EP1667465 - Method and apparatus for encoding or decoding two digital video signals multiplexed in a single-video signal path [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.07.2007 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.07.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.08.2007 [2007/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Thomson Licensing 1-5, rue Jeanne d'Arc 92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2006/23] | For all designated states Thomson Licensing 46, quai Alphonse Le Gallo 92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kuppens, Chris Schoffelstraat 8 4904 VK Oosterhout / NL | 02 /
Rotte, Jeroen Bavelselaan 85 4835 GR Breda / NL | 03 /
Van Rooy, Jan Espalen 7 5235 EM's Hertogenbosch / NL | [2006/23] | Representative(s) | Hartnack, Wolfgang, et al Deutsche Thomson OHG Karl-Wiechert-Allee 1D 30625 Hannover / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/23] | Hartnack, Wolfgang, et al Deutsche Thomson-Brandt GmbH European Patent Operations Karl-Wiechert-Allee 74 30625 Hannover / DE | Application number, filing date | 04292882.0 | 06.12.2004 | [2006/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1667465 | Date: | 07.06.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.04.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H04N7/58, H04N7/26 | [2006/23] | CPC: |
H04N5/2222 (EP);
H04N19/46 (EP);
H04N19/98 (EP);
H04N23/66 (EP);
H04N21/23602 (EP);
H04N21/4342 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2007/07] |
Former [2006/23] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Kodierung oder Dekodierung von zwei in einem Einzelvideosignalweg multiplexierten digitalen Videosignalen | [2006/23] | English: | Method and apparatus for encoding or decoding two digital video signals multiplexed in a single-video signal path | [2006/23] | French: | Appareil et méthode pour le codage ou decodage de deux signaux vidéo numériques multiplexés dans un canal destiné à un unique signal vidéo | [2006/23] | Examination procedure | 08.12.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/35] | 12.04.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2007/35] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 23.01.2007 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 23.01.2007 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 23.01.2007 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 23.01.2007 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 23.01.2007 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 23.01.2007 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 23.01.2007 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 23.01.2007 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 23.01.2007 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 23.01.2007 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 23.01.2007 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 23.01.2007 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 23.01.2007 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 23.01.2007 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 23.01.2007 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 23.01.2007 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 23.01.2007 | IS   M01   Not yet paid | 23.01.2007 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 23.01.2007 | LT   M01   Not yet paid | 23.01.2007 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 23.01.2007 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 23.01.2007 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 23.01.2007 | PL   M01   Not yet paid | 23.01.2007 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 23.01.2007 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 23.01.2007 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 23.01.2007 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 23.01.2007 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 23.01.2007 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 23.01.2007 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2006 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2000333168 ; | [A]DE3230270 (PHILIPS KOMMUNIKATIONS IND AG [DE]) [A] 1-12 * figures 1,2; claims 1-4 *; | [A]US5157656 (TURUDIC ANDY [US], et al) [A] 1-12 * column 5, line 50 - column 8, line 16; figures 8a-9 *; | [A]EP0740469 (HITACHI ELECTRONICS [JP]) [A] 1-12 * column 1, line 17 - column 2, line 55; figures 1-4 *; | [A]EP0848517 (ALSTHOM CGE ALCATEL [FR]) [A] 9,11* the whole document *; | [DY]EP0926898 (SONY CORP [JP]) [DY] 1-12 * abstract * * paragraph [0070] * * paragraph [0079] *; | [Y]US6009305 (MURATA NOBUO [JP]) [Y] 1-12 * figures 1,2,4B * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20010305), vol. 2000, no. 14, & JP2000333168 A 20001130 (SONY CORP) [A] 1-12 * abstract * |