EP1503482 - A brake and an electrical machine fitted with such a brake [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.07.2009 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MOTEURS LEROY-SOMER Boulevard Marcellin Leroy 16000 Angoulême / FR | [2008/38] |
Former [2005/05] | For all designated states MOTEURS LEROY-SOMER Boulevard Marcellin Leroy 16000 Angouleme / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CARRIOT, Pascal 14 rue des Tulipes 16400, LA COURONNE / FR | [2005/05] | Representative(s) | Tanty, François Nony 11 rue Saint-Georges 75009 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2005/05] | Tanty, François Nony & Associés, 3, rue de Penthièvre 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 04300429.0 | 06.07.2004 | [2005/05] | Priority number, date | FR20030009346 | 29.07.2003 Original published format: FR 0309346 | [2005/05] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1503482 | Date: | 02.02.2005 | Language: | FR | [2005/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1503482 | Date: | 17.09.2008 | Language: | FR | [2008/38] | Type: | B9 Corrected patent specification | No.: | EP1503482 | Date: | 15.07.2009 | [2009/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.11.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H02K7/102 | [2005/05] | CPC: |
H02K7/1025 (EP);
H02K7/102 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/05] | Title | German: | Bremse und elektrische Maschine mit einer derartigen Bremse | [2005/05] | English: | A brake and an electrical machine fitted with such a brake | [2005/05] | French: | Frein et machine electrique equipée d'un tel frein | [2005/05] | Examination procedure | 24.06.2005 | Examination requested [2005/34] | 12.12.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.06.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.01.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.05.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 16.05.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.06.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 17.09.2008 | CY | 17.09.2008 | CZ | 17.09.2008 | DK | 17.09.2008 | EE | 17.09.2008 | FI | 17.09.2008 | IE | 17.09.2008 | NL | 17.09.2008 | PL | 17.09.2008 | RO | 17.09.2008 | SI | 17.09.2008 | SK | 17.09.2008 | BG | 17.12.2008 | SE | 17.12.2008 | GR | 18.12.2008 | PT | 17.02.2009 | HU | 18.03.2009 | [2011/44] |
Former [2011/32] | AT | 17.09.2008 | |
CZ | 17.09.2008 | ||
DK | 17.09.2008 | ||
EE | 17.09.2008 | ||
FI | 17.09.2008 | ||
IE | 17.09.2008 | ||
NL | 17.09.2008 | ||
PL | 17.09.2008 | ||
RO | 17.09.2008 | ||
SI | 17.09.2008 | ||
SK | 17.09.2008 | ||
BG | 17.12.2008 | ||
SE | 17.12.2008 | ||
GR | 18.12.2008 | ||
PT | 17.02.2009 | ||
HU | 18.03.2009 | ||
Former [2010/50] | AT | 17.09.2008 | |
CZ | 17.09.2008 | ||
DK | 17.09.2008 | ||
EE | 17.09.2008 | ||
FI | 17.09.2008 | ||
IE | 17.09.2008 | ||
NL | 17.09.2008 | ||
PL | 17.09.2008 | ||
RO | 17.09.2008 | ||
SI | 17.09.2008 | ||
SK | 17.09.2008 | ||
BG | 17.12.2008 | ||
SE | 17.12.2008 | ||
GR | 18.12.2008 | ||
PT | 17.02.2009 | ||
Former [2010/24] | AT | 17.09.2008 | |
CZ | 17.09.2008 | ||
DK | 17.09.2008 | ||
EE | 17.09.2008 | ||
FI | 17.09.2008 | ||
IE | 17.09.2008 | ||
NL | 17.09.2008 | ||
PL | 17.09.2008 | ||
RO | 17.09.2008 | ||
SI | 17.09.2008 | ||
SK | 17.09.2008 | ||
BG | 17.12.2008 | ||
SE | 17.12.2008 | ||
PT | 17.02.2009 | ||
Former [2010/09] | AT | 17.09.2008 | |
CZ | 17.09.2008 | ||
DK | 17.09.2008 | ||
EE | 17.09.2008 | ||
FI | 17.09.2008 | ||
IE | 17.09.2008 | ||
NL | 17.09.2008 | ||
RO | 17.09.2008 | ||
SI | 17.09.2008 | ||
SK | 17.09.2008 | ||
BG | 17.12.2008 | ||
SE | 17.12.2008 | ||
PT | 17.02.2009 | ||
Former [2009/36] | AT | 17.09.2008 | |
CZ | 17.09.2008 | ||
DK | 17.09.2008 | ||
EE | 17.09.2008 | ||
FI | 17.09.2008 | ||
IE | 17.09.2008 | ||
NL | 17.09.2008 | ||
RO | 17.09.2008 | ||
SI | 17.09.2008 | ||
SK | 17.09.2008 | ||
BG | 17.12.2008 | ||
PT | 17.02.2009 | ||
Former [2009/35] | AT | 17.09.2008 | |
CZ | 17.09.2008 | ||
DK | 17.09.2008 | ||
FI | 17.09.2008 | ||
IE | 17.09.2008 | ||
NL | 17.09.2008 | ||
RO | 17.09.2008 | ||
SI | 17.09.2008 | ||
SK | 17.09.2008 | ||
BG | 17.12.2008 | ||
PT | 17.02.2009 | ||
Former [2009/26] | AT | 17.09.2008 | |
CZ | 17.09.2008 | ||
FI | 17.09.2008 | ||
NL | 17.09.2008 | ||
RO | 17.09.2008 | ||
SI | 17.09.2008 | ||
SK | 17.09.2008 | ||
BG | 17.12.2008 | ||
PT | 17.02.2009 | ||
Former [2009/24] | AT | 17.09.2008 | |
CZ | 17.09.2008 | ||
FI | 17.09.2008 | ||
SI | 17.09.2008 | ||
SK | 17.09.2008 | ||
BG | 17.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/23] | AT | 17.09.2008 | |
FI | 17.09.2008 | ||
SI | 17.09.2008 | ||
BG | 17.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/15] | AT | 17.09.2008 | |
FI | 17.09.2008 | ||
SI | 17.09.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]FR2305328 (PINGON SA [FR]) [X] 1,4,6-8,11,12 * page 5, line 37 - line 38; figure 1 * * page 1, line 1 - line 3 * * page 7, line 8 - line 9 * [Y] 2; | [YA]US2003057037 (MAURICE KEVIN L [US]) [Y] 2 * abstract * * paragraphs [0003] , [0028] , [0035] *[A] 1,4,10,12 |