EP1637638 - Sewing machine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.05.2007 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.05.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.06.2007 [2007/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ELNA INTERNATIONAL CORP. S.A. Chemin du Champ-des-Filles 19 1228 Plan-les-Ouates Genève / CH | [2006/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Labaune, René 7, avenue Foch 94160 Saint Mandé / FR | [2006/12] | Representative(s) | Savoye, Jean-Paul, et al Moinas & Savoye S.A. 42, rue Plantamour 1201 Genève / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2006/12] | Savoye, Jean-Paul, et al Moinas & Savoye S.A., 42, rue Plantamour 1201 Genève / CH | Application number, filing date | 04405590.3 | 17.09.2004 | [2006/12] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1637638 | Date: | 22.03.2006 | Language: | FR | [2006/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.11.2004 | Classification | IPC: | D05B73/00, D05B81/00 | [2006/12] | CPC: |
D05B73/00 (EP,US);
D05B91/12 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2006/48] |
Former [2006/12] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Nähmaschine | [2006/12] | English: | Sewing machine | [2006/12] | French: | Machine à coudre | [2006/12] | Examination procedure | 23.09.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/25] | 25.01.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2007/25] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 09.11.2006 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 09.11.2006 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 09.11.2006 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 09.11.2006 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 09.11.2006 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 09.11.2006 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 09.11.2006 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 09.11.2006 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 09.11.2006 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 09.11.2006 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 09.11.2006 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 09.11.2006 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 09.11.2006 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 09.11.2006 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 09.11.2006 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 09.11.2006 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 09.11.2006 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 09.11.2006 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 09.11.2006 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 09.11.2006 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 09.11.2006 | PL   M01   Not yet paid | 09.11.2006 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 09.11.2006 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 09.11.2006 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 09.11.2006 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 09.11.2006 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 09.11.2006 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 09.11.2006 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2006 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB1407112 (GEGAUF FRITZ AG) [A] 1 * figure 2a *; | [A]US4301753 (MEIER GUENTER) [A] 1 * figures 1,2 *; | [A]JPS62106800 (DAIEI SEWING MACH SHOKAI KK) [A] 1* figures 1-4 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19950428), vol. 1995, no. 03, & JP6343786 A 19941220 (BROTHER IND LTD) [A] 1 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19960329), vol. 1996, no. 03, & JP7289771 A 19951107 (JAGUAR KK) [A] 1-3 * abstract * |