EP1574875 - GPS receiver carried on fast moving vehicles [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 22.05.2015 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.05.2015 | Refusal of application | published on 24.06.2015 [2015/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Ericsson Mobile Communications AB 221 88 Lund / SE | [2005/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Klinghult, Gunnar Örnvägen 45 227 31 Lund / SE | 02 /
Hansson, Björn Barkgatan 12 214 22 Malmö / SE | 03 /
Camp, William O. 400 N. Boundary Street 27514 Chapel Hill NC / US | [2005/37] | Representative(s) | Banzer, Hans-Jörg, et al Kraus & Weisert Patentanwälte PartGmbB Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/32] | Banzer, Hans-Jörg, et al Kraus & Weisert Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/34] | Frank, Veit Peter, et al Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/37] | Sigh, Erik, et al Zacco Denmark A/S Hans Bekkevolds Allé 7 2900 Hellerup / DK | Application number, filing date | 04388018.6 | 09.03.2004 | [2005/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1574875 | Date: | 14.09.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.08.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G01S5/02 | [2005/37] | CPC: |
G01S19/26 (EP,KR,US);
G01S19/235 (EP,KR,US);
G01S19/254 (EP,KR,US);
G01S19/256 (EP,KR,US);
G01S19/27 (EP,KR,US);
G01S19/29 (EP,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/37] | Title | German: | Auf schnellfahrenden Fahrzeugen installierter GPS-Empfänger | [2005/37] | English: | GPS receiver carried on fast moving vehicles | [2005/37] | French: | Récepteur GPS monté sur véhicules rapides | [2005/37] | Examination procedure | 13.03.2006 | Examination requested [2006/19] | 17.10.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.02.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.01.2015 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 27.01.2015 | 27.01.2015 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 04.02.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2015/26] | 14.02.2015 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2015/26] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.10.2007 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 11.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 12.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2015 | 12   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US5703597 (YU JIMMY [US], et al) [X] 1-6,9-15,19 * the whole document * [Y] 7,8,16-18; | [XY]US5931890 (SUWA YOSHIHISA [JP], et al) [X] 1-6,9-15,19 * abstract * * column 2, line 66 - column 4, line 18 * * column 6, line 38 - line 42 * * column 7, line 65 - column 8, line 22 * [Y] 7,8,16-18; | [Y]US5991692 (SPENCER II LARRY E [US], et al) [Y] 7,8,16-18 * figures 2,3 * * column 4, line 31 - line 49 * * column 5, line 5 - line 8 * * column 5, line 51 - line 57 * * column 8, line 10 - line 35 * * column 9, line 5 - line 8 *; | [A]US6397146 (BRUNER CHARLES P [US]) [A] 1-19 * figure 1 * * column 3, line 32 - line 53 * * column 5, line 20 - line 27 ** claim 2 * |