/536 (EP,US);
H01M50/538 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2007/51] |
Former [2005/17] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zum elektrischen Anschliessen eines Stromabnehmers an einen Batteriepol | [2005/17] | English: | Method for connecting a current collector to a battery terminal | [2005/17] | French: | Procédé de raccordement électrique d'une connexion sur une sortie de courant | [2005/17] | Examination procedure | 11.10.2007 | Examination requested [2007/47] | 27.11.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.04.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.01.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.07.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/01] | 25.08.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/01] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.11.2007 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 01.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 30.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 30.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 23.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 19.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2017 | 14   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP2000277154 ; | [X]JP2002231216 ; | [X]EP0494504 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1,3,7-9 * columns 3-5 * * figure 2 *; | [X]US5521021 (ALEXANDRES RICHARD B [US], et al) [X] 7,9 * columns 2-4 * * figure 1 * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20010205), vol. 2000, no. 13, & JP2000277154 A 20001006 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO LTD) [X] 1,3,7,9,10 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20021212), vol. 2002, no. 12, & JP2002231216 A 20020816 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO LTD) [X] 7,9 * abstract * | Examination | US6465122 |