EP1548861 - Electrochemically active material for positive electrode of lithium rechargeable electrochemical generator [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.02.2008 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.02.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.03.2008 [2008/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SAFT 12, rue Sadi Carnot 93170 Bagnolet / FR | [2005/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jordy, Christian 22 rue des Lauriers 33440 St Louis de Montferrand / FR | 02 /
Boeuve, Jean-Pierre 12 rue de la Garosse 33450 Montussan / FR | 03 /
Biensan, Philippe 34 Chemin de Guérin La Marmette 33360 Carignan de Bordeaux / FR | [2005/39] |
Former [2005/26] | 01 /
Jordy, Christian 22 rue des Lauriers 33440 St Louis de Montferrand / FR | ||
02 /
Boeuve, Jean-Pierre 12 rue de la Garosse 33450 Montussan / FR | |||
03 /
Biensan, Philippe 77 route de Latresne 33360 Carignan / FR | Representative(s) | Hirsch & Associés 154 Boulevard Haussmann 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2005/26] | Cabinet Hirsch 58, avenue Marceau 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 04293011.5 | 16.12.2004 | [2005/26] | Priority number, date | FR20030015225 | 23.12.2003 Original published format: FR 0315225 | [2005/26] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1548861 | Date: | 29.06.2005 | Language: | FR | [2005/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.04.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H01M4/48, H01M4/58, H01M10/40, C01B25/45 | [2005/26] | CPC: |
H01M4/622 (EP,US);
H01M10/0525 (EP,US);
H01M4/131 (EP,US);
H01M4/136 (EP,US);
H01M4/362 (EP,US);
H01M4/525 (EP,US);
H01M4/5825 (EP,US);
H01M10/0566 (EP,US);
H01M10/0587 (EP,US);
H01M2004/028 (EP,US);
H01M2300/004 (EP,US);
H01M4/1391 (EP,US);
H01M4/1397 (EP,US);
H01M4/485 (EP,US);
H01M4/587 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2006/12] |
Former [2005/26] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Elektrochemisches aktives Material für positive Elektrode in einem wiederaufladbaren elektrochemischen Lithium-Generator | [2005/26] | English: | Electrochemically active material for positive electrode of lithium rechargeable electrochemical generator | [2005/26] | French: | Matière électrochimiquement active pour électrode positive de générateur électrochimique rechargeable au lithium | [2005/26] | Examination procedure | 15.12.2005 | Examination requested [2006/06] | 23.02.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.07.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/10] | 16.10.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2008/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP1150368 (SONY CORP [JP]) [Y] 1-13 * page 6, column 10 - page 11, column 19; examples 1-23 * * paragraph [0049] *; | [Y]EP1195826 (SONY CORP [JP]) [Y] 1-13 * page 7; examples 1-9 *; | [Y]WO02073716 (UNIV MONTREAL [CA], et al) [Y] 1-13 * page 6 - page 8; examples 1,2 ** paragraph [0022] *; | [Y]US2003215717 (MIYAKI YUKIO [JP]) [Y] 1-13 * example 7; table 2 * * paragraph [0060] * |