EP1505030 - Electrical machine, in particular for an elevator [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.08.2009 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MOTEURS LEROY-SOMER Boulevard Marcellin Leroy 16000 Angoulême / FR | [2008/43] |
Former [2005/06] | For all designated states MOTEURS LEROY-SOMER Boulevard Marcellin Leroy 16000 Angouleme / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gauthier Pascal Le Bourg 16290 Asnieres-sur-Nouere / FR | 02 /
Gilles, Christophe 33 rue du Grand Maine 16730 Fleac / FR | 03 /
Beynaud Pascal 52 rue du petit Rouillac 16290 Saint-Saturnin / FR | 04 /
Rey Christian 24 rue de la Futaie 16730 Linars / FR | [2005/06] | Representative(s) | Tanty, François Nony 11 rue Saint-Georges 75009 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2005/06] | Tanty, François Nony & Associés, 3, rue de Penthièvre 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 04300482.9 | 27.07.2004 | [2005/06] | Priority number, date | FR20030009784 | 08.08.2003 Original published format: FR 0309784 | [2005/06] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1505030 | Date: | 09.02.2005 | Language: | FR | [2005/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1505030 | Date: | 22.10.2008 | Language: | FR | [2008/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.11.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B66B11/04, H02K7/10 | [2005/06] | CPC: |
H02K7/1016 (EP,US);
H02K7/102 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/06] | Title | German: | Elektrische Maschine, insbesondere für einen Aufzug | [2005/06] | English: | Electrical machine, in particular for an elevator | [2005/06] | French: | Machine électrique, notamment pour ascenseur | [2005/06] | Examination procedure | 09.06.2005 | Examination requested [2005/32] | 23.05.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.12.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.05.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.09.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 09.09.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.07.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 22.10.2008 | CY | 22.10.2008 | CZ | 22.10.2008 | DK | 22.10.2008 | EE | 22.10.2008 | FI | 22.10.2008 | IE | 22.10.2008 | NL | 22.10.2008 | PL | 22.10.2008 | RO | 22.10.2008 | SI | 22.10.2008 | SK | 22.10.2008 | TR | 22.10.2008 | BG | 22.01.2009 | SE | 22.01.2009 | GR | 23.01.2009 | PT | 23.03.2009 | HU | 23.04.2009 | [2011/43] |
Former [2011/32] | AT | 22.10.2008 | |
CZ | 22.10.2008 | ||
DK | 22.10.2008 | ||
EE | 22.10.2008 | ||
FI | 22.10.2008 | ||
IE | 22.10.2008 | ||
NL | 22.10.2008 | ||
PL | 22.10.2008 | ||
RO | 22.10.2008 | ||
SI | 22.10.2008 | ||
SK | 22.10.2008 | ||
BG | 22.01.2009 | ||
SE | 22.01.2009 | ||
GR | 23.01.2009 | ||
PT | 23.03.2009 | ||
HU | 23.04.2009 | ||
Former [2010/50] | AT | 22.10.2008 | |
CZ | 22.10.2008 | ||
DK | 22.10.2008 | ||
EE | 22.10.2008 | ||
FI | 22.10.2008 | ||
IE | 22.10.2008 | ||
NL | 22.10.2008 | ||
PL | 22.10.2008 | ||
RO | 22.10.2008 | ||
SI | 22.10.2008 | ||
SK | 22.10.2008 | ||
BG | 22.01.2009 | ||
SE | 22.01.2009 | ||
GR | 23.01.2009 | ||
PT | 23.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/44] | AT | 22.10.2008 | |
CZ | 22.10.2008 | ||
DK | 22.10.2008 | ||
EE | 22.10.2008 | ||
FI | 22.10.2008 | ||
IE | 22.10.2008 | ||
NL | 22.10.2008 | ||
PL | 22.10.2008 | ||
RO | 22.10.2008 | ||
SI | 22.10.2008 | ||
SK | 22.10.2008 | ||
BG | 22.01.2009 | ||
SE | 22.01.2009 | ||
PT | 23.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/40] | AT | 22.10.2008 | |
CZ | 22.10.2008 | ||
DK | 22.10.2008 | ||
EE | 22.10.2008 | ||
FI | 22.10.2008 | ||
IE | 22.10.2008 | ||
NL | 22.10.2008 | ||
PL | 22.10.2008 | ||
RO | 22.10.2008 | ||
SI | 22.10.2008 | ||
BG | 22.01.2009 | ||
SE | 22.01.2009 | ||
PT | 23.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/36] | AT | 22.10.2008 | |
DK | 22.10.2008 | ||
EE | 22.10.2008 | ||
FI | 22.10.2008 | ||
IE | 22.10.2008 | ||
NL | 22.10.2008 | ||
PL | 22.10.2008 | ||
RO | 22.10.2008 | ||
SI | 22.10.2008 | ||
BG | 22.01.2009 | ||
PT | 23.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/35] | AT | 22.10.2008 | |
DK | 22.10.2008 | ||
FI | 22.10.2008 | ||
IE | 22.10.2008 | ||
NL | 22.10.2008 | ||
PL | 22.10.2008 | ||
SI | 22.10.2008 | ||
BG | 22.01.2009 | ||
PT | 23.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/26] | AT | 22.10.2008 | |
FI | 22.10.2008 | ||
NL | 22.10.2008 | ||
PL | 22.10.2008 | ||
SI | 22.10.2008 | ||
BG | 22.01.2009 | ||
PT | 23.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/23] | AT | 22.10.2008 | |
BG | 22.01.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5018603 (ITO HIROYASU [JP]) [A] 1-12 * column 3, line 33 - column 6, line 4; figures 4-9 *; | [A]EP0834463 (INVENTIO AG [CH]) [A] 1-12 * abstract *; | [A]EP0970912 (HITACHI LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1-12* abstract *; | [A]EP1057772 (TEIJIN SEIKI CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-12 * column 3, paragraph 14 - column 4, paragraph 20; figure 1 * |