EP1604749 - Method and system for cleaning a soil containing contaminants [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.06.2010 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states D2G Rue Anna Boch 34 7100 La Louvière / BE | [2009/10] |
Former [2005/50] | For all designated states Deep Green 245 avenue Montjoie 1180 Brussels / BE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Haemers, Jan 43, rue de l'Escrime 1190 Bruxelles / BE | 02 /
Zwaan, Harry 200, Stadhoudersring 2713 GH Zoetermeer / NL | 03 /
Barbay, John 13110 SW Welligton Pl. Tigard OR 97223 Oregon / US | 04 /
Falcinelli, Ugo 171/3, Bvd. Lambermont 1030 Bruxelles / BE | [2005/50] | Representative(s) | Brants, Johan P.E., et al De Clercq, Brants & Partners cv Edgard Gevaertdreef 10a 9830 Sint-Martens-Latem / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/50] | Brants, Johan P.E., et al De Clercq, Brants & Partners cv Edgard Gevaertdreef 10a 9830 Sint-Martens-Latem / BE | Application number, filing date | 04447142.3 | 11.06.2004 | [2005/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1604749 | Date: | 14.12.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1604749 | Date: | 29.07.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.11.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B09C1/06 | [2005/50] | CPC: |
B09C1/06 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/50] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Reinigen eines kontaminierten Bodens | [2005/50] | English: | Method and system for cleaning a soil containing contaminants | [2005/50] | French: | Procédé et système pour le nettoyage d'un sol contaminé | [2005/50] | Examination procedure | 12.06.2006 | Examination requested [2006/30] | 12.01.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.07.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.07.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.11.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.01.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.04.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.05.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.11.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.02.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.06.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 09.06.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.05.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2008 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   19.12.2008 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 29.07.2009 | CZ | 29.07.2009 | EE | 29.07.2009 | FI | 29.07.2009 | PL | 29.07.2009 | RO | 29.07.2009 | SE | 29.07.2009 | SI | 29.07.2009 | SK | 29.07.2009 | TR | 29.07.2009 | BG | 29.10.2009 | GR | 30.10.2009 | PT | 29.11.2009 | HU | 30.01.2010 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/42] | CY | 29.07.2009 | |
CZ | 29.07.2009 | ||
EE | 29.07.2009 | ||
FI | 29.07.2009 | ||
PL | 29.07.2009 | ||
RO | 29.07.2009 | ||
SE | 29.07.2009 | ||
SI | 29.07.2009 | ||
SK | 29.07.2009 | ||
BG | 29.10.2009 | ||
GR | 30.10.2009 | ||
PT | 29.11.2009 | ||
HU | 30.01.2010 | ||
Former [2012/37] | CY | 29.07.2009 | |
CZ | 29.07.2009 | ||
EE | 29.07.2009 | ||
FI | 29.07.2009 | ||
PL | 29.07.2009 | ||
RO | 29.07.2009 | ||
SE | 29.07.2009 | ||
SI | 29.07.2009 | ||
SK | 29.07.2009 | ||
BG | 29.10.2009 | ||
GR | 30.10.2009 | ||
PT | 29.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/50] | CZ | 29.07.2009 | |
EE | 29.07.2009 | ||
FI | 29.07.2009 | ||
PL | 29.07.2009 | ||
RO | 29.07.2009 | ||
SE | 29.07.2009 | ||
SI | 29.07.2009 | ||
SK | 29.07.2009 | ||
BG | 29.10.2009 | ||
GR | 30.10.2009 | ||
PT | 29.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/23] | CZ | 29.07.2009 | |
EE | 29.07.2009 | ||
FI | 29.07.2009 | ||
PL | 29.07.2009 | ||
RO | 29.07.2009 | ||
SE | 29.07.2009 | ||
SI | 29.07.2009 | ||
SK | 29.07.2009 | ||
BG | 29.10.2009 | ||
PT | 29.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/22] | CZ | 29.07.2009 | |
EE | 29.07.2009 | ||
FI | 29.07.2009 | ||
PL | 29.07.2009 | ||
RO | 29.07.2009 | ||
SE | 29.07.2009 | ||
SI | 29.07.2009 | ||
BG | 29.10.2009 | ||
PT | 29.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/20] | EE | 29.07.2009 | |
FI | 29.07.2009 | ||
PL | 29.07.2009 | ||
SE | 29.07.2009 | ||
SI | 29.07.2009 | ||
BG | 29.10.2009 | ||
PT | 29.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/17] | FI | 29.07.2009 | |
PL | 29.07.2009 | ||
SE | 29.07.2009 | ||
SI | 29.07.2009 | ||
BG | 29.10.2009 | ||
PT | 29.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/11] | FI | 29.07.2009 | |
PL | 29.07.2009 | ||
SE | 29.07.2009 | ||
SI | 29.07.2009 | ||
Former [2010/09] | FI | 29.07.2009 | |
SE | 29.07.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5228804 (BALCH THOMAS H [US]) [X] 1-10,14,16-24,26-29 * column 3, line 4 - line 55 * * column 5, line 35 - line 49 * * column 8, line 28 - line 64 *; | [X]US5337684 (SUMMERS BURG W [US]) [X] 1,2,4-6,8,11,19-22 * column 2, line 26 - line 66 * * column 3, line 12 - line 15 * * column 3, line 50 - line 52 * * column 6, line 21 - line 35 *; | [A]WO03035290 (SHELL OIL CO [US], et al) [A] 1,2,8,12-14,16,19,21,24,26-28 * page 9, line 29 - line 37; figure 1 * * page 12, line 6 - line 7 ** page 13, line 33 - line 34 * | by applicant | US5169263 | US5244310 | US5318116 | US6000882 | US2002018697 |