EP1541718 - Hexavalent-chrome-free process for sealing of a sulfuric acid anodized aluminium alloy, sealing solution therefor and article therefrom [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.05.2011 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.05.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.06.2011 [2011/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SNECMA 2, boulevard du Général Martial Valin 75015 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2005/38] | For all designated states SNECMA 2 boulevard du Général Martial Valin 75015 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2005/24] | For all designated states SNECMA MOTEURS 2, Boulevard du Général Martial Valin 75015 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ruimi, Michel 14 rue du Terrage 75010 Paris / FR | 02 /
Oberlaender, Guillaume 76 ter rue d'etigny 64000 Pau / FR | 03 /
Gonzalez, Valérie 23 rue des Graces 77000 Vaux le Penil / FR | [2005/29] |
Former [2005/24] | 01 /
Ruimi, Michel 14 rue du Terrage 75010 Paris / FR | ||
02 /
Oberlaender, Guillaume 6 rue Brézin 75014 Paris / FR | |||
03 /
Gonzalez, Valérie 23 rue des Graces 77000 Vaux le Penil / FR | Representative(s) | Cardy, Sophie Marie, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2005/24] | Cardy, Sophie, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 04292901.8 | 07.12.2004 | [2005/24] | Priority number, date | FR20030014382 | 09.12.2003 Original published format: FR 0314382 | [2005/24] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1541718 | Date: | 15.06.2005 | Language: | FR | [2005/24] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1541718 | Date: | 15.10.2008 | [2008/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.09.2008 | Classification | IPC: | C25D11/24 | [2005/24] | CPC: |
C25D11/246 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, SE [2009/26] |
Former [2005/24] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Hexavalentchromefrei Verfahren zur Versieglung einer schwefelsäurig anodisierten Aluminiumlegierung, Versieglungslösung hierfür, und Produkt hiervon | [2005/24] | English: | Hexavalent-chrome-free process for sealing of a sulfuric acid anodized aluminium alloy, sealing solution therefor and article therefrom | [2005/24] | French: | Procédé de colmatage exempt de chrome hexavalent applicable après anodisation sulfurique d'alliages d'aluminium, solution de colmatage utilisée dans ce procédé et article traité issu d'un tel procédé | [2005/24] | Examination procedure | 15.12.2004 | Examination requested [2005/24] | 16.04.2009 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 27.05.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SI, SK, TR | 09.06.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.12.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/25] | 25.01.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2011/25] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.06.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US6447665 (JOHNSON PHILIP M [US], et al) [A] 1-28 * claim - ** column 2, lines 20-35 * |