EP1610131 - Flexible probe [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.02.2007 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 27.08.2008 [2008/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Capres A/S DTU Bygn. 346 ost 2800 Lyngby / DK | [2005/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Petersen, Peter Rasmus Ebsen Tietgensvej 3 3400 Hillerod / DK | 02 /
Hansen, Jesper Erdman Stengards Allé 197 2860 Soborg / DK | 03 /
Nielsen, Peter Folmer Nordtoftevej 31 3520 Farum / DK | [2005/52] | Representative(s) | Nielsen, Henrik Sten, et al Budde Schou A/S Hausergade 3 1128 Copenhagen K / DK | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Nielsen, Henrik Sten, et al Budde Schou A/S Vester So̸gade 10 1601 Copenhagen V / DK | ||
Former [2005/52] | Nielsen, Henrik Sten, et al Budde, Schou & Ostenfeld A/S Vester Sögade 10 1601 Copenhagen V / DK | Application number, filing date | 04388039.2 | 21.06.2004 | [2005/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1610131 | Date: | 28.12.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.11.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G01R1/067 | [2005/52] | CPC: |
G01R27/2676 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2006/36] |
Former [2005/52] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Flexible Sonde | [2005/52] | English: | Flexible probe | [2005/52] | French: | Sonde flexible | [2005/52] | Examination procedure | 29.06.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/10] | 23.10.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2007/10] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 04.08.2006 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 04.08.2006 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 04.08.2006 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 04.08.2006 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 04.08.2006 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 04.08.2006 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 04.08.2006 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 04.08.2006 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 04.08.2006 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 04.08.2006 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 04.08.2006 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 04.08.2006 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 04.08.2006 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 04.08.2006 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 04.08.2006 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 04.08.2006 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 04.08.2006 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 04.08.2006 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 04.08.2006 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 04.08.2006 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 04.08.2006 | PL   M01   Not yet paid | 04.08.2006 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 04.08.2006 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 04.08.2006 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 04.08.2006 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 04.08.2006 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 04.08.2006 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 04.08.2006 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2006 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5347226 (BACHMANN WALTER A [US], et al) [X] 1-33 * figure 15 *; | [A]US5929438 (SUZUKI YOSHIHIKO [JP], et al) [A] 1* figure 2a *; | [A]US6343369 (SAUNDERS J LYNN [US], et al) [A] 8-16 * figures 25a-25d *; | [A]US6507204 (KANAMARU MASATOSHI [JP], et al) [A] 4-7 * figure 2 * |