EP1498060 - Filter cartridge for water reservoir of coffee apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 12.12.2014 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.12.2014 | Opposition rejected | published on 14.01.2015 [2015/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Saeco IPR Limited Unit 1E, Block 71 Park West Business Park Nangor Road Dublin 12 / IE | [2006/51] |
Former [2005/41] | For all designated states Saeco IPR Limited Park West Business Park Nangor Road Unit 1E, Block 71 Dublin 12 / IE | ||
Former [2005/03] | For all designated states Fianara International B.V. Riverstaete Building, Amsteldijk 166 1079 LH Amsterdam / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Vetterli, Heinz Donnerweidstrasse 2 8855 Wangen / CH | [2005/03] | Representative(s) | Rottmann, Maximilian Rottmann, Zimmermann + Partner AG Gartenstrasse 28 A 5400 Baden / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2010/01] | Rottmann, Maximilian Rottmann, Zimmermann + Partner AG Glattalstrasse 37 8052 Zürich / CH | ||
Former [2005/03] | Rottmann, Maximilian R. Rottmann, Zimmermann + Partner AG Glattalstrasse 37 8052 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 04405400.5 | 29.06.2004 | [2005/03] | Priority number, date | CH20030001249 | 17.07.2003 Original published format: CH 12492003 | [2005/03] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1498060 | Date: | 19.01.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1498060 | Date: | 20.12.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.10.2004 | Classification | IPC: | A47J31/60, B01D35/30, B01D24/18 | [2005/03] | CPC: |
C02F1/003 (EP,US);
A47J31/06 (KR);
A47J31/605 (EP,US);
B01D29/15 (EP,US);
B01D29/902 (EP,US);
C02F1/283 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/03] | Title | German: | Filterpatrone für wasserbehälter von kaffeemaschinen | [2005/03] | English: | Filter cartridge for water reservoir of coffee apparatus | [2005/03] | French: | Cartouche filtrante pour réservoir d'eau d'une cafetière | [2005/03] | Examination procedure | 04.03.2005 | Examination requested [2005/18] | 17.07.2006 | Observations by third parties | 29.08.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.10.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 26.10.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
20.09.2007
ADMISSIBLE Aquis Wasser-Luft-Systeme GmbH, Lindau Zweigniederlassung Rebstein Balgacherstrasse 17 9445 Rebstein / CH Opponent's representative Roth, Klaus Otten, Roth, Dobler & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Großtobeler Straße 39 88276 Berg/Ravensburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/44] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
20.09.2007
ADMISSIBLE Aquis Wasser-Luft-Systeme GmbH, Lindau Zweigniederlassung Rebstein Balgacherstrasse 17 9445 Rebstein / CH Opponent's representative Roth, Klaus Patentanwalt Karlstrasse 8 88212 Ravensburg / DE | 29.10.2007 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 14.04.2008 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 22.03.2011 | Date of oral proceedings | 07.07.2011 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 07.07.2011 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 10.11.2014 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2015/03] | Appeal following opposition | 07.09.2011 | Appeal received No. T2055/11 | 28.10.2011 | Statement of grounds filed | 10.11.2014 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent withdrawn | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 20.12.2006 | CZ | 20.12.2006 | DK | 20.12.2006 | EE | 20.12.2006 | FI | 20.12.2006 | IE | 20.12.2006 | NL | 20.12.2006 | PL | 20.12.2006 | RO | 20.12.2006 | SI | 20.12.2006 | SK | 20.12.2006 | BG | 20.03.2007 | SE | 20.03.2007 | GR | 21.03.2007 | PT | 24.04.2007 | HU | 21.06.2007 | LU | 29.06.2007 | BE | 30.06.2007 | MC | 30.06.2007 | [2009/44] |
Former [2009/40] | CY | 20.12.2006 | |
CZ | 20.12.2006 | ||
DK | 20.12.2006 | ||
EE | 20.12.2006 | ||
FI | 20.12.2006 | ||
IE | 20.12.2006 | ||
NL | 20.12.2006 | ||
PL | 20.12.2006 | ||
RO | 20.12.2006 | ||
SI | 20.12.2006 | ||
SK | 20.12.2006 | ||
BG | 20.03.2007 | ||
SE | 20.03.2007 | ||
GR | 21.03.2007 | ||
PT | 24.04.2007 | ||
LU | 29.06.2007 | ||
BE | 30.06.2007 | ||
MC | 30.06.2007 | ||
Former [2009/10] | CZ | 20.12.2006 | |
DK | 20.12.2006 | ||
EE | 20.12.2006 | ||
FI | 20.12.2006 | ||
IE | 20.12.2006 | ||
NL | 20.12.2006 | ||
PL | 20.12.2006 | ||
RO | 20.12.2006 | ||
SI | 20.12.2006 | ||
SK | 20.12.2006 | ||
BG | 20.03.2007 | ||
SE | 20.03.2007 | ||
GR | 21.03.2007 | ||
PT | 24.04.2007 | ||
BE | 30.06.2007 | ||
MC | 30.06.2007 | ||
Former [2009/01] | CZ | 20.12.2006 | |
DK | 20.12.2006 | ||
FI | 20.12.2006 | ||
IE | 20.12.2006 | ||
NL | 20.12.2006 | ||
PL | 20.12.2006 | ||
RO | 20.12.2006 | ||
SI | 20.12.2006 | ||
SK | 20.12.2006 | ||
BG | 20.03.2007 | ||
SE | 20.03.2007 | ||
GR | 21.03.2007 | ||
PT | 24.04.2007 | ||
BE | 30.06.2007 | ||
MC | 30.06.2007 | ||
Former [2008/21] | CZ | 20.12.2006 | |
DK | 20.12.2006 | ||
FI | 20.12.2006 | ||
IE | 20.12.2006 | ||
IT | 20.12.2006 | ||
NL | 20.12.2006 | ||
PL | 20.12.2006 | ||
RO | 20.12.2006 | ||
SI | 20.12.2006 | ||
SK | 20.12.2006 | ||
BG | 20.03.2007 | ||
SE | 20.03.2007 | ||
GR | 21.03.2007 | ||
PT | 24.04.2007 | ||
BE | 30.06.2007 | ||
MC | 30.06.2007 | ||
Former [2008/11] | CZ | 20.12.2006 | |
DK | 20.12.2006 | ||
FI | 20.12.2006 | ||
IE | 20.12.2006 | ||
IT | 20.12.2006 | ||
NL | 20.12.2006 | ||
PL | 20.12.2006 | ||
RO | 20.12.2006 | ||
SI | 20.12.2006 | ||
SK | 20.12.2006 | ||
BG | 20.03.2007 | ||
SE | 20.03.2007 | ||
PT | 24.04.2007 | ||
MC | 30.06.2007 | ||
Former [2007/47] | CZ | 20.12.2006 | |
DK | 20.12.2006 | ||
FI | 20.12.2006 | ||
IE | 20.12.2006 | ||
IT | 20.12.2006 | ||
NL | 20.12.2006 | ||
PL | 20.12.2006 | ||
RO | 20.12.2006 | ||
SI | 20.12.2006 | ||
SK | 20.12.2006 | ||
BG | 20.03.2007 | ||
SE | 20.03.2007 | ||
PT | 24.04.2007 | ||
Former [2007/43] | CZ | 20.12.2006 | |
FI | 20.12.2006 | ||
IE | 20.12.2006 | ||
IT | 20.12.2006 | ||
NL | 20.12.2006 | ||
PL | 20.12.2006 | ||
RO | 20.12.2006 | ||
BG | 20.03.2007 | ||
SE | 20.03.2007 | ||
PT | 24.04.2007 | ||
Former [2007/27] | FI | 20.12.2006 | |
PL | 20.12.2006 | ||
BG | 20.03.2007 | ||
SE | 20.03.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2102655 (SENEGAS MAURICE) [A] 1,3,7 * page 2, line 12 - line 29 ** figure 4 *; | [DA]DE3014493 (STREICHER EMIDE METALL [DE]) [DA] 1 * page 13, line 18 - line 24 * * page 13, line 1 - line 9 * * page 14, paragraph L - page 15, paragraph 1 * * page 16, line 27 - page 17, line L * * figures 1,4,8-10 *; | [A]DE3828008 (BENTZ & SOHN MELITTA [DE]) [A] 1,4,6 * column 2, line 54 - column 3, line 52 * * figure 1 *; | [A]RU2163829 (OGII, et al) [A] 1 * abstract * * figure 2 *; | [A]US6383375 (ZUCHOLL KLAUS [DE]) [A] 1,8,9 * column 4, line 8 - line 10 * * column 4, line 40 - line 51 * * figure 4 * | by applicant | US417070 | DE3014493 | DE19717054 | EP0956129 | US6387260 | other | US130316 | US2369915 | US5552043 | US5785848 | US6582595 | US6860992 |