EP1486770 - Time resolved optical measuring method and device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.09.2007 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.09.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.10.2007 [2007/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states WALLAC OY P.O. Box 10 20101 Turku / FI | [2004/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Salmelainen, Pauli Rymättylänkatu 19 C 15 20740 Turku / FI | [2004/51] | Representative(s) | Pirhonen, Kari Lennart Patenttitoimisto Kari Pirhonen Oy P.O. Box 71 20101 Turku / FI | [N/P] |
Former [2004/51] | Pirhonen, Kari Lennart Patenttitoimisto Kari Pirhonen Oy, P.O. Box 71 20101 Turku / FI | Application number, filing date | 04396038.4 | 09.06.2004 | [2004/51] | Priority number, date | FI20030000867 | 10.06.2003 Original published format: FI 20030867 | [2004/51] | Filing language | FI | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1486770 | Date: | 15.12.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.09.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G01N21/25, G01N21/64 | [2004/51] | CPC: |
G01N21/6408 (EP,US);
G01N2021/6463 (EP,US);
G01N2021/6484 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/51] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur zeitaufgelösten Messung | [2004/51] | English: | Time resolved optical measuring method and device | [2004/51] | French: | Procédé et appareil de mesure à résolution temporelle | [2004/51] | Examination procedure | 15.06.2005 | Examination requested [2005/33] | 29.11.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.04.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/41] | 22.05.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2007/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2007 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2001007496 (MODLIN DOUGLAS N [US], et al) [A] 1-12 * figures 5,10,18 *; | [A]US2002176801 (GIEBELER ROBERT H [US], et al) [A] 1-12 * figure 10 *; | [A]US6488892 (BURTON WILLIAM G [US], et al) [A] 1-12 * figures 3,22-25,30-32 *; | [X]US6538735 (DUEBENDORFER JUERG [US], et al) [X] 1-12 * figures 2,5 *; | [X] - SEETHALA R, "C. ALPHA SCREEN", HANDBOOK OF DRUG SCREENING, XX, XX, (2001), pages 106 - 128, XP008028242 [X] 1-12 * figure 19 * | [A] - "AlphascreenTM", ANNOUNCEMENT PERKIN ELMER CETUS, XX, XX, (2003), pages 1 - 12, XP002272309 [A] 1-12 * figure 1 * |