EP1530961 - Emulsion containing hollow organosilicon particles [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.06.2010 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 09.11.2011 [2011/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states L'Oréal 14, rue Royale 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2009/32] | For all designated states L'ORÉAL 14, rue Royale 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2005/20] | For all designated states L'OREAL 14, rue Royale 75008 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cassin, Guillaume 31 ter, Avenue des Bouleaux 91140 Villebon sur Yvette / FR | [2005/20] | Representative(s) | Leonard, Armelle L'Oréal Service DIPI 9 Rue Pierre Dreyfus 92110 Clichy / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2009/50] | Leonard, Armelle L'Oréal D.I.P.I. 25-29, Quai Aulagnier 92665 Asnières-sur-Seine cedex / FR | ||
Former [2009/32] | Leonard, Armelle L'OREAL - D.I.P.I River Plaza - DIPI 25-29, Quai Aulagnier 92665 Asnières-sur-Seine / FR | ||
Former [2008/49] | Leonard, Armelle L'OREAL, River Place, 25-29 Quai Aulagnier 92600 Asnières-sur-Seine / FR | ||
Former [2005/20] | Renard, Emmanuelle L'OREAL - D.I.P.I. 25-29 Quai Aulagnier 92600 Asnières / FR | Application number, filing date | 04292497.7 | 21.10.2004 | [2005/20] | Priority number, date | FR20030050829 | 13.11.2003 Original published format: FR 0350829 | [2005/20] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1530961 | Date: | 18.05.2005 | Language: | FR | [2005/20] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1530961 | Date: | 08.03.2006 | [2006/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1530961 | Date: | 05.08.2009 | Language: | FR | [2009/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.01.2006 | Classification | IPC: | A61K8/04, A61Q19/00, A61Q1/00, A61Q19/08 | [2008/19] | CPC: |
A61Q19/08 (EP);
A61K8/06 (EP);
A61K8/11 (EP);
A61Q1/00 (EP);
A61Q19/00 (EP);
A61K2800/412 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2005/20] | A61K7/02, A61K7/48 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/20] | Title | German: | Emulsion enthaltend Organosilikon-Hohlkügelchen | [2009/03] | English: | Emulsion containing hollow organosilicon particles | [2005/20] | French: | Emulsion renfermant des portions de sphères creuses organosiliconées | [2009/03] |
Former [2005/20] | Emulsion enthaltend Organosilikon-Hohlteilchen | ||
Former [2005/20] | Emulsion renfermant des portions de sphères creuses organossiliconées | Examination procedure | 08.09.2006 | Examination requested [2006/43] | 19.11.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.03.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.06.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.10.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 23.10.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.05.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 05.08.2009 | CY | 05.08.2009 | CZ | 05.08.2009 | DK | 05.08.2009 | EE | 05.08.2009 | FI | 05.08.2009 | IE | 05.08.2009 | NL | 05.08.2009 | PL | 05.08.2009 | RO | 05.08.2009 | SE | 05.08.2009 | SI | 05.08.2009 | SK | 05.08.2009 | TR | 05.08.2009 | LU | 21.10.2009 | BE | 31.10.2009 | CH | 31.10.2009 | LI | 31.10.2009 | MC | 31.10.2009 | BG | 05.11.2009 | GR | 06.11.2009 | PT | 05.12.2009 | HU | 06.02.2010 | [2011/44] |
Former [2011/32] | AT | 05.08.2009 | |
CZ | 05.08.2009 | ||
DK | 05.08.2009 | ||
EE | 05.08.2009 | ||
FI | 05.08.2009 | ||
IE | 05.08.2009 | ||
NL | 05.08.2009 | ||
PL | 05.08.2009 | ||
RO | 05.08.2009 | ||
SE | 05.08.2009 | ||
SI | 05.08.2009 | ||
SK | 05.08.2009 | ||
LU | 21.10.2009 | ||
BE | 31.10.2009 | ||
CH | 31.10.2009 | ||
LI | 31.10.2009 | ||
MC | 31.10.2009 | ||
BG | 05.11.2009 | ||
GR | 06.11.2009 | ||
PT | 05.12.2009 | ||
HU | 06.02.2010 | ||
Former [2011/21] | AT | 05.08.2009 | |
CZ | 05.08.2009 | ||
DK | 05.08.2009 | ||
EE | 05.08.2009 | ||
FI | 05.08.2009 | ||
IE | 05.08.2009 | ||
NL | 05.08.2009 | ||
PL | 05.08.2009 | ||
RO | 05.08.2009 | ||
SE | 05.08.2009 | ||
SI | 05.08.2009 | ||
SK | 05.08.2009 | ||
LU | 21.10.2009 | ||
BE | 31.10.2009 | ||
CH | 31.10.2009 | ||
LI | 31.10.2009 | ||
MC | 31.10.2009 | ||
BG | 05.11.2009 | ||
GR | 06.11.2009 | ||
PT | 05.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/50] | AT | 05.08.2009 | |
CZ | 05.08.2009 | ||
DK | 05.08.2009 | ||
EE | 05.08.2009 | ||
FI | 05.08.2009 | ||
IE | 05.08.2009 | ||
NL | 05.08.2009 | ||
PL | 05.08.2009 | ||
RO | 05.08.2009 | ||
SE | 05.08.2009 | ||
SI | 05.08.2009 | ||
SK | 05.08.2009 | ||
BE | 31.10.2009 | ||
CH | 31.10.2009 | ||
LI | 31.10.2009 | ||
MC | 31.10.2009 | ||
BG | 05.11.2009 | ||
GR | 06.11.2009 | ||
PT | 05.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/46] | AT | 05.08.2009 | |
CZ | 05.08.2009 | ||
DK | 05.08.2009 | ||
EE | 05.08.2009 | ||
FI | 05.08.2009 | ||
IE | 05.08.2009 | ||
NL | 05.08.2009 | ||
PL | 05.08.2009 | ||
RO | 05.08.2009 | ||
SE | 05.08.2009 | ||
SI | 05.08.2009 | ||
SK | 05.08.2009 | ||
CH | 31.10.2009 | ||
LI | 31.10.2009 | ||
MC | 31.10.2009 | ||
BG | 05.11.2009 | ||
GR | 06.11.2009 | ||
PT | 05.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/25] | AT | 05.08.2009 | |
CZ | 05.08.2009 | ||
DK | 05.08.2009 | ||
EE | 05.08.2009 | ||
FI | 05.08.2009 | ||
IE | 05.08.2009 | ||
NL | 05.08.2009 | ||
PL | 05.08.2009 | ||
RO | 05.08.2009 | ||
SE | 05.08.2009 | ||
SI | 05.08.2009 | ||
SK | 05.08.2009 | ||
MC | 31.10.2009 | ||
BG | 05.11.2009 | ||
PT | 05.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/23] | AT | 05.08.2009 | |
CZ | 05.08.2009 | ||
DK | 05.08.2009 | ||
EE | 05.08.2009 | ||
FI | 05.08.2009 | ||
IE | 05.08.2009 | ||
NL | 05.08.2009 | ||
PL | 05.08.2009 | ||
RO | 05.08.2009 | ||
SE | 05.08.2009 | ||
SI | 05.08.2009 | ||
SK | 05.08.2009 | ||
BG | 05.11.2009 | ||
PT | 05.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/22] | AT | 05.08.2009 | |
CZ | 05.08.2009 | ||
DK | 05.08.2009 | ||
EE | 05.08.2009 | ||
FI | 05.08.2009 | ||
IE | 05.08.2009 | ||
NL | 05.08.2009 | ||
PL | 05.08.2009 | ||
RO | 05.08.2009 | ||
SE | 05.08.2009 | ||
SI | 05.08.2009 | ||
BG | 05.11.2009 | ||
PT | 05.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/20] | AT | 05.08.2009 | |
DK | 05.08.2009 | ||
EE | 05.08.2009 | ||
FI | 05.08.2009 | ||
IE | 05.08.2009 | ||
NL | 05.08.2009 | ||
PL | 05.08.2009 | ||
SE | 05.08.2009 | ||
SI | 05.08.2009 | ||
BG | 05.11.2009 | ||
PT | 05.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/17] | AT | 05.08.2009 | |
FI | 05.08.2009 | ||
NL | 05.08.2009 | ||
PL | 05.08.2009 | ||
SE | 05.08.2009 | ||
SI | 05.08.2009 | ||
BG | 05.11.2009 | ||
PT | 05.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/11] | AT | 05.08.2009 | |
FI | 05.08.2009 | ||
NL | 05.08.2009 | ||
PL | 05.08.2009 | ||
SE | 05.08.2009 | ||
SI | 05.08.2009 | ||
Former [2010/10] | AT | 05.08.2009 | |
FI | 05.08.2009 | ||
NL | 05.08.2009 | ||
PL | 05.08.2009 | ||
SE | 05.08.2009 | ||
Former [2010/09] | AT | 05.08.2009 | |
FI | 05.08.2009 | ||
SE | 05.08.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [T]JP3701016B ; | [A]EP0254612 (OREAL [FR]) [A] 1-35 * claim - *; | [A]US5593680 (BARA ISABELLE [FR], et al) [A] 1-35 * column 4, lines 1-7; claim - *; | [Y]US5814311 (LE BRAS-ROULIER VERONIQUE [FR], et al) [Y] 1-35 * column 3, lines 59-65; example -; claims 1,9,29 *; | [A]FR2816500 (OREAL [FR]) [A] 1-35 * page 16,, columns 31,32 * * page 3, lines 18-25 * * page 15, lines 2-4 *; | [A]WO03020225 (OREAL [FR], et al) [A] 1-35 * page 10, lines 4-8 * * page 7, lines 24-29 *; | [Y]JP2003128788 (TAKEMOTO OIL & FAT CO LTD) [Y] 1-35 * paragraphs [0001] , [0003] , [0007] - [0033] - [0037] , [0038] , [0074]; figure .; claims 1-5,14-16 *; | [T] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2005, no. 66, Database accession no. 2004-229773, XP002362613 & JP3701016B B2 20050928 (TAKEMOTO OIL & FAT CO LTD) [T] * abstract * |