EP1637295 - Rotary cutter with device for axial gap adjustment of the cutters [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.09.2009 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.09.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.10.2009 [2009/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Müller Martini Holding AG Sonnenbergstrasse 13 6052 Hergiswil / CH | [2006/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Liebheit, Stefan Gässli 9 CH-5603 Staufen / CH | [2006/12] | Application number, filing date | 04405600.0 | 20.09.2004 | [2006/12] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1637295 | Date: | 22.03.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1637295 | Date: | 05.11.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.03.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B26D7/26, B26D1/24 | [2006/12] | CPC: |
B26D5/02 (EP,US);
B26D7/2635 (EP,US);
Y10T83/175 (EP,US);
Y10T83/659 (EP,US);
Y10T83/7826 (EP,US);
Y10T83/783 (EP,US);
Y10T83/7843 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [2006/48] |
Former [2006/12] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Rotationsschneidemaschine mit Verstellvorrichtung zum Einstellen des Schnittspaltes der Messer in Längsrichtung der Messerwellen | [2006/12] | English: | Rotary cutter with device for axial gap adjustment of the cutters | [2006/12] | French: | Machine rotative a couper avec un dispositif pour la régulation axiale de la distance entre les disques de coupe | [2006/12] | Examination procedure | 21.07.2006 | Examination requested [2006/35] | 07.11.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.06.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 23.08.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.09.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.03.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.05.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.08.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 08.08.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.08.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/42] | Request for further processing for: | 23.08.2007 | Request for further processing filed | 23.08.2007 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 07.09.2007 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US5979282 (SCHLATTER MANFRED [DE], et al) [X] 1,2,5-10 * the whole document * [A] 3,4; | [DA]EP1177833 (MORI MANUFACTORY CO LTD [JP]) [DA] 1* the whole document * |