EP1449750 - Low noise track profile [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.11.2007 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.09.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 28.10.2009 [2009/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Arctic Cat Inc. P.O. Box 810, 601 South Brooks Avenue Thief River Falls, MN 56701 / US | [2007/02] |
Former [2004/35] | For all designated states Arctic Cat Inc. P.O. Box 810, 601 South Brooks Avenue Thief River Falls, Minnesota 56701 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Konickson, Mike 2233 Nelson Drive Thief River Falls, Minnesota 56701 / US | 02 /
Bergman, Ron 14460 Maple Inn Road SE Mentor, Minnesota 56736 / US | 03 /
Black, Ronald M. 305 5th St. SW Red Lake Falls, Minnesota 56750 / US | [2004/35] | Representative(s) | Jörgensson, Leif Sixten, et al Awapatent AB P.O. Box 5117 200 71 Malmö / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/24] | Jörgensson, Leif Sixten, et al Awapatent AB Box 5117 200 71 Malmö / SE | ||
Former [2004/35] | Rostovanyi, Peter AWAPATENT AB, Box 5117 200 71 Malmö / SE | Application number, filing date | 04445014.6 | 20.02.2004 | [2004/35] | Priority number, date | US20030373601 | 24.02.2003 Original published format: US 373601 | [2004/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1449750 | Date: | 25.08.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/35] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1449750 | Date: | 02.03.2005 | [2005/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1449750 | Date: | 10.01.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.01.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B62D55/096, B62D55/24 | [2005/09] | CPC: |
B62D55/096 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2004/35] | B62D55/096 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/35] | Title | German: | Geräuscharmes Kettengliedprofil | [2004/35] | English: | Low noise track profile | [2004/35] | French: | Section de patin de chenille à bruit réduit | [2004/35] | Examination procedure | 18.04.2005 | Examination requested [2005/24] | 05.07.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.11.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.07.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.11.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 17.11.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.10.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 10.01.2007 | BE | 10.01.2007 | CH | 10.01.2007 | CY | 10.01.2007 | CZ | 10.01.2007 | DK | 10.01.2007 | EE | 10.01.2007 | FR | 10.01.2007 | IT | 10.01.2007 | LI | 10.01.2007 | NL | 10.01.2007 | RO | 10.01.2007 | SI | 10.01.2007 | SK | 10.01.2007 | TR | 10.01.2007 | IE | 20.02.2007 | LU | 20.02.2007 | MC | 28.02.2007 | BG | 10.04.2007 | GR | 11.04.2007 | ES | 21.04.2007 | PT | 11.06.2007 | HU | 11.07.2007 | DE | 01.09.2007 | [2009/44] |
Former [2009/41] | AT | 10.01.2007 | |
BE | 10.01.2007 | ||
CH | 10.01.2007 | ||
CY | 10.01.2007 | ||
CZ | 10.01.2007 | ||
DK | 10.01.2007 | ||
EE | 10.01.2007 | ||
FR | 10.01.2007 | ||
IT | 10.01.2007 | ||
LI | 10.01.2007 | ||
NL | 10.01.2007 | ||
RO | 10.01.2007 | ||
SI | 10.01.2007 | ||
SK | 10.01.2007 | ||
IE | 20.02.2007 | ||
LU | 20.02.2007 | ||
MC | 28.02.2007 | ||
BG | 10.04.2007 | ||
GR | 11.04.2007 | ||
ES | 21.04.2007 | ||
PT | 11.06.2007 | ||
HU | 11.07.2007 | ||
DE | 01.09.2007 | ||
Former [2009/35] | AT | 10.01.2007 | |
BE | 10.01.2007 | ||
CH | 10.01.2007 | ||
CY | 10.01.2007 | ||
CZ | 10.01.2007 | ||
DK | 10.01.2007 | ||
EE | 10.01.2007 | ||
FR | 10.01.2007 | ||
IT | 10.01.2007 | ||
LI | 10.01.2007 | ||
NL | 10.01.2007 | ||
RO | 10.01.2007 | ||
SI | 10.01.2007 | ||
SK | 10.01.2007 | ||
IE | 20.02.2007 | ||
MC | 28.02.2007 | ||
BG | 10.04.2007 | ||
GR | 11.04.2007 | ||
ES | 21.04.2007 | ||
PT | 11.06.2007 | ||
DE | 01.09.2007 | ||
Former [2009/11] | AT | 10.01.2007 | |
BE | 10.01.2007 | ||
CH | 10.01.2007 | ||
CZ | 10.01.2007 | ||
DK | 10.01.2007 | ||
EE | 10.01.2007 | ||
FR | 10.01.2007 | ||
IT | 10.01.2007 | ||
LI | 10.01.2007 | ||
NL | 10.01.2007 | ||
RO | 10.01.2007 | ||
SI | 10.01.2007 | ||
SK | 10.01.2007 | ||
IE | 20.02.2007 | ||
MC | 28.02.2007 | ||
BG | 10.04.2007 | ||
GR | 11.04.2007 | ||
ES | 21.04.2007 | ||
PT | 11.06.2007 | ||
DE | 01.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/52] | AT | 10.01.2007 | |
BE | 10.01.2007 | ||
CH | 10.01.2007 | ||
CZ | 10.01.2007 | ||
DK | 10.01.2007 | ||
FR | 10.01.2007 | ||
IT | 10.01.2007 | ||
LI | 10.01.2007 | ||
NL | 10.01.2007 | ||
RO | 10.01.2007 | ||
SI | 10.01.2007 | ||
SK | 10.01.2007 | ||
IE | 20.02.2007 | ||
MC | 28.02.2007 | ||
BG | 10.04.2007 | ||
GR | 11.04.2007 | ||
ES | 21.04.2007 | ||
PT | 11.06.2007 | ||
DE | 01.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/22] | AT | 10.01.2007 | |
BE | 10.01.2007 | ||
CH | 10.01.2007 | ||
CZ | 10.01.2007 | ||
DK | 10.01.2007 | ||
IT | 10.01.2007 | ||
LI | 10.01.2007 | ||
NL | 10.01.2007 | ||
RO | 10.01.2007 | ||
SI | 10.01.2007 | ||
SK | 10.01.2007 | ||
IE | 20.02.2007 | ||
MC | 28.02.2007 | ||
BG | 10.04.2007 | ||
GR | 11.04.2007 | ||
ES | 21.04.2007 | ||
PT | 11.06.2007 | ||
FR | 31.08.2007 | ||
DE | 01.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/11] | AT | 10.01.2007 | |
BE | 10.01.2007 | ||
CH | 10.01.2007 | ||
CZ | 10.01.2007 | ||
DK | 10.01.2007 | ||
LI | 10.01.2007 | ||
NL | 10.01.2007 | ||
RO | 10.01.2007 | ||
SI | 10.01.2007 | ||
SK | 10.01.2007 | ||
IE | 20.02.2007 | ||
MC | 28.02.2007 | ||
BG | 10.04.2007 | ||
ES | 21.04.2007 | ||
PT | 11.06.2007 | ||
DE | 01.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/04] | AT | 10.01.2007 | |
BE | 10.01.2007 | ||
CH | 10.01.2007 | ||
CZ | 10.01.2007 | ||
DK | 10.01.2007 | ||
LI | 10.01.2007 | ||
NL | 10.01.2007 | ||
RO | 10.01.2007 | ||
SI | 10.01.2007 | ||
SK | 10.01.2007 | ||
MC | 28.02.2007 | ||
BG | 10.04.2007 | ||
ES | 21.04.2007 | ||
PT | 11.06.2007 | ||
Former [2008/01] | AT | 10.01.2007 | |
BE | 10.01.2007 | ||
CH | 10.01.2007 | ||
CZ | 10.01.2007 | ||
DK | 10.01.2007 | ||
LI | 10.01.2007 | ||
NL | 10.01.2007 | ||
SI | 10.01.2007 | ||
SK | 10.01.2007 | ||
MC | 28.02.2007 | ||
BG | 10.04.2007 | ||
ES | 21.04.2007 | ||
PT | 11.06.2007 | ||
Former [2007/50] | AT | 10.01.2007 | |
CH | 10.01.2007 | ||
DK | 10.01.2007 | ||
LI | 10.01.2007 | ||
NL | 10.01.2007 | ||
SI | 10.01.2007 | ||
SK | 10.01.2007 | ||
MC | 28.02.2007 | ||
BG | 10.04.2007 | ||
ES | 21.04.2007 | ||
PT | 11.06.2007 | ||
Former [2007/47] | AT | 10.01.2007 | |
CH | 10.01.2007 | ||
DK | 10.01.2007 | ||
LI | 10.01.2007 | ||
NL | 10.01.2007 | ||
SI | 10.01.2007 | ||
ES | 21.04.2007 | ||
PT | 11.06.2007 | ||
Former [2007/43] | CH | 10.01.2007 | |
LI | 10.01.2007 | ||
NL | 10.01.2007 | ||
ES | 21.04.2007 | ||
PT | 11.06.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]CH322852 (ATKINSONS AGRICULTURAL APPL [GB]) [X] 1,23 * pages 1,3; figure 3 *; | [A]US5709440 (LECOURS GAETAN [CA]) [A] 1,23 * column 3, line 38 - column 4, line 20; figures 5,6 *; | [A]US2001030467 (COURTEMANCHE DENIS [CA]) [A] 1,23 * paragraphs [0015] - [0018]; figure 1 *; | [A]WO0208569 (WEATHERFORD LAMB [US], et al) [A] 1,23* page 4; figures 2,4 * |