EP1569276 - Micro-optics on optoelectronics [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.10.2006 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.10.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.11.2006 [2006/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Heptagon Oy Tekniikantie 12 02150 Espoo / FI | [2005/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rudmann, Hartmut Löwenstrasse 21 8400 Winterthur / CH | 02 /
Rossi, Markus Blumenaustrasse 3 8645 Jona / CH | [2005/35] | Representative(s) | Frei Patent Attorneys Frei Patentanwaltsbüro AG Hagenholzstrasse 85 8050 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2005/35] | Frei Patent Attorneys Frei Patentanwaltsbüro Postfach 1771 8032 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 04405110.0 | 27.02.2004 | [2005/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1569276 | Date: | 31.08.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.01.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H01L27/146, H01L31/0232 | [2005/35] | CPC: |
H01L27/14685 (EP,US);
H01L27/14 (KR);
H01L24/97 (EP,US);
H01L25/167 (EP,US);
H01L27/146 (EP,US);
H01L27/14625 (EP,US);
H01L27/14687 (EP,US);
H01L31/0232 (KR);
H01L2224/48227 (EP,US);
H01L2924/12041 (EP,US);
H01L2924/12042 (EP,US);
H01L2924/12044 (EP,US);
H01L2924/14 (EP,US);
H01L2924/15311 (EP,US);
H01L2924/1815 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
H01L2224/48091, H01L2924/00014 (EP,US);
H01L2924/12042, H01L2924/00 (US,EP);
H01L2924/12044, H01L2924/00 (US,EP);
H01L2924/14, H01L2924/00 (EP,US); | Designated contracting states | [2006/20] |
Former [2005/35] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Microoptik auf Optoelektronik | [2005/35] | English: | Micro-optics on optoelectronics | [2005/35] | French: | Micro-optiques sur optoélectroniques | [2005/35] | Examination procedure | 01.03.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/48] | 29.06.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2006/48] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 06.04.2006 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 06.04.2006 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 06.04.2006 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 06.04.2006 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 06.04.2006 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 06.04.2006 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 06.04.2006 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 06.04.2006 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 06.04.2006 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 06.04.2006 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 06.04.2006 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 06.04.2006 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 06.04.2006 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 06.04.2006 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 06.04.2006 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 06.04.2006 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 06.04.2006 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 06.04.2006 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 06.04.2006 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 06.04.2006 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 06.04.2006 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 06.04.2006 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 06.04.2006 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 06.04.2006 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 06.04.2006 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 06.04.2006 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 06.04.2006 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2006 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2002353763 ; | [X]US2001032702 (FELDMAN MICHAEL R [US], et al) [X] 1,17-19 * figures 1,3a,4a * * paragraph [0038] *; | [X]US2002053742 (HATA FUMIO [JP], et al) [X] 22,26 * figures 13-15,21-23 *; | [X]EP1239519 (CANON KK [JP]) [X] 1,17-19 * figures 7-9 *; | [X]EP1389804 (AGILENT TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]) [X] 1-3,20,21,27 * paragraphs [0021] , [0023] , [0027] * * figures 2,3 *; | [X] - MICHAEL T GALE, "Replication technology for micro-optics and optical microsystems", PROCEEDINGS OF SPIE- THE INTERNATIONAL SOCIETY FOR OPTICAL ENGINEERING SPIE-INT. SOC. OPT. ENG USA, BELLINGHAM, WA, (2003), vol. 5177, pages 113 - 120, XP002299415 [X] 1-3,8,9,20,21,27 * figures 1,8 * * pages 117,118 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1117/12.507666 | [X] - DANNBERG P ET AL, "WAFER SCALE INTEGRATION OF MICRO-OPTIC AND OPTOELECTRONIC ELEMENTS BY POLYMER UV REACTION MOULDING", PROCEEDINGS OF THE SPIE, SPIE, BELLINGHAM, VA, US, (19990128), vol. 3631, ISSN 0277-786X, pages 244 - 251, XP001187520 [X] 1-3,8,9,20,21,27 * figures 1-4,6 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1117/12.348319 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20030402), vol. 2003, no. 04, & JP2002353763 A 20021206 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [A] 22-26 * abstract * |