EP1530238 - Bolometric detecting device for infrared radiation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.08.2009 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.08.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.09.2009 [2009/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ULIS Les Iles Cordées 38113 Veurey Voroize / FR | [2005/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Vilain, M. Michel 1 Rue des Terrasses 38450, Saint Georges de Commiers / FR | [2005/19] | Representative(s) | Vuillermoz, Bruno, et al Cabinet Laurent & Charras "Le Contemporain" 50, Chemin de la Bruyère 69574 Dardilly Cédex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Vuillermoz, Bruno, et al Cabinet Laurent & Charras "Le Contemporain" 50, Chemin de la Bruyère 69574 Dardilly Cédex / FR | ||
Former [2005/19] | Vuillermoz, Bruno, et al Cabinet Laurent & Charras B.P. 32 20, rue Louis Chirpaz 69131 Ecully Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 04300759.0 | 04.11.2004 | [2005/19] | Priority number, date | FR20030013181 | 10.11.2003 Original published format: FR 0313181 | [2005/19] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1530238 | Date: | 11.05.2005 | Language: | FR | [2005/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1530238 | Date: | 15.10.2008 | Language: | FR | [2008/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.03.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H01L27/144, H01L27/146 | [2005/19] | CPC: |
H01L27/144 (EP,US);
G01J5/20 (EP,US);
H01L27/146 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [2006/05] |
Former [2005/19] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Bolometrische Detektorvorrichtung für infrarote Strahlung | [2005/19] | English: | Bolometric detecting device for infrared radiation | [2005/19] | French: | Dispositif de détection de rayonnements infrarouges à détecteurs bolométriques | [2005/19] | Examination procedure | 29.06.2005 | Examination requested [2005/34] | 12.11.2005 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 21.03.2006 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SI, SK, TR | 21.12.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03) | 25.03.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.06.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.08.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 23.08.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.07.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 02.01.2006 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 02.01.2006 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 02.01.2006 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 02.01.2006 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 02.01.2006 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 02.01.2006 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 02.01.2006 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 02.01.2006 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 02.01.2006 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 02.01.2006 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 02.01.2006 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 02.01.2006 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 02.01.2006 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 02.01.2006 | IS   M01   Not yet paid | 02.01.2006 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 02.01.2006 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 02.01.2006 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 02.01.2006 | PL   M01   Not yet paid | 02.01.2006 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 02.01.2006 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 02.01.2006 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 02.01.2006 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 02.01.2006 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2200246 (PLESSEY CO PLC) [A] 1-3 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0721226 (TEXAS INSTRUMENTS INC [US]) [A] 1-3 * the whole document *; | [XA]US5554849 (GATES JAMES L [US]) [X] 1,2 * column 2, line 51 - column 8, line 67; figures 1-4 * [A] 3; | [XA]US6064066 (BEVAN MALCOLM J [US], et al) [X] 1,2 * column 3, line 53 - column 24, line 42; figures 2a-6b,9a-30b * [A] 3; | [A]US6080987 (BELCHER JAMES F [US], et al) [A] 1-3 * the whole document *; | [A]US6157404 (MARSHALL CHARLES M [US], et al) [A] 1-3* the whole document *; | [XA]US6441413 (ENDOH TSUTOMU [JP]) [X] 1,2 * column 4, line 27 - column 13, line 54; figures 1-26 * [A] 3 |