EP1637226 - Microfluidic device using a collinear electric field [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.05.2007 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.05.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.06.2007 [2007/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Institut Curie 26, rue d'Ulm 75248 Paris Cedex 05 / FR | For all designated states CENTRE NATIONAL DE LA RECHERCHE SCIENTIFIQUE 3, rue Michel-Ange 75794 Paris Cedex 16 / FR | [2006/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Viovy, Jean-Louis 26 rue de l'Espérance 75013 Paris / FR | 02 /
Chabert, Max 20 boulevard St Marcel 75005 Paris / FR | 03 /
Dorfman, Kevin 83 rue Vicille du Temple 75003 Paris / FR | [2006/12] | Representative(s) | Tanty, François, et al Nony 11 rue Saint-Georges 75009 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2006/12] | Tanty, François, et al Nony & Partners, 3, Rue de Penthièvre 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 04292173.4 | 09.09.2004 | [2006/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1637226 | Date: | 22.03.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.05.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B01L3/00, F04B19/00 | [2006/12] | CPC: |
B01L3/502784 (EP);
F04B19/006 (EP);
B01L2200/0673 (EP);
B01L2300/0816 (EP);
B01L2400/0415 (EP);
B01L2400/0493 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2006/48] |
Former [2006/12] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Mikrofluide Vorrichtung mit kollinearem elektrischen Feld | [2006/12] | English: | Microfluidic device using a collinear electric field | [2006/12] | French: | Dispositif microfluidique utilisant champ electrique colineaire | [2006/12] | Examination procedure | 23.09.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/23] | 18.01.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2007/23] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 31.10.2006 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 31.10.2006 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 31.10.2006 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 31.10.2006 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 31.10.2006 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 31.10.2006 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 31.10.2006 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 31.10.2006 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 31.10.2006 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 31.10.2006 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 31.10.2006 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 31.10.2006 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 31.10.2006 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 31.10.2006 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 31.10.2006 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 31.10.2006 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 31.10.2006 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 31.10.2006 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 31.10.2006 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 31.10.2006 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 31.10.2006 | PL   M01   Not yet paid | 31.10.2006 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 31.10.2006 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 31.10.2006 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 31.10.2006 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 31.10.2006 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 31.10.2006 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 31.10.2006 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2006 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US6146103 (LEE ABRAHAM P [US], et al) [A] 1-23,25 * the whole document *; | [A]WO0073655 (OSMOOZE S A [FR], et al) [A] 1-23,25 * the whole document *; | [A]US6294063 (BECKER FREDERICK F [US], et al) [A] 1-23,25 * the whole document *; | [A]EP1348546 (TOYO INK MFG CO [JP]) [A] 1-23,25* the whole document *; | [A] - ZHANG ET AL, "Theoretical Prediction of Elecric Fields-Enhanced Coalescence of Spherical Drops", AICHE JOURNAL, (199507), vol. 41, no. 7, pages 1629 - 1639, XP009043703 [A] 1-23,25 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/aic.690410704 |