EP1574623 - Method of packing a bag for flood protection [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.09.2007 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.09.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, TR | published on 28.10.2009 [2009/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CO.RI.SAC. SRL Via Davanzo 34 31030 Saletto di Breda (TV) / IT | [2005/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Marchesini, Franco Via Davanzo 34 31030 - Saletto di Breda (TV) / IT | [2005/37] | Application number, filing date | 04425540.4 | 20.07.2004 | [2005/37] | Priority number, date | IT2004TV00013U | 10.03.2004 Original published format: IT TV20040013 U | [2005/37] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1574623 | Date: | 14.09.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1574623 | Date: | 15.11.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.04.2005 | Classification | IPC: | E02B3/12 | [2005/37] | CPC: |
E02B3/127 (EP);
E02B3/108 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/37] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Füllen eines Sacks für Hochwasserschutz | [2005/37] | English: | Method of packing a bag for flood protection | [2005/37] | French: | Procédé pour remplir un sac anti-inondation | [2005/37] | Examination procedure | 31.05.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.10.2005 | Examination requested [2005/50] | 09.12.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.01.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.04.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.06.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.07.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.09.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 26.09.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.08.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2006 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   19.09.2006 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CH | 15.11.2006 | CY | 15.11.2006 | CZ | 15.11.2006 | EE | 15.11.2006 | FI | 15.11.2006 | LI | 15.11.2006 | NL | 15.11.2006 | PL | 15.11.2006 | RO | 15.11.2006 | SI | 15.11.2006 | SK | 15.11.2006 | TR | 15.11.2006 | BG | 15.02.2007 | DK | 15.02.2007 | SE | 15.02.2007 | GR | 16.02.2007 | PT | 16.04.2007 | HU | 16.05.2007 | IE | 20.07.2007 | LU | 20.07.2007 | MC | 31.07.2007 | [2009/44] |
Former [2009/40] | CH | 15.11.2006 | |
CY | 15.11.2006 | ||
CZ | 15.11.2006 | ||
EE | 15.11.2006 | ||
FI | 15.11.2006 | ||
LI | 15.11.2006 | ||
NL | 15.11.2006 | ||
PL | 15.11.2006 | ||
RO | 15.11.2006 | ||
SI | 15.11.2006 | ||
SK | 15.11.2006 | ||
BG | 15.02.2007 | ||
DK | 15.02.2007 | ||
SE | 15.02.2007 | ||
GR | 16.02.2007 | ||
PT | 16.04.2007 | ||
IE | 20.07.2007 | ||
LU | 20.07.2007 | ||
MC | 31.07.2007 | ||
Former [2009/10] | CH | 15.11.2006 | |
CZ | 15.11.2006 | ||
EE | 15.11.2006 | ||
FI | 15.11.2006 | ||
LI | 15.11.2006 | ||
NL | 15.11.2006 | ||
PL | 15.11.2006 | ||
RO | 15.11.2006 | ||
SI | 15.11.2006 | ||
SK | 15.11.2006 | ||
BG | 15.02.2007 | ||
DK | 15.02.2007 | ||
SE | 15.02.2007 | ||
GR | 16.02.2007 | ||
PT | 16.04.2007 | ||
IE | 20.07.2007 | ||
MC | 31.07.2007 | ||
Former [2008/45] | CH | 15.11.2006 | |
CZ | 15.11.2006 | ||
FI | 15.11.2006 | ||
LI | 15.11.2006 | ||
NL | 15.11.2006 | ||
PL | 15.11.2006 | ||
RO | 15.11.2006 | ||
SI | 15.11.2006 | ||
SK | 15.11.2006 | ||
BG | 15.02.2007 | ||
DK | 15.02.2007 | ||
SE | 15.02.2007 | ||
GR | 16.02.2007 | ||
PT | 16.04.2007 | ||
IE | 20.07.2007 | ||
MC | 31.07.2007 | ||
Former [2008/22] | CH | 15.11.2006 | |
CZ | 15.11.2006 | ||
FI | 15.11.2006 | ||
LI | 15.11.2006 | ||
NL | 15.11.2006 | ||
PL | 15.11.2006 | ||
RO | 15.11.2006 | ||
SI | 15.11.2006 | ||
SK | 15.11.2006 | ||
BG | 15.02.2007 | ||
DK | 15.02.2007 | ||
SE | 15.02.2007 | ||
GR | 16.02.2007 | ||
PT | 16.04.2007 | ||
MC | 31.07.2007 | ||
Former [2007/47] | CH | 15.11.2006 | |
CZ | 15.11.2006 | ||
FI | 15.11.2006 | ||
LI | 15.11.2006 | ||
NL | 15.11.2006 | ||
PL | 15.11.2006 | ||
RO | 15.11.2006 | ||
SI | 15.11.2006 | ||
SK | 15.11.2006 | ||
BG | 15.02.2007 | ||
DK | 15.02.2007 | ||
SE | 15.02.2007 | ||
PT | 16.04.2007 | ||
Former [2007/43] | CH | 15.11.2006 | |
CZ | 15.11.2006 | ||
FI | 15.11.2006 | ||
LI | 15.11.2006 | ||
NL | 15.11.2006 | ||
PL | 15.11.2006 | ||
RO | 15.11.2006 | ||
BG | 15.02.2007 | ||
DK | 15.02.2007 | ||
SE | 15.02.2007 | ||
PT | 16.04.2007 | ||
Former [2007/30] | CH | 15.11.2006 | |
FI | 15.11.2006 | ||
LI | 15.11.2006 | ||
NL | 15.11.2006 | ||
PL | 15.11.2006 | ||
BG | 15.02.2007 | ||
SE | 15.02.2007 | ||
Former [2007/29] | FI | 15.11.2006 | |
NL | 15.11.2006 | ||
PL | 15.11.2006 | ||
BG | 15.02.2007 | ||
SE | 15.02.2007 | ||
Former [2007/27] | FI | 15.11.2006 | |
PL | 15.11.2006 | ||
BG | 15.02.2007 | ||
SE | 15.02.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO0236053 (ROEHM KLAUS [DE]) [A] 1 * page 1, line 14 - line 17 ** page 26, line 12 - line 26 *; | [A]US2003035689 (METZ DONALD H [US]) [A] 1 * paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0017]; figures 3-5 * |