EP1445563 - Tunnel and support for a printing and/or coupling machine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.09.2011 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.09.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.10.2011 [2011/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MANTEC ENGINEERING S.r.l. in fallimento Via B. Cellini, 2/b Zona Industriale I Casoni 29027 Podenzano (PC) / IT | [2009/09] |
Former [2004/33] | For all designated states Mantec Engineering S.r.l. Via B. Cellini, 2/b, Zona Industriale I Casoni 29027 Podenzano (Piacenza) / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Moroni, Giuseppe Via Caselle, 34 29027 Podenzano (Piacenza) / IT | [2004/33] | Representative(s) | Pulieri, Gianluca Antonio Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A. Piazza della Vittoria, 11 25122 Brescia / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2010/02] | Pulieri, Gianluca Antonio Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A. Piazza dela Vittoria, 11 25122 Brescia / IT | ||
Former [2005/14] | Crippa, Paolo Ernesto JACOBACCI & PARTNERS S.p.A. Piazzale Arnaldo, 2 25121 Brescia / IT | ||
Former [2005/12] | Siniscalco, Fabio, et al JACOBACCI & PARTNERS S.p.A. Via delle Quattro Fontane, 15 00184 Roma / IT | ||
Former [2004/33] | Maggioni, Claudio, et al Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A. Piazzale Arnaldo, 2 25121 Brescia / IT | Application number, filing date | 04425012.4 | 14.01.2004 | [2004/33] | Priority number, date | IT2003BS00002 | 14.01.2003 Original published format: IT BS20030002 | IT2003BS00003 | 14.01.2003 Original published format: IT BS20030003 | [2004/33] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1445563 | Date: | 11.08.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/33] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1445563 | Date: | 20.12.2006 | [2006/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.11.2006 | Classification | IPC: | F26B25/08, F26B13/14 | [2004/33] | CPC: |
F26B13/14 (EP);
F26B25/08 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/33] | Title | German: | Tunnel und Unterstützung für eine Druck- und/oder Kupplungsmaschine | [2004/33] | English: | Tunnel and support for a printing and/or coupling machine | [2004/33] | French: | Tunnel et support pour une machine à imprimer et/ou coupler | [2004/33] | Examination procedure | 19.06.2007 | Examination requested [2007/31] | 07.12.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.04.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/41] | 25.05.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2011/41] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.12.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2008 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   29.07.2008 | 31.01.2011 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Stay/Interruption | 28.05.2008 | Interruption of proceedings. Reason: legal prevention of applicant | [2009/41] | 19.11.2009 | Resumption of proceedings | [2009/41] | Documents cited: | Search | [XAY]EP1055895 (BENNINGER ZELL GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-4,9 * the whole document * [A] 7 [Y] 19,20; | [XY]WO9612150 (GRACE W R & CO [US]) [X] 1,3,4,17,18 * the whole document * [Y] 19,20; | [X]DE2302107 (BUETTNER SCHILDE HAAS AG) [X] 1,3,4,9 * the whole document *; | [XA]GB758911 (SUCKER GMBH GEB) [X] 1,3,4,6-9 * the whole document * [A] 17-19; | [XY]FR2151230 (STUMM ERIC) [X] 1,4,5,9,17,18 * the whole document * [Y] 2,10-12; | [Y]US2519809 (CHARLES ZARKIN, et al) [Y] 2 * the whole document *; | [Y]GB201609 (JAMES BYROM, et al) [Y] 10-12,21,23 * the whole document *; | [YA]JPH05239808 (NORTH JAPAN KENKI KK, et al) [Y] 21,23 * abstract * [A] 11-13; | [PA]DE20211083U (PHOENIX THERMAL SOLUTIONS GMBH [DE]) [PA] 13,14,21,22 * the whole document *; | [A]DE8579 (HAUBOLD JR.) [A] 16 * figures 3,4 *; | [A]DE1069111 (GEBR. SUCKER G.M.B.H.); | [A]US2638765 (QUINN EVAN V); | [A]GB1363213 (AUTO MASTERS LTD); | [A]DE1460680 (MONFORTS FA A) |