EP1522797 - Ceramic plate for humidification of an airflow [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.02.2010 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.02.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 31.03.2010 [2010/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Walter Meier (Klima International) AG Talstrasse 35-37 8808 Pfäffikon SZ / CH | [2008/47] |
Former [2005/15] | For all designated states Axair AG Talstrasse 35-37 8808 Pfäffikon SZ / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Aepli, Michael Gsteigstrasse 21 8646 Wagen / CH | 02 /
Wulz, Helmut Bäumlisächerstrasse 10 8907 Wettswil / CH | [2005/15] | Representative(s) | Bohest AG Postfach 160 4003 Basel / CH | [2009/02] |
Former [2008/31] | Bollhalder, Renato, et al BOHEST AG Postfach 160 4003 Basel / CH | ||
Former [2005/15] | Bollhalder, Renato, et al A. Braun Braun Héritier Eschmann AG, Holbeinstrasse 36-38 4051 Basel / CH | Application number, filing date | 04405622.4 | 05.10.2004 | [2005/15] | Priority number, date | CH20030001722 | 09.10.2003 Original published format: CH 17222003 | [2005/15] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1522797 | Date: | 13.04.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/15] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1522797 | Date: | 18.02.2009 | [2009/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.01.2009 | Classification | IPC: | F24F6/04, C04B38/06 | [2005/15] | CPC: |
C04B38/0615 (EP);
F24F6/043 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C04B38/0615, C04B35/10, C04B38/0058 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2009/43] |
Former [2005/15] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Keramikplatte zur Befeuchtung eines Luftstroms | [2005/15] | English: | Ceramic plate for humidification of an airflow | [2005/15] | French: | Plaque céramique pour l'humidification d'un courant d'air | [2005/15] | Examination procedure | 19.08.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/13] | 24.09.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2010/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2009 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0202145 (VALEO [FR]) [Y] 10-12 * page 3, line 8 - line 22; claims 12,13 *; | [Y]EP0736503 (NIPPON DENSO CO [JP]) [Y] 10-12 * column 4, line 5 - line 36 ** column 7, line 6 - line 52 *; | [X]WO0053977 (FRAUNHOFER GES FORSCHUNG [DE], et al) [X] 1,2,5-7 * page 3, line 18 - page 5, line 32 * * page 6, line 11 - page 7, line 26 * * page 8, line 4 - line 16 * * page 9, line 21 - page 13, line 6 *; | [Y]WO0158829 (VITO [BE], et al) [Y] 10-12 * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0005] * * paragraph [0023] - paragraph [0024] *; | [XY]DE20305087U (AXAIR AG PFAEFFIKON [CH]) [X] 1,7-9 * page 2, line 5 - line 21 * * page 6, line 11 - line 30 * * page 10, line 27 - page 11, line 4; figure 2; claims 1,6,10 * [Y] 10-12 |