EP1602285 - A process for preparing a chewable pet food [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.04.2009 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.04.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.05.2009 [2009/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gaines Treats Limited Ashgrove House, Kill Avenue, Dun Laoghaire County Dublin / IE | [2005/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dempsey, Paul 11 Inisboffin Dalkey County Dublin / IE | 02 /
Walsh, John 12 Oakridge Clonattin Gorey County Wexford / IE | [2005/49] | Representative(s) | O'Connor, Donal Henry Cruickshank 8a Sandyford Business Centre Sandyford Dublin 18 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/49] | O'Connor, Donal Henry Cruickshank & Company 8A Sandyford Business Centre Sandyford Dublin 18 / IE | Application number, filing date | 04394032.9 | 04.06.2004 | [2005/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1602285 | Date: | 07.12.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.12.2004 | Classification | IPC: | A23K1/14, A23K1/18, A23K1/00 | [2005/49] | CPC: |
A23K50/42 (EP,US);
A23K20/147 (EP,US);
A23K40/20 (EP,US);
A23K40/25 (EP,US);
Y10S426/805 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/49] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von einem kaubaren Haustierfuttermittel | [2005/49] | English: | A process for preparing a chewable pet food | [2005/49] | French: | Procédé pour la préparation d'un aliment masticable pour animaux domestiques | [2005/49] | Examination procedure | 15.05.2006 | Examination requested [2006/26] | 06.11.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.03.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.04.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.10.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/19] | 03.12.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2008 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2004147516 ; | [DX]US5665152 (BASSI SUKH [US], et al) [DX] 1-6,8,10,12,13,15-24 * column 4, line 5 - line 13; example 1 *; | [DA]WO0013521 (NATURAL POLYMER INTERNATIONAL [US]) [DA] 1-24 * example 6; claims 10,16,17,23 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20031205), vol. 2003, no. 12, & JP2004147516 A 20040527 (HISHINUMA MINORU) [A] 1-4,6,12,16-24 * abstract * |