EP1473240 - Stackable container [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.12.2006 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.12.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.01.2007 [2007/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Georg Utz Holding AG Augraben 2-4 5620 Bremgarten / CH | [2006/04] |
Former [2004/45] | For all designated states Georg Utz Holding AG Augraben 2-4 5620 Bremgarten / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dubois, Jean-Marc Itenhardstrasse 12b 5620 Bremgarten / CH | 02 /
Emenegger, Marc Kreuzmattstrasse 2 5620 Bremgarten / CH | 03 /
Schwab, Boris Kumetstrasse 1 5234 Villigen / CH | [2004/45] | Representative(s) | Spierenburg, Pieter Spierenburg & Partner AG Patent- und Markenanwälte Mellingerstrasse 12 5443 Niederrohrdorf / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2004/45] | Spierenburg, Pieter Spierenburg & Partner AG Patent- und Markenanwälte Mellingerstrasse 12 5443 Niederrohrdorf / CH | Application number, filing date | 04405135.7 | 09.03.2004 | [2004/45] | Priority number, date | CH20030000660 | 09.04.2003 Original published format: CH 6602003 | [2004/45] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1473240 | Date: | 03.11.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1473240 | Date: | 25.01.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.07.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B65D8/06, B65D8/14, B65D8/08, B65D19/18, B65D21/02 | [2004/45] | CPC: |
B65D19/18 (EP,US);
B65D2519/00034 (EP,US);
B65D2519/00069 (EP,US);
B65D2519/00174 (EP,US);
B65D2519/00273 (EP,US);
B65D2519/00288 (EP,US);
B65D2519/00303 (EP,US);
B65D2519/00323 (EP,US);
B65D2519/00348 (EP,US);
B65D2519/00407 (EP,US);
B65D2519/00412 (EP,US);
B65D2519/00422 (EP,US);
B65D2519/00502 (EP,US);
B65D2519/00567 (EP,US);
B65D2519/00601 (EP,US);
B65D2519/00651 (EP,US);
B65D2519/00805 (EP,US);
B65D2519/009 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, PL [2005/29] |
Former [2004/45] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Stapelbarer Transportkasten | [2004/45] | English: | Stackable container | [2004/45] | French: | Conteneur empilable | [2004/45] | Examination procedure | 12.04.2005 | Examination requested [2005/23] | 28.06.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.10.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 27.10.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.10.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/01] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE8209245U (BONAR ROSEDALE PLASTICS [CA]) [A] 1-11 * figures 1-4 *; | [AD]US4674647 (GYENGE ANDREW [AU], et al) [AD] 1-11* the whole document *; | [A]EP0690003 (OTTO IND INC [US]) [A] 1-11 * page 5, lines 20-23; figure 8 *; | [A]EP0860366 (REMAPLAN ANLAGENBAU GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-11 * figures 3,4 *; | [AD]EP0876963 (ALLIBERT EQUIPEMENT [FR]) [AD] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [A]US2002070215 (WALSH THOMAS [US], et al) [A] 1-11 * figure 10 * |