EP1480457 - Method and system for managing the bandwidth of a video-on-demand service [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.04.2016 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.04.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.05.2016 [2016/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Orange 78, rue Olivier de Serres 75015 Paris / FR | [2013/39] |
Former [2004/48] | For all designated states FRANCE TELECOM 6, Place d'Alleray 75015 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yclon, Joel 14, rue de Saint Laurent 35700 Rennes / FR | [2004/48] | Representative(s) | Vidon Brevets & Stratégie 16B, rue de Jouanet BP 90333 35703 Rennes Cedex 7 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2004/48] | Vidon, Patrice Cabinet Vidon 16 B, rue Jouanet - B.P. 90333 Technopole Atalante 35703 Rennes Cedex 7 / FR | Application number, filing date | 04364037.4 | 18.05.2004 | [2004/48] | Priority number, date | FR20030006117 | 21.05.2003 Original published format: FR 0306117 | [2004/48] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1480457 | Date: | 24.11.2004 | Language: | FR | [2004/48] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1480457 | Date: | 08.02.2006 | [2006/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.12.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H04N7/173, H04N7/16 | [2006/06] | CPC: |
H04N7/173 (EP);
H04N21/2385 (EP);
H04N21/2402 (EP);
H04N21/26241 (EP);
H04N21/47202 (EP);
H04N21/6405 (EP);
H04N7/16 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2004/48] | H04N7/12 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/48] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Steuerung der Bandbreite von einem Video-auf-Anfrage-Dienst | [2004/48] | English: | Method and system for managing the bandwidth of a video-on-demand service | [2004/48] | French: | Procédé et système pour la gestion de la bande passante d'un service de vidéo-à-la-demande | [2004/48] | Examination procedure | 10.03.2006 | Examination requested [2006/18] | 27.06.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.10.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.06.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.11.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.12.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/20] | 11.01.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2016/20] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.06.2006 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 26.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 29.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 26.05.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2015 | 12   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]WO0078031 (SCIENT ATLANTA INC HUBERT J BA [US]) [X] 1-3,5,6,8-25 * page 3, line 22 - page 4, line 32 * * page 18, line 20 - page 19, line 20 * * page 20, line 19 - line 26 * * page 22, line 33 - page 23, line 27 * * figure 4 * * claims 1-3,7-11 * [Y] 4,7; | [A]WO0131605 (NCUBE CORP [US]) [A] 1-3,5-9,11,13-16,19-25 * page 3, line 2 - page 5, line 11 * * page 8, line 13 - page 12, line 7 * * figure 1 * * claims 1-3,7,12-16,21,22,25,30-34 *; | [Y]WO0219249 (REARDEN STEEL INC [US]) [Y] 7 * page 14, line 11 - line 20 * * page 26, line 20 - line 29 * * claim 8 *; | [YA]US2002170063 (ANSARI AHMAD [US], et al) [Y] 4 * paragraph [0021] * * paragraph [0023] * * paragraph [0027] * * paragraph [0030] * * paragraphs [0046] , [0047] * * paragraph [0084] * * figure 5 * * claims 11,12,14,15,17 * [A] 1,19-25; | [A]US2003061619 (GIAMMARESSI TOM [US]) [A] 1,2,8,11,13,21-25 * paragraph [0003] * * paragraphs [0008] , [0009] * * paragraph [0016] * * paragraph [0027] * * paragraphs [0030] - [0036] ** figures 1,2 *; | [A]US2003093799 (KAUFFMAN MARC W [US], et al) [A] 1-4,19-25 * paragraphs [0073] - [0085] * * figures 5A,5B,9 * |