EP1612870 - Method of manufacturing a thermoelectric generator and thermoelectric generator thus obtained [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.04.2014 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.04.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.05.2014 [2014/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states IMEC Kapeldreef 75 3001 Leuven / BE | [2009/33] |
Former [2006/01] | For all designated states INTERUNIVERSITAIR MICROELEKTRONICA CENTRUM VZW Kapeldreef 75 3001 Leuven / BE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Leonov, Vladimir Pater Damiaanplein 11/0401 3000 Leuven / BE | 02 /
Fiorini, Paolo Notelaarstraat 53 1000 Brussel / BE | 03 /
Sedky, Sherif 3 Mousadak Street, Dokki Gize / EG | 04 /
Van Hoof, Chris Koning Leopold III laan 19 3001 Leuven / BE | 05 /
Baert, Kris St. Jorislaan 9 3001 Leuven / BE | [2006/01] | Representative(s) | Bird, William Edward, et al Bird Goën & Co Wetenschapspark Arenberg Gaston Geenslaan 9 3001 Heverlee / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/01] | Bird, William Edward, et al Bird Goen & Co., Klein Dalenstraat 42A 3020 Winksele / BE | Application number, filing date | 04447161.3 | 01.07.2004 | [2006/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1612870 | Date: | 04.01.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.12.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H01L35/34, H01L35/30 | [2006/01] | CPC: |
H10N10/13 (EP,US);
H10N10/01 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/01] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung eines thermoelektrischen Generators und thermoelektrischer Generator dadurch erhalten | [2006/01] | English: | Method of manufacturing a thermoelectric generator and thermoelectric generator thus obtained | [2006/01] | French: | Procéde de fabrication d'un générateur thermoélectrique et générateur thermoélectrique obtenu | [2006/01] | Examination procedure | 01.07.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.07.2005 | Examination requested [2006/20] | 02.12.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.12.2008 | Invitation to provide information on prior art | 23.03.2009 | Reply to the invitation to provide information on prior art | 09.04.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.07.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.11.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/22] | 09.01.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2014/22] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.12.2008 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 24.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2013 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE3404137 (DAHLBERG REINHARD); | [A]US5712448 (VANDERSANDE IAN W [US], et al); | [A]US2002092557 (GHOSHAL UTTAM SHYAMALINDU [US]); |