EP1475297 - Safety arrangement at picking truck following a walking person [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2004/46] | Safety arrangement at picking truck following a walking person . | ||
[2007/41] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.08.2008 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.08.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 22.09.2010 [2010/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Toyota Industries Sweden AB 595 81 Mjölby / SE | [2007/46] |
Former [2004/46] | For all designated states BT INDUSTRIES AB 59581 Mjölby / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Carlsson, Magnus Linds lilla Södergard 590 74 Vikingstad / SE | 02 /
Wernborg, Sven-Erik Burensköldsvagen 28A 595 32 Mjölby / SE | 03 /
Svartling, Cecilia Poppelgatan 5 595 33 Mjölby / SE | [2004/46] | Representative(s) | Berglund, Erik Wilhelm Berglunds Patentbyrå AB Aspebråten 590 55 Sturefors / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/46] | Berglund, Erik Wilhelm Berglunds Patentbyra AB Aspebraten 590 55 Sturefors / SE | Application number, filing date | 04445056.7 | 07.05.2004 | [2004/46] | Priority number, date | SE20030001345 | 08.05.2003 Original published format: SE 0301345 | [2004/46] | Filing language | SV | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1475297 | Date: | 10.11.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1475297 | Date: | 10.10.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/41] | Type: | B8 Corrected title page of specification | No.: | EP1475297 | Date: | 12.12.2007 | [2007/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.08.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B62D51/04 | [2004/46] | CPC: |
B62D51/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/46] | Title | German: | Sicherheitseinrichtung für einen handgeführten, selbstfahrenden Kleinlastwagen | [2004/46] | English: | Safety arrangement at picking truck following a walking person | [2007/41] | French: | Dispositif de sécurité pour un chariot mené par un conducteur marchant | [2004/46] |
Former [2004/46] | Safety arrangement at picking truck following a walking person . | Examination procedure | 10.05.2005 | Examination requested [2005/28] | 19.12.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.06.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.03.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.07.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 16.07.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.07.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 10.10.2007 | CZ | 10.10.2007 | DK | 10.10.2007 | EE | 10.10.2007 | PL | 10.10.2007 | RO | 10.10.2007 | SI | 10.10.2007 | SK | 10.10.2007 | TR | 10.10.2007 | BG | 10.01.2008 | SE | 10.01.2008 | GR | 11.01.2008 | ES | 21.01.2008 | PT | 10.03.2008 | HU | 11.04.2008 | LU | 07.05.2008 | MC | 31.05.2008 | [2010/38] |
Former [2010/34] | CY | 10.10.2007 | |
CZ | 10.10.2007 | ||
DK | 10.10.2007 | ||
EE | 10.10.2007 | ||
PL | 10.10.2007 | ||
RO | 10.10.2007 | ||
SI | 10.10.2007 | ||
SK | 10.10.2007 | ||
BG | 10.01.2008 | ||
SE | 10.01.2008 | ||
GR | 11.01.2008 | ||
ES | 21.01.2008 | ||
PT | 10.03.2008 | ||
HU | 11.04.2008 | ||
LU | 07.05.2008 | ||
MC | 31.05.2008 | ||
Former [2010/33] | CY | 10.10.2007 | |
CZ | 10.10.2007 | ||
DK | 10.10.2007 | ||
EE | 10.10.2007 | ||
PL | 10.10.2007 | ||
RO | 10.10.2007 | ||
SI | 10.10.2007 | ||
SK | 10.10.2007 | ||
BG | 10.01.2008 | ||
SE | 10.01.2008 | ||
GR | 11.01.2008 | ||
ES | 21.01.2008 | ||
PT | 10.03.2008 | ||
LU | 07.05.2008 | ||
MC | 31.05.2008 | ||
Former [2009/35] | CY | 10.10.2007 | |
CZ | 10.10.2007 | ||
DK | 10.10.2007 | ||
EE | 10.10.2007 | ||
PL | 10.10.2007 | ||
RO | 10.10.2007 | ||
SI | 10.10.2007 | ||
SK | 10.10.2007 | ||
BG | 10.01.2008 | ||
SE | 10.01.2008 | ||
GR | 11.01.2008 | ||
ES | 21.01.2008 | ||
PT | 10.03.2008 | ||
MC | 31.05.2008 | ||
Former [2009/29] | CZ | 10.10.2007 | |
DK | 10.10.2007 | ||
EE | 10.10.2007 | ||
PL | 10.10.2007 | ||
RO | 10.10.2007 | ||
SI | 10.10.2007 | ||
SK | 10.10.2007 | ||
BG | 10.01.2008 | ||
SE | 10.01.2008 | ||
GR | 11.01.2008 | ||
ES | 21.01.2008 | ||
PT | 10.03.2008 | ||
MC | 31.05.2008 | ||
Former [2009/11] | CZ | 10.10.2007 | |
DK | 10.10.2007 | ||
EE | 10.10.2007 | ||
PL | 10.10.2007 | ||
RO | 10.10.2007 | ||
SK | 10.10.2007 | ||
BG | 10.01.2008 | ||
SE | 10.01.2008 | ||
GR | 11.01.2008 | ||
ES | 21.01.2008 | ||
PT | 10.03.2008 | ||
MC | 31.05.2008 | ||
Former [2009/04] | CZ | 10.10.2007 | |
DK | 10.10.2007 | ||
PL | 10.10.2007 | ||
RO | 10.10.2007 | ||
SK | 10.10.2007 | ||
BG | 10.01.2008 | ||
SE | 10.01.2008 | ||
ES | 21.01.2008 | ||
PT | 10.03.2008 | ||
MC | 31.05.2008 | ||
Former [2008/39] | CZ | 10.10.2007 | |
DK | 10.10.2007 | ||
PL | 10.10.2007 | ||
RO | 10.10.2007 | ||
SK | 10.10.2007 | ||
BG | 10.01.2008 | ||
SE | 10.01.2008 | ||
ES | 21.01.2008 | ||
PT | 10.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/35] | CZ | 10.10.2007 | |
DK | 10.10.2007 | ||
PL | 10.10.2007 | ||
BG | 10.01.2008 | ||
SE | 10.01.2008 | ||
ES | 21.01.2008 | ||
PT | 10.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/24] | PL | 10.10.2007 | |
BG | 10.01.2008 | ||
SE | 10.01.2008 | ||
ES | 21.01.2008 | ||
PT | 10.03.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4036323 (SCHMALL KARL-HEINZ) [A] 1 * column 5, line 43 - line 60; figure - *; | [A]US4336858 (LOYZIM ROBERT J) [A] 1 * column 7, line 32 - column 8, line 3; figure -; claims 6,7 *; | [A]US4386674 (SUGATA TAKASHI [JP]) [A] 4* figure -; claims 1-3,7 *; | [A]US6094897 (VELKE JAMES D [US], et al) [A] 1,4 * column 17, line 6 - line 26; figure 10 * |