EP1650984 - Call handling package associated with a telephone number [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.06.2007 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.05.2009 | Change - representative | published on 24.06.2009 [2009/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HEWLETT-PACKARD DEVELOPMENT COMPANY, L.P. 20555 S.H. 249 Houston, TX 77070 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2006/17] | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Development Company, L.P. 20555 S.H. 249 Houston, TX 77070 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hyerle, Robert, HP Centre de Competences France 45 impasse du Capiton 38190 Bernin / FR | [2006/17] | Representative(s) | Lloyd, Richard Graham, et al Hewlett Packard Espanola, SL Legal Department Cami de Can Graells, 1-21 08174 Saint Cugat del Vallés Barcelona / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2009/26] | Lloyd, Richard Graham, et al Hewlett Packard CCF IP Section - Legal Department 5, Avenue Raymond Chanas-Eybens 38053 Grenoble Cedex 09 / FR | ||
Former [2006/17] | Lloyd, Richard Graham, et al HP Centre de Competences France IP Section, Legal Dept 5 av. Raymond Chanas 38053 Grenoble Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 04300706.1 | 21.10.2004 | [2006/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1650984 | Date: | 26.04.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.04.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q3/00, H04Q3/545 | [2006/17] | CPC: |
H04Q3/54525 (EP,US);
H04Q3/0033 (EP,US);
H04Q3/0054 (EP,US);
H04Q3/54566 (EP,US);
H04Q3/54583 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2007/01] |
Former [2006/17] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Einer Telefonnummer zugeordnetes Anrufvermittlungspaket | [2006/17] | English: | Call handling package associated with a telephone number | [2006/17] | French: | Algorithme de traitement d'appel associé à un numéro de téléphone | [2006/17] | Examination procedure | 27.10.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/28] | 26.02.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2007/28] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 07.12.2006 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 07.12.2006 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 07.12.2006 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 07.12.2006 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 07.12.2006 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 07.12.2006 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 07.12.2006 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 07.12.2006 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 07.12.2006 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 07.12.2006 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 07.12.2006 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 07.12.2006 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 07.12.2006 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 07.12.2006 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 07.12.2006 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 07.12.2006 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 07.12.2006 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 07.12.2006 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 07.12.2006 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 07.12.2006 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 07.12.2006 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 07.12.2006 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 07.12.2006 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 07.12.2006 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 07.12.2006 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 07.12.2006 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 07.12.2006 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2006 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]EP0505092 (AMERICAN TELEPHONE & TELEGRAPH [US]) [X] 1-3,6-8,11-16,18-21,23-25 * column 5, line 41 - column 7, line 43 * [A] 4,5,9,10,17,22; | [XA]US5524145 (PARKER ALITA M [US]) [X] 1,3-5,8-12,15-17,20-22,25 * column 2, line 25 - column 5, line 5 * * column 8, line 58 - column 11, line 10 * [A] 2,6,7,13,14,18,19,23,24; | [XA]US6075854 (COPLEY JEFFREY D [US], et al) [X] 1-4,6-12,15-22,25 * column 1, line 58 - column 2, line 20 * * column 3, line 45 - column 5, line 64 * * column 6, line 35 - column 8, line 20 *[A] 5,13,14,23,24 |