EP1555473 - O-ring for press-fittings [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.06.2007 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 14.01.2009 [2009/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Raccorderie Metalliche S.p.A. Strada Sabbionetana, 59 46010 Campitello di Marcaria Mantova / IT | [2006/34] |
Former [2005/29] | For all designated states Raccorderie Metalliche S.p.A. Strada Sabbionetana, 59 46010 Campitello di Marcaria, Mantova / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schneider, Norbert Via Parini 104 46030 S. Cataldo di Borgoforte MN / IT | [2005/29] | Representative(s) | Concone, Emanuele, et al Società Italiana Brevetti S.p.A. Via Carducci 8 20123 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2005/29] | Concone, Emanuele, et al Società Italiana Brevetti S.p.A. Via Carducci 8 20123 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 04425894.5 | 26.11.2004 | [2005/29] | Priority number, date | IT2004MI00053 | 16.01.2004 Original published format: IT MI20040053 | [2005/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1555473 | Date: | 20.07.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1555473 | Date: | 23.08.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.04.2005 | Classification | IPC: | F16L13/14, F16J15/00 | [2005/29] | CPC: |
F16L13/148 (EP);
F16J15/064 (EP);
F16J15/3296 (EP);
F16L2201/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/29] | Title | German: | O-Ring für Pressverbindungen | [2005/29] | English: | O-ring for press-fittings | [2005/29] | French: | Joint torique pour raccords à sertir | [2005/29] | Examination procedure | 12.09.2005 | Examination requested [2005/45] | 18.10.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.02.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.03.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.07.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 07.07.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.05.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/31] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 23.08.2006 | BE | 23.08.2006 | CH | 23.08.2006 | CY | 23.08.2006 | CZ | 23.08.2006 | EE | 23.08.2006 | FI | 23.08.2006 | FR | 23.08.2006 | IS | 23.08.2006 | LI | 23.08.2006 | NL | 23.08.2006 | PL | 23.08.2006 | RO | 23.08.2006 | SI | 23.08.2006 | SK | 23.08.2006 | TR | 23.08.2006 | BG | 23.11.2006 | DK | 23.11.2006 | SE | 23.11.2006 | GR | 24.11.2006 | LU | 26.11.2006 | IE | 27.11.2006 | MC | 30.11.2006 | ES | 04.12.2006 | PT | 25.01.2007 | HU | 24.02.2007 | [2009/03] |
Former [2008/52] | AT | 23.08.2006 | |
BE | 23.08.2006 | ||
CH | 23.08.2006 | ||
CZ | 23.08.2006 | ||
EE | 23.08.2006 | ||
FI | 23.08.2006 | ||
FR | 23.08.2006 | ||
IS | 23.08.2006 | ||
LI | 23.08.2006 | ||
NL | 23.08.2006 | ||
PL | 23.08.2006 | ||
RO | 23.08.2006 | ||
SI | 23.08.2006 | ||
SK | 23.08.2006 | ||
TR | 23.08.2006 | ||
BG | 23.11.2006 | ||
DK | 23.11.2006 | ||
SE | 23.11.2006 | ||
GR | 24.11.2006 | ||
LU | 26.11.2006 | ||
IE | 27.11.2006 | ||
MC | 30.11.2006 | ||
ES | 04.12.2006 | ||
PT | 25.01.2007 | ||
HU | 24.02.2007 | ||
Former [2008/37] | AT | 23.08.2006 | |
BE | 23.08.2006 | ||
CH | 23.08.2006 | ||
CZ | 23.08.2006 | ||
EE | 23.08.2006 | ||
FI | 23.08.2006 | ||
IS | 23.08.2006 | ||
LI | 23.08.2006 | ||
NL | 23.08.2006 | ||
PL | 23.08.2006 | ||
RO | 23.08.2006 | ||
SI | 23.08.2006 | ||
SK | 23.08.2006 | ||
TR | 23.08.2006 | ||
BG | 23.11.2006 | ||
DK | 23.11.2006 | ||
SE | 23.11.2006 | ||
GR | 24.11.2006 | ||
LU | 26.11.2006 | ||
IE | 27.11.2006 | ||
MC | 30.11.2006 | ||
ES | 04.12.2006 | ||
PT | 25.01.2007 | ||
HU | 24.02.2007 | ||
FR | 11.05.2007 | ||
Former [2008/32] | AT | 23.08.2006 | |
BE | 23.08.2006 | ||
CH | 23.08.2006 | ||
CZ | 23.08.2006 | ||
EE | 23.08.2006 | ||
FI | 23.08.2006 | ||
IS | 23.08.2006 | ||
LI | 23.08.2006 | ||
NL | 23.08.2006 | ||
PL | 23.08.2006 | ||
RO | 23.08.2006 | ||
SI | 23.08.2006 | ||
SK | 23.08.2006 | ||
BG | 23.11.2006 | ||
DK | 23.11.2006 | ||
SE | 23.11.2006 | ||
GR | 24.11.2006 | ||
IE | 27.11.2006 | ||
MC | 30.11.2006 | ||
ES | 04.12.2006 | ||
PT | 25.01.2007 | ||
HU | 24.02.2007 | ||
FR | 11.05.2007 | ||
Former [2008/28] | AT | 23.08.2006 | |
BE | 23.08.2006 | ||
CH | 23.08.2006 | ||
CZ | 23.08.2006 | ||
EE | 23.08.2006 | ||
FI | 23.08.2006 | ||
IS | 23.08.2006 | ||
LI | 23.08.2006 | ||
NL | 23.08.2006 | ||
PL | 23.08.2006 | ||
RO | 23.08.2006 | ||
SI | 23.08.2006 | ||
SK | 23.08.2006 | ||
BG | 23.11.2006 | ||
DK | 23.11.2006 | ||
SE | 23.11.2006 | ||
GR | 24.11.2006 | ||
IE | 27.11.2006 | ||
MC | 30.11.2006 | ||
ES | 04.12.2006 | ||
PT | 25.01.2007 | ||
FR | 11.05.2007 | ||
Former [2008/23] | AT | 23.08.2006 | |
BE | 23.08.2006 | ||
CH | 23.08.2006 | ||
CZ | 23.08.2006 | ||
FI | 23.08.2006 | ||
IS | 23.08.2006 | ||
LI | 23.08.2006 | ||
NL | 23.08.2006 | ||
PL | 23.08.2006 | ||
RO | 23.08.2006 | ||
SI | 23.08.2006 | ||
SK | 23.08.2006 | ||
BG | 23.11.2006 | ||
DK | 23.11.2006 | ||
SE | 23.11.2006 | ||
GR | 24.11.2006 | ||
IE | 27.11.2006 | ||
MC | 30.11.2006 | ||
ES | 04.12.2006 | ||
PT | 25.01.2007 | ||
FR | 11.05.2007 | ||
Former [2008/21] | AT | 23.08.2006 | |
BE | 23.08.2006 | ||
CH | 23.08.2006 | ||
CZ | 23.08.2006 | ||
FI | 23.08.2006 | ||
IS | 23.08.2006 | ||
LI | 23.08.2006 | ||
NL | 23.08.2006 | ||
PL | 23.08.2006 | ||
RO | 23.08.2006 | ||
SI | 23.08.2006 | ||
SK | 23.08.2006 | ||
BG | 23.11.2006 | ||
DK | 23.11.2006 | ||
SE | 23.11.2006 | ||
GR | 24.11.2006 | ||
IE | 27.11.2006 | ||
MC | 30.11.2006 | ||
ES | 04.12.2006 | ||
PT | 25.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/50] | AT | 23.08.2006 | |
BE | 23.08.2006 | ||
CH | 23.08.2006 | ||
CZ | 23.08.2006 | ||
FI | 23.08.2006 | ||
IS | 23.08.2006 | ||
LI | 23.08.2006 | ||
NL | 23.08.2006 | ||
PL | 23.08.2006 | ||
RO | 23.08.2006 | ||
SI | 23.08.2006 | ||
SK | 23.08.2006 | ||
BG | 23.11.2006 | ||
DK | 23.11.2006 | ||
SE | 23.11.2006 | ||
IE | 27.11.2006 | ||
MC | 30.11.2006 | ||
ES | 04.12.2006 | ||
PT | 25.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/43] | AT | 23.08.2006 | |
BE | 23.08.2006 | ||
CH | 23.08.2006 | ||
CZ | 23.08.2006 | ||
FI | 23.08.2006 | ||
IS | 23.08.2006 | ||
IT | 23.08.2006 | ||
LI | 23.08.2006 | ||
NL | 23.08.2006 | ||
PL | 23.08.2006 | ||
RO | 23.08.2006 | ||
SI | 23.08.2006 | ||
SK | 23.08.2006 | ||
BG | 23.11.2006 | ||
DK | 23.11.2006 | ||
SE | 23.11.2006 | ||
MC | 30.11.2006 | ||
ES | 04.12.2006 | ||
PT | 25.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/29] | AT | 23.08.2006 | |
BE | 23.08.2006 | ||
CH | 23.08.2006 | ||
CZ | 23.08.2006 | ||
FI | 23.08.2006 | ||
IS | 23.08.2006 | ||
LI | 23.08.2006 | ||
NL | 23.08.2006 | ||
PL | 23.08.2006 | ||
SI | 23.08.2006 | ||
SK | 23.08.2006 | ||
BG | 23.11.2006 | ||
DK | 23.11.2006 | ||
SE | 23.11.2006 | ||
ES | 04.12.2006 | ||
PT | 25.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/27] | AT | 23.08.2006 | |
CH | 23.08.2006 | ||
CZ | 23.08.2006 | ||
FI | 23.08.2006 | ||
IS | 23.08.2006 | ||
LI | 23.08.2006 | ||
NL | 23.08.2006 | ||
PL | 23.08.2006 | ||
SI | 23.08.2006 | ||
SK | 23.08.2006 | ||
BG | 23.11.2006 | ||
DK | 23.11.2006 | ||
SE | 23.11.2006 | ||
ES | 04.12.2006 | ||
PT | 25.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/23] | AT | 23.08.2006 | |
CH | 23.08.2006 | ||
CZ | 23.08.2006 | ||
FI | 23.08.2006 | ||
IS | 23.08.2006 | ||
LI | 23.08.2006 | ||
NL | 23.08.2006 | ||
PL | 23.08.2006 | ||
SI | 23.08.2006 | ||
BG | 23.11.2006 | ||
DK | 23.11.2006 | ||
SE | 23.11.2006 | ||
ES | 04.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/22] | CH | 23.08.2006 | |
CZ | 23.08.2006 | ||
FI | 23.08.2006 | ||
IS | 23.08.2006 | ||
LI | 23.08.2006 | ||
NL | 23.08.2006 | ||
PL | 23.08.2006 | ||
SI | 23.08.2006 | ||
BG | 23.11.2006 | ||
DK | 23.11.2006 | ||
SE | 23.11.2006 | ||
ES | 04.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/21] | CH | 23.08.2006 | |
FI | 23.08.2006 | ||
IS | 23.08.2006 | ||
LI | 23.08.2006 | ||
NL | 23.08.2006 | ||
PL | 23.08.2006 | ||
SI | 23.08.2006 | ||
BG | 23.11.2006 | ||
SE | 23.11.2006 | ||
ES | 04.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/15] | CH | 23.08.2006 | |
FI | 23.08.2006 | ||
IS | 23.08.2006 | ||
LI | 23.08.2006 | ||
PL | 23.08.2006 | ||
SI | 23.08.2006 | ||
BG | 23.11.2006 | ||
SE | 23.11.2006 | ||
ES | 04.12.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]DE29813935U (FRANZ VIEGENER II GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [Y] 1,2,4,5,11,12 * page 1, line 12 - page 2, line 11 * * page 3, line 5 - line 28 * * figures 1-4 * [A] 9; | [A]US6260891 (FOERING HERBERT [DE], et al) [A] 1,5,9,11,12 * column 1, line 56 - column 2, line 30 * * column 3, line 8 - column 4, line 10 ** figures 2-5 *; | [DY]EP1260741 (RACCORDERIE METALLICHE SPA [IT]) [DY] 1,2,4,5,11,12 * column 2, line 32 - column 3, line 6 * * column 3, line 18 - line 22 * * figure - * |