EP1479490 - An angular positioning device for machines for machining panels made of wood or similar materials [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.08.2006 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.08.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.09.2006 [2006/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SCM Group S.p.A. Via Emilia 77 47900 Rimini / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2004/48] | For all designated states SCM GROUP S.p.A. Via Emilia 77 47900 Rimini / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pucci, Aureliano Via del Volontario 2 47900 Rimini / IT | 02 /
Varotti, Andrea Via Dionisio di Monti, 27 61015 Talamello (Pesaro Urbino) / IT | [2004/48] | Representative(s) | Lanzoni, Luciano Bugnion S.p.A. Via di Corticella, 87 40128 Bologna / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2004/48] | Lanzoni, Luciano c/o BUGNION S.p.A. Via Goito, 18 40126 Bologna / IT | Application number, filing date | 04425362.3 | 19.05.2004 | [2004/48] | Priority number, date | IT2003BO00324 | 23.05.2003 Original published format: IT BO20030324 | [2004/48] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1479490 | Date: | 24.11.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/48] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1479490 | Date: | 12.01.2005 | [2005/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.11.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B27B27/08, B27B27/10, B23D47/02 | [2004/48] | CPC: |
B27G5/023 (EP);
B23D47/025 (EP);
B23D59/001 (EP);
B27B27/08 (EP);
B27B27/10 (EP);
B27B5/222 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/48] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Winkeleinstellung für Maschinen zum Bearbeiten von Platten aus Holz oder dergleichen | [2004/48] | English: | An angular positioning device for machines for machining panels made of wood or similar materials | [2004/48] | French: | Dispositif de positionnement angulaire pour machines à usiner des panneaux en bois ou matière similaire | [2004/48] | Examination procedure | 11.05.2005 | Examination requested [2005/28] | 08.09.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.01.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/37] | 26.04.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2006/37] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2006 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]DE9103189U (PANHANS ANT. GMBH WERKZEUG- UND MASCHINENFABRIK) [X] 1,2 * the whole document * [A] 3; | [X]DE9207811U (GEORG OTT WERKZEUG- UND MASCHINENFABRIK GMBH & CO) [X] 1-4 * the whole document * * insbesondere: * * page 5, line 29 - page 6, line 13 *; | [XA]DE4312767 (REICH SPEZIALMASCHINEN GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,2 * the whole document * [A] 3; | [XA]EP0692349 (OPTICAL AND ELECTRONIC ENGINEE [CH]) [X] 1,2 * page 2, line 52 - page 3, line 50 * * figures 1-3 * [A] 7; | [A]US5490665 (THIELE SIEGFRIED [DE], et al) [A] 1* the whole document * |