EP1533427 - Apparatus and process to clean water bowl and cleaning material especially adapted to the process [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.10.2010 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.10.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.11.2010 [2010/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Theiler, Priskus A. Ausserdorfstrasse 2 8918 Unterlunkhofen / CH | [2005/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2005/21] | Representative(s) | Groner, Manfred, et al Isler & Pedrazzini AG Gotthardstrasse 53 Postfach 1772 8027 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2005/21] | Groner, Manfred, et al Isler & Pedrazzini AG, Patentanwälte, Postfach 6940 8023 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 04405713.1 | 17.11.2004 | [2005/21] | Priority number, date | CH20030001983 | 20.11.2003 Original published format: CH 19832003 | [2005/21] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1533427 | Date: | 25.05.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.03.2005 | Classification | IPC: | E03D9/00 | [2005/21] | CPC: |
E03D9/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/21] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung und Verfahren zur Reinigung von wasserführenden Becken sowie Reinigungsmittel für das genannte Verfahren | [2005/21] | English: | Apparatus and process to clean water bowl and cleaning material especially adapted to the process | [2005/21] | French: | Appareil et procédé de nettoyage d'une cuvette sanitaire ainsi que produit nettoyant adapté au procédé | [2005/21] | Examination procedure | 30.07.2005 | Examination requested [2005/40] | 14.03.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.04.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.05.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/47] | 07.07.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2010/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2009 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5615420 (GUYTON DEAN L [US]) [X] 1,12,13 * claim 1 *; | [A]DE19908779 (AGOCS JOZSEF [DE]) [A] 2,3* figure 1; claim 1 *; | [X]FR2808819 (CHALON DOMINIQUE LOUIS MARIE [FR]) [X] 15 * claim 2 * |