EP1578167 - Telecommunication switch and operating method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.04.2009 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Alcatel Lucent 54, rue la Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2007/14] | For all designated states Alcatel Lucent 54 rue La Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2005/38] | For all designated states ALCATEL 54, rue la Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schubert, Rolf Kiefernweg 45 71665 Vaihingen/Enz / DE | 02 /
Schmidt, Hartmut Nussbaumweg 8 71723 Grossbottwar / DE | [2005/38] | Representative(s) | Schmidt, Werner Karl Alcatel Lucent Intellectual Property & Standards 70430 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/13] | Schmidt, Werner Karl Alcatel Lucent Intellectual Property & Standards 70430 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [2005/38] | Kohler Schmid Möbus Patentanwälte Ruppmannstrasse 27 70565 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 04360026.1 | 09.03.2004 | [2005/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1578167 | Date: | 21.09.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1578167 | Date: | 18.06.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.08.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q11/04, H04J3/14 | [2005/38] | CPC: |
H04J3/14 (EP,US);
H04Q2213/13003 (EP,US);
H04Q2213/13167 (EP,US);
H04Q2213/1334 (EP,US);
H04Q2213/13341 (EP,US);
H04Q2213/13367 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/38] | Title | German: | Telekommunikationsvermittlungssystem und Betriebsverfahren | [2005/38] | English: | Telecommunication switch and operating method | [2005/38] | French: | Commutateur de télécommunications et procédé de fonctionnement | [2005/38] | Examination procedure | 19.10.2004 | Examination requested [2005/38] | 18.01.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.05.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 06.05.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.03.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 18.06.2008 | BE | 18.06.2008 | CY | 18.06.2008 | CZ | 18.06.2008 | DK | 18.06.2008 | EE | 18.06.2008 | FI | 18.06.2008 | IT | 18.06.2008 | NL | 18.06.2008 | PL | 18.06.2008 | RO | 18.06.2008 | SI | 18.06.2008 | SK | 18.06.2008 | TR | 18.06.2008 | BG | 18.09.2008 | SE | 18.09.2008 | GR | 19.09.2008 | ES | 29.09.2008 | PT | 18.11.2008 | HU | 19.12.2008 | IE | 09.03.2009 | LU | 09.03.2009 | [2011/43] |
Former [2011/32] | AT | 18.06.2008 | |
BE | 18.06.2008 | ||
CZ | 18.06.2008 | ||
DK | 18.06.2008 | ||
EE | 18.06.2008 | ||
FI | 18.06.2008 | ||
IT | 18.06.2008 | ||
NL | 18.06.2008 | ||
PL | 18.06.2008 | ||
RO | 18.06.2008 | ||
SI | 18.06.2008 | ||
SK | 18.06.2008 | ||
BG | 18.09.2008 | ||
SE | 18.09.2008 | ||
GR | 19.09.2008 | ||
ES | 29.09.2008 | ||
PT | 18.11.2008 | ||
HU | 19.12.2008 | ||
IE | 09.03.2009 | ||
LU | 09.03.2009 | ||
Former [2011/21] | AT | 18.06.2008 | |
BE | 18.06.2008 | ||
CZ | 18.06.2008 | ||
DK | 18.06.2008 | ||
EE | 18.06.2008 | ||
FI | 18.06.2008 | ||
IT | 18.06.2008 | ||
NL | 18.06.2008 | ||
PL | 18.06.2008 | ||
RO | 18.06.2008 | ||
SI | 18.06.2008 | ||
SK | 18.06.2008 | ||
BG | 18.09.2008 | ||
SE | 18.09.2008 | ||
GR | 19.09.2008 | ||
ES | 29.09.2008 | ||
PT | 18.11.2008 | ||
IE | 09.03.2009 | ||
LU | 09.03.2009 | ||
Former [2010/50] | AT | 18.06.2008 | |
BE | 18.06.2008 | ||
CZ | 18.06.2008 | ||
DK | 18.06.2008 | ||
EE | 18.06.2008 | ||
FI | 18.06.2008 | ||
IT | 18.06.2008 | ||
NL | 18.06.2008 | ||
PL | 18.06.2008 | ||
RO | 18.06.2008 | ||
SI | 18.06.2008 | ||
SK | 18.06.2008 | ||
BG | 18.09.2008 | ||
SE | 18.09.2008 | ||
GR | 19.09.2008 | ||
ES | 29.09.2008 | ||
PT | 18.11.2008 | ||
IE | 09.03.2009 | ||
Former [2010/07] | AT | 18.06.2008 | |
BE | 18.06.2008 | ||
CZ | 18.06.2008 | ||
DK | 18.06.2008 | ||
EE | 18.06.2008 | ||
FI | 18.06.2008 | ||
IT | 18.06.2008 | ||
NL | 18.06.2008 | ||
PL | 18.06.2008 | ||
RO | 18.06.2008 | ||
SI | 18.06.2008 | ||
SK | 18.06.2008 | ||
BG | 18.09.2008 | ||
SE | 18.09.2008 | ||
ES | 29.09.2008 | ||
PT | 18.11.2008 | ||
IE | 09.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/40] | AT | 18.06.2008 | |
BE | 18.06.2008 | ||
CZ | 18.06.2008 | ||
DK | 18.06.2008 | ||
EE | 18.06.2008 | ||
FI | 18.06.2008 | ||
IT | 18.06.2008 | ||
NL | 18.06.2008 | ||
PL | 18.06.2008 | ||
RO | 18.06.2008 | ||
SI | 18.06.2008 | ||
SK | 18.06.2008 | ||
BG | 18.09.2008 | ||
SE | 18.09.2008 | ||
ES | 29.09.2008 | ||
PT | 18.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/23] | AT | 18.06.2008 | |
BE | 18.06.2008 | ||
CZ | 18.06.2008 | ||
DK | 18.06.2008 | ||
EE | 18.06.2008 | ||
FI | 18.06.2008 | ||
NL | 18.06.2008 | ||
PL | 18.06.2008 | ||
RO | 18.06.2008 | ||
SI | 18.06.2008 | ||
SK | 18.06.2008 | ||
BG | 18.09.2008 | ||
SE | 18.09.2008 | ||
ES | 29.09.2008 | ||
PT | 18.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/22] | AT | 18.06.2008 | |
BE | 18.06.2008 | ||
CZ | 18.06.2008 | ||
DK | 18.06.2008 | ||
EE | 18.06.2008 | ||
FI | 18.06.2008 | ||
NL | 18.06.2008 | ||
PL | 18.06.2008 | ||
RO | 18.06.2008 | ||
SI | 18.06.2008 | ||
SK | 18.06.2008 | ||
SE | 18.09.2008 | ||
ES | 29.09.2008 | ||
PT | 18.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/20] | AT | 18.06.2008 | |
BE | 18.06.2008 | ||
CZ | 18.06.2008 | ||
DK | 18.06.2008 | ||
FI | 18.06.2008 | ||
NL | 18.06.2008 | ||
PL | 18.06.2008 | ||
RO | 18.06.2008 | ||
SI | 18.06.2008 | ||
SK | 18.06.2008 | ||
SE | 18.09.2008 | ||
ES | 29.09.2008 | ||
PT | 18.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/14] | AT | 18.06.2008 | |
BE | 18.06.2008 | ||
CZ | 18.06.2008 | ||
FI | 18.06.2008 | ||
NL | 18.06.2008 | ||
PL | 18.06.2008 | ||
RO | 18.06.2008 | ||
SI | 18.06.2008 | ||
SK | 18.06.2008 | ||
SE | 18.09.2008 | ||
ES | 29.09.2008 | ||
PT | 18.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/13] | AT | 18.06.2008 | |
BE | 18.06.2008 | ||
CZ | 18.06.2008 | ||
FI | 18.06.2008 | ||
NL | 18.06.2008 | ||
PL | 18.06.2008 | ||
SI | 18.06.2008 | ||
SK | 18.06.2008 | ||
SE | 18.09.2008 | ||
ES | 29.09.2008 | ||
PT | 18.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/09] | AT | 18.06.2008 | |
FI | 18.06.2008 | ||
NL | 18.06.2008 | ||
PL | 18.06.2008 | ||
SI | 18.06.2008 | ||
SE | 18.09.2008 | ||
ES | 29.09.2008 | ||
PT | 18.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/07] | AT | 18.06.2008 | |
FI | 18.06.2008 | ||
NL | 18.06.2008 | ||
PL | 18.06.2008 | ||
SI | 18.06.2008 | ||
SE | 18.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/01] | AT | 18.06.2008 | |
FI | 18.06.2008 | ||
NL | 18.06.2008 | ||
PL | 18.06.2008 | ||
SI | 18.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/50] | AT | 18.06.2008 | |
FI | 18.06.2008 | ||
PL | 18.06.2008 | ||
SI | 18.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/48] | SI | 18.06.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2003043734 (TAKEGUCHI KOJI [JP]) [A] 1-10 * abstract *; | [A]US6690644 (GORSHE STEVEN S [US]) [A] 1-10* abstract * |