EP1541041 - Dietary compositions against stress [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2005/24] | Pharmaceutical and/or dietary compositions against stress | ||
[2011/35] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.08.2012 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SYNERGIA Le Poyet 43500 Beaune sur Arzon / FR | [2011/52] |
Former [2005/24] | For all designated states Synergia Holding 7, avenue de la Gare 1860 Aigle / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Predal Ludovic 168 cours Fauriel 42015 Saint-Etienne Cedex 2 / FR | [2005/24] | Representative(s) | Tezier Herman, Béatrice Cabinet Becker & Associés 25, rue Louis le Grand 75002 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2011/42] | Tezier Herman, Béatrice Cabinet Becker & Associés 25, rue Louis Le Grand 75002 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2009/07] | Tezier Herman, Béatrice Cabinet Becker & Associés 25, rue Louis Le Grand 75002 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2008/38] | Burtin, Jean-François Cabinet Gefib 55 rue Aristide Briand 92309 Levallois-Perret / FR | ||
Former [2005/24] | Burtin, Jean-François Cabinet GEFIB, 55, rue Aristide Briand 92300 Levallois-Perret Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 04292941.4 | 10.12.2004 | [2005/24] | Priority number, date | FR20030014451 | 10.12.2003 Original published format: FR 0314451 | [2005/24] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1541041 | Date: | 15.06.2005 | Language: | FR | [2005/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1541041 | Date: | 19.10.2011 | Language: | FR | [2011/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.04.2005 | Classification | IPC: | A23L1/305, A23L1/302, A61K31/661, A61K31/513, A61K31/4015, A61K31/355, A61K31/201, A61K31/198, A61K31/185, A61K45/06, A61P25/00 | [2005/24] | CPC: |
A61K33/06 (EP);
A23L33/15 (EP);
A23L33/16 (EP);
A23L33/175 (EP);
A61K31/185 (EP);
A61K31/198 (EP);
A61K31/201 (EP);
A61K31/355 (EP);
A61K31/4015 (EP);
A61K31/513 (EP);
A61K31/661 (EP);
A61K45/06 (EP);
| C-Set: |
A61K31/185, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/198, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/201, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/355, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/4015, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/513, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/661, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K33/06, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A23V2002/00, A23V2250/0606, A23V2250/0644, A23V2250/161, A23V2250/7042, A23V2250/7044, A23V2250/718, A23V2250/705 (EP);
A23V2002/00, A23V2250/0606, A23V2250/0644, A23V2250/70 (EP) (-) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/24] | Extension states | LV | 04.10.2005 | MK | 04.10.2005 | Title | German: | Diätetische Zusammensetzungen gegen Stress | [2011/35] | English: | Dietary compositions against stress | [2011/35] | French: | Compositions diététiques contre le stress | [2011/35] |
Former [2005/24] | Pharmazeutische und/oder diätetische Zusammensetzungen gegen Stress | ||
Former [2005/24] | Pharmaceutical and/or dietary compositions against stress | ||
Former [2005/24] | Compositions pharmaceutiques et/ou diététiques contre le stress | Examination procedure | 04.10.2005 | Examination requested [2005/48] | 17.12.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.03.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.10.2010 | Date of oral proceedings | 05.11.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1} | 05.11.2010 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 20.04.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 23.05.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.08.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.09.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 06.09.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Appeal following examination | 06.12.2010 | Appeal received | 07.03.2011 | Statement of grounds filed | 14.04.2011 | Interlocutory revision of appeal | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.12.2008 | Opposition(s) | 20.07.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 09.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2007 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   12.06.2008 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 19.10.2011 | DK | 19.10.2011 | FI | 19.10.2011 | HU | 19.10.2011 | IE | 19.10.2011 | RO | 19.10.2011 | SE | 19.10.2011 | SK | 19.10.2011 | TR | 19.10.2011 | BG | 19.01.2012 | GR | 20.01.2012 | IS | 19.02.2012 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | CY | 19.10.2011 | |
DK | 19.10.2011 | ||
FI | 19.10.2011 | ||
IE | 19.10.2011 | ||
RO | 19.10.2011 | ||
SE | 19.10.2011 | ||
SK | 19.10.2011 | ||
TR | 19.10.2011 | ||
BG | 19.01.2012 | ||
GR | 20.01.2012 | ||
IS | 19.02.2012 | ||
Former [2013/29] | CY | 19.10.2011 | |
DK | 19.10.2011 | ||
FI | 19.10.2011 | ||
IE | 19.10.2011 | ||
RO | 19.10.2011 | ||
SE | 19.10.2011 | ||
SK | 19.10.2011 | ||
BG | 19.01.2012 | ||
GR | 20.01.2012 | ||
IS | 19.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | CY | 19.10.2011 | |
DK | 19.10.2011 | ||
IE | 19.10.2011 | ||
RO | 19.10.2011 | ||
SE | 19.10.2011 | ||
SK | 19.10.2011 | ||
BG | 19.01.2012 | ||
GR | 20.01.2012 | ||
IS | 19.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | CY | 19.10.2011 | |
DK | 19.10.2011 | ||
IE | 19.10.2011 | ||
SE | 19.10.2011 | ||
BG | 19.01.2012 | ||
GR | 20.01.2012 | ||
IS | 19.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/28] | CY | 19.10.2011 | |
SE | 19.10.2011 | ||
GR | 20.01.2012 | ||
IS | 19.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/24] | SE | 19.10.2011 | |
GR | 20.01.2012 | ||
IS | 19.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/21] | IS | 19.02.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9111117 (UNIV TEXAS [US]) [X] 1,2,8-10 * page 28, line 4 - line 23 * * claim 4 *; | [XY]FR2704391 (BOIRON [FR]) [X] 1,2,8,10 * page 1, line 4 - line 5 * * page 1, line 21 - line 22 * * page 2, line 13 - line 14 * * page 2, line 27 - line 28 * * page 3, line 6 - line 13 * [Y] 3-7,9,11; | [Y]FR2704392 (BOIRON [FR]) [Y] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [XY]DE29709820U (NUTREND S R O [CZ]) [X] 1,6,8 * page 2, line 1 - page 3, line 18 * [Y] 2-5,7,9-11; | [X]WO0030477 (FUCHS NORBERT [AT], et al) [X] 1,2,8,10 * page 3, line 31 - line 34 * * page 4, line 31 - line 34 * * page 5, line 20 - line 22 * * page 6, paragraph 3 * * page 7, line 7 - line 8 * * page 7, line 23 - line 24 * * page 11, line 3 - line 9 *; | [Y]US6391332 (SOMERVILLE JOANN A [US], et al) [Y] 1-11 * column 1, line 7 - line 11 * * column 1, line 29 - line 35 *; | [Y]WO02076436 (MEIJER JAAP [NL]) [Y] 1-11 * page 5, line 7 ** example 1 *; | [X]WO03013495 (SMOTHERS DON L [US]) [X] 1,6,8,10 * page 1, line 7 - line 8 * * page 3, line 10 - line 29 * | Examination | - "Fiche VIDAL du produit D-Stress", URL: http://www.vidal.fr/ | - SUENAGA R ET AL, "Intracerebroventricular injection of L-arginine induces sedative and hypnotic effects under an acute stress in neonatal chicks", AMINO ACIDS (VIENNA), (200806), vol. 35, no. 1, ISSN 0939-4451, pages 139 - 146 | - SUFKA K J ET AL, "Anxiolytic properties of botanical extracts in the chick social separation-stress procedure.", MEDLINE, US NATIONAL LIBRARY OF MEDICINE (NLM), BETHESDA, MD, US, (20010101), Database accession no. NLM11205422 | - SUFKA KENNETH J ET AL, "Antidepressant efficacy screening of novel targets in the chick anxiety-depression model.", MEDLINE, US NATIONAL LIBRARY OF MEDICINE (NLM), BETHESDA, MD, US, (200903), Database accession no. NLM19300238 | - FELTENSTEIN MATT W ET AL, "The chick separation stress paradigm: a validation study.", MEDLINE, US NATIONAL LIBRARY OF MEDICINE (NLM), BETHESDA, MD, US, (200402), Database accession no. NLM14751448 | - PSYCHOPHARMACOLOGY 1 JAN 2001 LNKD- PUBMED:11205422, (20010101), vol. 153, no. 2, ISSN 0033-3158, pages 219 - 224 | - BEHAVIOURAL PHARMACOLOGY MAR 2009 LNKD- PUBMED:19300238, (200903), vol. 20, no. 2, ISSN 1473-5849, pages 146 - 154 | - PHARMACOLOGY, BIOCHEMISTRY, AND BEHAVIOR FEB 2004 LNKD- PUBMED:14751448, (200402), vol. 77, no. 2, ISSN 0091-3057, pages 221 - 226 |