EP1537894 - Implantable medical device with Holter's recording functions [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.02.2008 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.11.2009 | Change - representative | published on 16.12.2009 [2009/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ELA MEDICAL 98, rue Maurice Arnoux 92541 Montrouge / FR | [2005/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Henry, Christine 19 rue Boyer-Barret 75014 Paris / FR | 02 /
Poezevara, Yann 69 avenue Descartes 91080 Courcouronnes / FR | [2005/23] | Representative(s) | Dupuis-Latour, Dominique, et al Bardehle Pagenberg SPE SAS SO Square Opéra 5, rue Boudreau 75009 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2009/51] | Dupuis-Latour, Dominique, et al SEP Pagenberg & Associés 14 boulevard Malesherbes 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2005/23] | Dupuis-Latour, Dominique, et al SEP Pagenberg & Associés 14 boulevard Malesherbes 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 04292864.8 | 03.12.2004 | [2005/23] | Priority number, date | FR20030014158 | 03.12.2003 Original published format: FR 0314158 | [2005/23] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1537894 | Date: | 08.06.2005 | Language: | FR | [2005/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1537894 | Date: | 28.03.2007 | Language: | FR | [2007/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.03.2005 | Classification | IPC: | A61N1/37, A61N1/365 | [2005/23] | CPC: |
A61N1/36521 (EP,US);
A61N1/3702 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/23] | Title | German: | Implantierbares medizinisches Gerät mit Aufzeichnungsfunktionen von Holter | [2005/23] | English: | Implantable medical device with Holter's recording functions | [2005/23] | French: | Dispositif médical implantable actif à fonctions d'enregistrement Holter | [2005/23] | Examination procedure | 25.11.2005 | Examination requested [2006/04] | 22.02.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.06.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.10.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.02.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 09.02.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.01.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 28.03.2007 | CY | 28.03.2007 | CZ | 28.03.2007 | DK | 28.03.2007 | EE | 28.03.2007 | FI | 28.03.2007 | LT | 28.03.2007 | NL | 28.03.2007 | PL | 28.03.2007 | RO | 28.03.2007 | SI | 28.03.2007 | SK | 28.03.2007 | TR | 28.03.2007 | BG | 28.06.2007 | GR | 29.06.2007 | ES | 09.07.2007 | IS | 28.07.2007 | PT | 28.08.2007 | HU | 29.09.2007 | LU | 03.12.2007 | BE | 31.12.2007 | MC | 31.12.2007 | [2009/44] |
Former [2009/40] | AT | 28.03.2007 | |
CY | 28.03.2007 | ||
CZ | 28.03.2007 | ||
DK | 28.03.2007 | ||
EE | 28.03.2007 | ||
FI | 28.03.2007 | ||
LT | 28.03.2007 | ||
NL | 28.03.2007 | ||
PL | 28.03.2007 | ||
RO | 28.03.2007 | ||
SI | 28.03.2007 | ||
SK | 28.03.2007 | ||
BG | 28.06.2007 | ||
GR | 29.06.2007 | ||
ES | 09.07.2007 | ||
IS | 28.07.2007 | ||
PT | 28.08.2007 | ||
LU | 03.12.2007 | ||
BE | 31.12.2007 | ||
MC | 31.12.2007 | ||
Former [2009/35] | AT | 28.03.2007 | |
CY | 28.03.2007 | ||
CZ | 28.03.2007 | ||
DK | 28.03.2007 | ||
EE | 28.03.2007 | ||
FI | 28.03.2007 | ||
LT | 28.03.2007 | ||
NL | 28.03.2007 | ||
PL | 28.03.2007 | ||
RO | 28.03.2007 | ||
SI | 28.03.2007 | ||
SK | 28.03.2007 | ||
GR | 29.06.2007 | ||
ES | 09.07.2007 | ||
IS | 28.07.2007 | ||
PT | 28.08.2007 | ||
BE | 31.12.2007 | ||
MC | 31.12.2007 | ||
Former [2009/11] | AT | 28.03.2007 | |
CZ | 28.03.2007 | ||
DK | 28.03.2007 | ||
EE | 28.03.2007 | ||
FI | 28.03.2007 | ||
LT | 28.03.2007 | ||
NL | 28.03.2007 | ||
PL | 28.03.2007 | ||
RO | 28.03.2007 | ||
SI | 28.03.2007 | ||
SK | 28.03.2007 | ||
GR | 29.06.2007 | ||
ES | 09.07.2007 | ||
IS | 28.07.2007 | ||
PT | 28.08.2007 | ||
BE | 31.12.2007 | ||
MC | 31.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/43] | AT | 28.03.2007 | |
CZ | 28.03.2007 | ||
DK | 28.03.2007 | ||
FI | 28.03.2007 | ||
LT | 28.03.2007 | ||
NL | 28.03.2007 | ||
PL | 28.03.2007 | ||
RO | 28.03.2007 | ||
SI | 28.03.2007 | ||
SK | 28.03.2007 | ||
GR | 29.06.2007 | ||
ES | 09.07.2007 | ||
IS | 28.07.2007 | ||
PT | 28.08.2007 | ||
BE | 31.12.2007 | ||
MC | 31.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/33] | AT | 28.03.2007 | |
CZ | 28.03.2007 | ||
DK | 28.03.2007 | ||
FI | 28.03.2007 | ||
LT | 28.03.2007 | ||
NL | 28.03.2007 | ||
PL | 28.03.2007 | ||
RO | 28.03.2007 | ||
SI | 28.03.2007 | ||
SK | 28.03.2007 | ||
GR | 29.06.2007 | ||
ES | 09.07.2007 | ||
IS | 28.07.2007 | ||
PT | 28.08.2007 | ||
MC | 31.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/22] | AT | 28.03.2007 | |
CZ | 28.03.2007 | ||
DK | 28.03.2007 | ||
FI | 28.03.2007 | ||
LT | 28.03.2007 | ||
NL | 28.03.2007 | ||
PL | 28.03.2007 | ||
RO | 28.03.2007 | ||
SI | 28.03.2007 | ||
SK | 28.03.2007 | ||
GR | 29.06.2007 | ||
ES | 09.07.2007 | ||
IS | 28.07.2007 | ||
PT | 28.08.2007 | ||
Former [2008/12] | AT | 28.03.2007 | |
CZ | 28.03.2007 | ||
DK | 28.03.2007 | ||
FI | 28.03.2007 | ||
LT | 28.03.2007 | ||
NL | 28.03.2007 | ||
PL | 28.03.2007 | ||
RO | 28.03.2007 | ||
SI | 28.03.2007 | ||
SK | 28.03.2007 | ||
ES | 09.07.2007 | ||
IS | 28.07.2007 | ||
PT | 28.08.2007 | ||
Former [2008/08] | AT | 28.03.2007 | |
CZ | 28.03.2007 | ||
DK | 28.03.2007 | ||
FI | 28.03.2007 | ||
NL | 28.03.2007 | ||
PL | 28.03.2007 | ||
RO | 28.03.2007 | ||
SI | 28.03.2007 | ||
SK | 28.03.2007 | ||
ES | 09.07.2007 | ||
IS | 28.07.2007 | ||
PT | 28.08.2007 | ||
Former [2008/04] | AT | 28.03.2007 | |
CZ | 28.03.2007 | ||
FI | 28.03.2007 | ||
NL | 28.03.2007 | ||
PL | 28.03.2007 | ||
RO | 28.03.2007 | ||
SI | 28.03.2007 | ||
SK | 28.03.2007 | ||
ES | 09.07.2007 | ||
IS | 28.07.2007 | ||
PT | 28.08.2007 | ||
Former [2008/02] | AT | 28.03.2007 | |
CZ | 28.03.2007 | ||
FI | 28.03.2007 | ||
NL | 28.03.2007 | ||
PL | 28.03.2007 | ||
SI | 28.03.2007 | ||
SK | 28.03.2007 | ||
ES | 09.07.2007 | ||
IS | 28.07.2007 | ||
PT | 28.08.2007 | ||
Former [2007/51] | AT | 28.03.2007 | |
FI | 28.03.2007 | ||
NL | 28.03.2007 | ||
PL | 28.03.2007 | ||
SI | 28.03.2007 | ||
SK | 28.03.2007 | ||
ES | 09.07.2007 | ||
IS | 28.07.2007 | ||
PT | 28.08.2007 | ||
Former [2007/49] | AT | 28.03.2007 | |
FI | 28.03.2007 | ||
NL | 28.03.2007 | ||
PL | 28.03.2007 | ||
SI | 28.03.2007 | ||
ES | 09.07.2007 | ||
IS | 28.07.2007 | ||
PT | 28.08.2007 | ||
Former [2007/47] | AT | 28.03.2007 | |
FI | 28.03.2007 | ||
NL | 28.03.2007 | ||
PL | 28.03.2007 | ||
SI | 28.03.2007 | ||
ES | 09.07.2007 | ||
IS | 28.07.2007 | ||
Former [2007/43] | FI | 28.03.2007 | |
NL | 28.03.2007 | ||
PL | 28.03.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [XDAY]EP0653226 (ELA MEDICAL SA [FR]) [XD] 1,6,11-15,17,18,22,24 * the whole document * * en particulier; page 3, line 38 - page 4, line 4; figure 1 * * page 4, line 45 - line 55 * * page 5, line 57 - page 6, line 12 * * page 7, line 7 - line 22 * [A] 2-4,16,19,21 [Y] 7-10,19,20,23; | [Y]US6200265 (WALSH KEVIN K [US], et al) [Y] 23* column 2, lines 35-47 *; | [X]US6351670 (KROLL KAI [US]) [X] 1,11,12,14,15,24 * the whole document * * en particulier; column 4, line 7 - column 5, line 21; figures 1,4 *; | [Y]US2002173829 (GRAINDORGE LAURENCE [FR]) [Y] 20 * paragraph [0012] * * paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0019] *; | [Y]US2002193697 (CHO YONG KYUN [US], et al) [Y] 7-10,19 * paragraphs [0013] , [0015] * * paragraphs [0035] - [0042] - [0053]; figure 5 * * figures 3,4 * | by applicant | EP0515319 | EP0653226 | EP0719568 | WO9802209 | EP0970713 | EP1295623 | EP1336422 |