EP1525915 - Catalyst comprising at least one BOG type zeolite and its use in the transalkylation of alkylaromatic hydrocarbons [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.01.2011 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.01.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.02.2011 [2011/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Institut Français du Pétrole 1 & 4 Avenue de Bois-Préau 92852 Rueil Malmaison Cedex / FR | [2010/09] |
Former [2005/17] | For all designated states Institut Français du Pétrole 1 & 4 Avenue de Bois-Préau 92852 Rueil Malmaison Cédex / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lacombe, Sylvie 10 avenue de Gadagne 69230 Saint Genis Laval / FR | 02 /
Guillon, Emmanuelle 22 avenue Paul d'Aubarède 69230 Saint Genis Laval / FR | [2009/48] |
Former [2005/17] | 01 /
Lacombe, Sylvie 10 avenue de Gadagne Saint Genis Laval / FR | ||
02 /
Guillon, Emmanuelle 22 avenue Paul d'Aubarède 69230 Saint Genis Laval / FR | Application number, filing date | 04292430.8 | 12.10.2004 | [2005/17] | Priority number, date | FR20030012552 | 24.10.2003 Original published format: FR 0312552 | [2005/17] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1525915 | Date: | 27.04.2005 | Language: | FR | [2005/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1525915 | Date: | 03.03.2010 | Language: | FR | [2010/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.01.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B01J29/76, B01J29/78, C07C6/12 | [2005/17] | CPC: |
C07C6/126 (EP,US);
B01J29/76 (EP,US);
B01J29/78 (EP,US);
C07C2529/70 (EP,US);
C07C2529/76 (EP,US);
C07C2529/78 (EP,US);
Y02P20/52 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C07C6/126, C07C15/08 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [2006/03] |
Former [2005/17] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Katalysator enthaltend mindestens einen Zeolith des BOG Strukturtyps und seine Verwendung zur Transalkylierung von alkylaromatischen Kohlenwasserstoffen | [2005/17] | English: | Catalyst comprising at least one BOG type zeolite and its use in the transalkylation of alkylaromatic hydrocarbons | [2005/17] | French: | Catalyseur comprenant au moins une zeolithe de type structural bog et son utilisation en transalkylation d'hydrocarbures alkylaromatiques | [2005/17] | Examination procedure | 27.10.2005 | Examination requested [2005/52] | 05.11.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.01.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 12.01.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.12.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5952536 (NACAMULI GERALD J [US], et al); | [DA]EP1077083 (INST FRANCAIS DU PETROLE [FR]); | [A]FR2821075 (INST FRANCAIS DU PETROLE [FR]); | [DA] - J.J. PLUTH AND J.V. SMITH, "Crystal structure of boggsite, a new high-silica zeolite with the first three-dimensional channel system bound by both 12- and 10- rings", AMERICAN MINERALOGIST., WASHINGTON, DC, US, US, (1990), vol. 75, ISSN 0003-004X, pages 501 - 507, XP008029889 | [A] - ADAIR BRIAN ET AL, "Reactions of meta-xylene on zeolites with intersecting medium and large pores. I. Basic studies", MICROPOROUS MATERIALS, AMSTERDAM, NETHERLANDS, (199611), vol. 7, no. 5, pages 261 - 270, XP002277188 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0927-6513(96)00050-8 |