EP1496730 - Improving connectivity of multiple parallel conductors [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.08.2014 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.08.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.10.2014 [2014/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Essex Europe Parc Tertiaire de la Croix Rue Jean Monnet L'Européen 60200 Compiègne / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/32] | For all designated states Essex Europe Parc Tertiaire de la Croix rue Jean Monnet L'Européen 60200 Compiegne / FR | ||
Former [2007/14] | For all designated states Essex Nexans Europe Parc Tertiaire De La Croix Rue Jean Monnet L'Europeen Compiegne 60200 Compiegne / FR | ||
Former [2005/02] | For all designated states Nexans 16, rue de Monceau 75008 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Banks, Russel W. 29 Angle Street Simcoe Ontario N34 5M6 / CA | 02 /
Byrne, Michael 53 Donly Drive North Simcoe Ontario N34 5M6 / CA | [2005/02] | Representative(s) | Intès, Didier Gérard André, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158 rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2013/23] | Intès, Didier Gérard André, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | ||
Former [2009/52] | Feray, Valérie, et al Feray Lenne Conseil 39-41, Avenue Aristide Briand 92163 Antony Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2005/02] | Feray, Valérie, et al Feray Lenne Conseil 44/52, Rue de la Justice 75020 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 04300308.6 | 01.06.2004 | [2005/02] | Priority number, date | US20030453159 | 03.06.2003 Original published format: US 453159 | [2005/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1496730 | Date: | 12.01.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/02] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1496730 | Date: | 18.04.2007 | [2007/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.03.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H05K3/00, H01F27/32, H01F41/12, // H01F41/10 | [2007/16] | CPC: |
H01F41/122 (EP,US);
H01F27/323 (EP,US);
H01F2027/2838 (EP,US);
H01F41/10 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2005/02] | H05K3/00, H01F27/32, H01F41/12 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/02] | Title | German: | Verbesserung der Anschlussfähigkeit der parallele Bündleiter | [2005/02] | English: | Improving connectivity of multiple parallel conductors | [2005/02] | French: | Amélioration de la connectivité des conducteurs parallèles multiples | [2005/02] | Examination procedure | deleted | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.10.2007 | Examination requested [2007/48] | 18.12.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.05.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.10.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.05.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/40] | 28.05.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2014/40] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.12.2007 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 24.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS5936918 (HITACHI LTD) [A] 1,11,12,21 * abstract *; | [A]WO9530991 (ASTA ELEKTRODRAHT GMBH [AT]) [A] 8,9* abstract *; | [X]EP0825623 (FURUKAWA ELECTRIC CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-25 * page 1, line 5 - line 11 * * sentence 28 - sentence 40 * * page 7, line 55 - page 8, line 10; figure 1; claim - *; | [DA]US5962945 (KRENZER HANS-JOACHIM [DE], et al) [DA] 1-25 * column 3, line 18 - column 4, line 39; figure - * |