EP1462888 - Method of establishing rules for a device which is intended to be able to be used for generating decision support [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.06.2019 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 29.06.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.02.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.07.2021 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 11.08.2021 [2021/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SAAB AB 581 88 Linköping / SE | [2004/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hagelin, Hans-Ove Haraldsbovägen 8 585 97 Linköping / SE | [2004/40] | Representative(s) | Zacco Sweden AB, et al P.O. Box 5581 Löjtnantsgatan 21 114 85 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/31] | Holmberg, Magnus, et al Zacco Sweden AB Box 5581 114 85 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [2005/44] | Holmberg, Magnus, et al Albihns Stockholm AB P.O. Box 5581 114 85 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [2004/40] | Israelsson, Stefan Bjerkéns Patentbyra KB Östermalmsgatan 58 114 50 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 04445036.9 | 23.03.2004 | [2004/40] | Priority number, date | SE20030000894 | 28.03.2003 Original published format: SE 0300894 | [2004/40] | Filing language | SV | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1462888 | Date: | 29.09.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/40] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1462888 | Date: | 18.05.2005 | [2005/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1462888 | Date: | 01.08.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.04.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G05B13/02 | [2004/40] | CPC: |
G05B13/028 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2018/31] |
Former [2004/40] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Etablierung von Regeln für eine Vorricthung die als Entscheidungsunterstützung angewandt wird | [2004/40] | English: | Method of establishing rules for a device which is intended to be able to be used for generating decision support | [2004/40] | French: | Procédé d'établissement de règles pour un dispositif utilisé omme aide à la prise de décisions | [2004/40] | Examination procedure | 26.10.2005 | Examination requested [2005/52] | 27.03.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.10.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.05.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.09.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.03.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.06.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 19.06.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.06.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.03.2006 | Opposition(s) | 03.05.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 18.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 06.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 07.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 12.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 09.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 21.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 24.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 22.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 15 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 23.03.2004 | AT | 01.08.2018 | CY | 01.08.2018 | CZ | 01.08.2018 | DK | 01.08.2018 | EE | 01.08.2018 | FI | 01.08.2018 | MC | 01.08.2018 | NL | 01.08.2018 | PL | 01.08.2018 | RO | 01.08.2018 | SE | 01.08.2018 | SI | 01.08.2018 | SK | 01.08.2018 | TR | 01.08.2018 | BG | 01.11.2018 | GR | 02.11.2018 | PT | 03.12.2018 | IE | 23.03.2019 | LU | 23.03.2019 | BE | 31.03.2019 | CH | 31.03.2019 | LI | 31.03.2019 | [2021/32] |
Former [2021/26] | AT | 01.08.2018 | |
CY | 01.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 01.08.2018 | ||
DK | 01.08.2018 | ||
EE | 01.08.2018 | ||
FI | 01.08.2018 | ||
MC | 01.08.2018 | ||
NL | 01.08.2018 | ||
PL | 01.08.2018 | ||
RO | 01.08.2018 | ||
SE | 01.08.2018 | ||
SI | 01.08.2018 | ||
SK | 01.08.2018 | ||
TR | 01.08.2018 | ||
BG | 01.11.2018 | ||
GR | 02.11.2018 | ||
PT | 03.12.2018 | ||
IE | 23.03.2019 | ||
LU | 23.03.2019 | ||
BE | 31.03.2019 | ||
CH | 31.03.2019 | ||
LI | 31.03.2019 | ||
Former [2020/29] | AT | 01.08.2018 | |
CZ | 01.08.2018 | ||
DK | 01.08.2018 | ||
EE | 01.08.2018 | ||
FI | 01.08.2018 | ||
MC | 01.08.2018 | ||
NL | 01.08.2018 | ||
PL | 01.08.2018 | ||
RO | 01.08.2018 | ||
SE | 01.08.2018 | ||
SI | 01.08.2018 | ||
SK | 01.08.2018 | ||
TR | 01.08.2018 | ||
BG | 01.11.2018 | ||
GR | 02.11.2018 | ||
PT | 03.12.2018 | ||
IE | 23.03.2019 | ||
LU | 23.03.2019 | ||
BE | 31.03.2019 | ||
CH | 31.03.2019 | ||
LI | 31.03.2019 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AT | 01.08.2018 | |
CZ | 01.08.2018 | ||
DK | 01.08.2018 | ||
EE | 01.08.2018 | ||
FI | 01.08.2018 | ||
MC | 01.08.2018 | ||
NL | 01.08.2018 | ||
PL | 01.08.2018 | ||
RO | 01.08.2018 | ||
SE | 01.08.2018 | ||
SI | 01.08.2018 | ||
SK | 01.08.2018 | ||
TR | 01.08.2018 | ||
BG | 01.11.2018 | ||
GR | 02.11.2018 | ||
IE | 23.03.2019 | ||
LU | 23.03.2019 | ||
BE | 31.03.2019 | ||
CH | 31.03.2019 | ||
LI | 31.03.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AT | 01.08.2018 | |
CZ | 01.08.2018 | ||
DK | 01.08.2018 | ||
EE | 01.08.2018 | ||
FI | 01.08.2018 | ||
MC | 01.08.2018 | ||
NL | 01.08.2018 | ||
PL | 01.08.2018 | ||
RO | 01.08.2018 | ||
SE | 01.08.2018 | ||
SI | 01.08.2018 | ||
SK | 01.08.2018 | ||
BG | 01.11.2018 | ||
GR | 02.11.2018 | ||
IE | 23.03.2019 | ||
LU | 23.03.2019 | ||
BE | 31.03.2019 | ||
CH | 31.03.2019 | ||
LI | 31.03.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AT | 01.08.2018 | |
CZ | 01.08.2018 | ||
DK | 01.08.2018 | ||
EE | 01.08.2018 | ||
FI | 01.08.2018 | ||
MC | 01.08.2018 | ||
NL | 01.08.2018 | ||
PL | 01.08.2018 | ||
RO | 01.08.2018 | ||
SE | 01.08.2018 | ||
SI | 01.08.2018 | ||
SK | 01.08.2018 | ||
BG | 01.11.2018 | ||
GR | 02.11.2018 | ||
IE | 23.03.2019 | ||
LU | 23.03.2019 | ||
Former [2020/01] | AT | 01.08.2018 | |
CZ | 01.08.2018 | ||
DK | 01.08.2018 | ||
EE | 01.08.2018 | ||
FI | 01.08.2018 | ||
MC | 01.08.2018 | ||
NL | 01.08.2018 | ||
PL | 01.08.2018 | ||
RO | 01.08.2018 | ||
SE | 01.08.2018 | ||
SI | 01.08.2018 | ||
SK | 01.08.2018 | ||
BG | 01.11.2018 | ||
GR | 02.11.2018 | ||
LU | 23.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/46] | AT | 01.08.2018 | |
CZ | 01.08.2018 | ||
DK | 01.08.2018 | ||
EE | 01.08.2018 | ||
FI | 01.08.2018 | ||
MC | 01.08.2018 | ||
NL | 01.08.2018 | ||
PL | 01.08.2018 | ||
RO | 01.08.2018 | ||
SE | 01.08.2018 | ||
SI | 01.08.2018 | ||
SK | 01.08.2018 | ||
BG | 01.11.2018 | ||
GR | 02.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AT | 01.08.2018 | |
CZ | 01.08.2018 | ||
DK | 01.08.2018 | ||
EE | 01.08.2018 | ||
FI | 01.08.2018 | ||
NL | 01.08.2018 | ||
PL | 01.08.2018 | ||
RO | 01.08.2018 | ||
SE | 01.08.2018 | ||
SI | 01.08.2018 | ||
SK | 01.08.2018 | ||
BG | 01.11.2018 | ||
GR | 02.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AT | 01.08.2018 | |
CZ | 01.08.2018 | ||
DK | 01.08.2018 | ||
EE | 01.08.2018 | ||
FI | 01.08.2018 | ||
NL | 01.08.2018 | ||
PL | 01.08.2018 | ||
RO | 01.08.2018 | ||
SE | 01.08.2018 | ||
SK | 01.08.2018 | ||
BG | 01.11.2018 | ||
GR | 02.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/24] | AT | 01.08.2018 | |
CZ | 01.08.2018 | ||
EE | 01.08.2018 | ||
FI | 01.08.2018 | ||
NL | 01.08.2018 | ||
PL | 01.08.2018 | ||
RO | 01.08.2018 | ||
SE | 01.08.2018 | ||
SK | 01.08.2018 | ||
BG | 01.11.2018 | ||
GR | 02.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/22] | AT | 01.08.2018 | |
CZ | 01.08.2018 | ||
FI | 01.08.2018 | ||
NL | 01.08.2018 | ||
PL | 01.08.2018 | ||
RO | 01.08.2018 | ||
SE | 01.08.2018 | ||
BG | 01.11.2018 | ||
GR | 02.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | AT | 01.08.2018 | |
FI | 01.08.2018 | ||
NL | 01.08.2018 | ||
PL | 01.08.2018 | ||
SE | 01.08.2018 | ||
BG | 01.11.2018 | ||
GR | 02.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | FI | 01.08.2018 | |
NL | 01.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | FI | 01.08.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5006992 (SKEIRIK RICHARD D [US]) [Y] 4-7 * column 35, line 30 - line 50 * * column 65, line 14 - column 66, line 26 *; | [DXY]WO0152221 (SAAB AB [SE], et al) [DX] 1-3,11-13 * page 9, line 19 - page 13, line 6 * [Y] 4-7; | [DA]WO0152008 (SAAB AB [SE], et al) |