EP1548044 - Method of preparing derivatives of polyarylene vinylene and method of preparing an electronic device including same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.05.2014 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG, HU, LU | published on 26.08.2015 [2015/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states IMEC Kapeldreef 75 3001 Leuven / BE | For all designated states Universiteit Hasselt Martelarenlaan 42 3500 Hasselt / BE | [2013/09] |
Former [2013/07] | For all designated states IMEC Kapeldreef 75 3001 Leuven / BE | ||
For all designated states Universiteit Hasselt Campus Diepenbeek Agoralaan - Gebouw D 3590 Diepenbeek / BE | |||
Former [2009/33] | For all designated states IMEC Kapeldreef 75 3001 Leuven / BE | ||
For all designated states Limburgs Universitair Centrum Universitaire Campus, Wetenschapspark 1 3590 Diepenbeek / BE | |||
Former [2005/26] | For all designated states INTERUNIVERSITAIR MICROELEKTRONICA CENTRUM VZW Kapeldreef 75 3001 Leuven / BE | ||
For all designated states Limburgs Universitair Centrum Universitaire Campus, Wetenschapspark 1 3590 Diepenbeek / BE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Vanderzande, Dirk Berenbroekstraat 87 3500 Hasselt / BE | 02 /
Lutsen, Laurence 5 rue Wenceslas Coebergher 59210 Coudekerque-Branche / FR | 03 /
Henckens, Anja Venderstraat 42 3910 Neerpelt / BE | 04 /
Colladet, Kristof Maastrichtersteenweg 131/3 3500 Hasselt / BE | [2013/20] |
Former [2005/26] | 01 /
Vanderzande, Dirk Berenbroekstraat 87 3500 Hasselt / BE | ||
02 /
Lutsen, Laurence 65 rue Gustave Fontaine, App. 16 59210 Coudekerque-Branche / FR | |||
03 /
Henckens, Anja Venderstraat 42 3910 Neerpelt / BE | |||
04 /
Colladet, Kristof Maastrichtersteenweg 131/3 3500 Hasselt / BE | Representative(s) | Bird, Ariane, et al Bird Goën & Co Wetenschapspark Arenberg Gaston Geenslaan 9 3001 Heverlee / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/27] | Bird, Ariane, et al Bird Goën & Co Gaston Geenslaan 9 3001 Heverlee / BE | ||
Former [2005/26] | Bird, Ariane, et al Bird Goen & Co, Klein Dalenstraat 42A 3020 Winksele / BE | Application number, filing date | 04447233.0 | 22.10.2004 | [2005/26] | Priority number, date | EP20030447264 | 22.10.2003 Original published format: EP 03447264 | [2005/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1548044 | Date: | 29.06.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1548044 | Date: | 22.11.2006 | [2006/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1548044 | Date: | 03.07.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.10.2006 | Classification | IPC: | C08G61/02, C08G61/12, C08G61/00 | [2006/47] | CPC: |
C08G61/12 (EP);
C08G61/02 (EP);
C08G61/126 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2005/26] | C08G61/00, C08G61/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/26] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Polyarylenvinylenderivaten und Herstellungsmethode für eine elektronische Vorrichtung daraus. | [2005/26] | English: | Method of preparing derivatives of polyarylene vinylene and method of preparing an electronic device including same | [2005/26] | French: | Procédé pour préparer des dérivés de vinylène de polyarylène et procédé pour fabriquer un dispositif électronique | [2013/27] |
Former [2005/26] | Procédé pour préparer des dérivés de vinylène de polyarylène et procédé pour fabriquer un dispositif électronique | Examination procedure | 22.05.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.05.2007 | Examination requested [2007/27] | 16.07.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.10.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.05.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.07.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.02.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.05.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 13.05.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.07.2007 | Opposition(s) | 04.04.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 22.10.2004 | AT | 03.07.2013 | BE | 03.07.2013 | BG | 03.07.2013 | CY | 03.07.2013 | CZ | 03.07.2013 | DK | 03.07.2013 | EE | 03.07.2013 | FI | 03.07.2013 | IT | 03.07.2013 | MC | 03.07.2013 | NL | 03.07.2013 | PL | 03.07.2013 | RO | 03.07.2013 | SE | 03.07.2013 | SI | 03.07.2013 | SK | 03.07.2013 | TR | 03.07.2013 | GR | 04.10.2013 | ES | 14.10.2013 | IE | 22.10.2013 | LU | 22.10.2013 | CH | 31.10.2013 | LI | 31.10.2013 | PT | 04.11.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 03.07.2013 | |
BE | 03.07.2013 | ||
CY | 03.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 03.07.2013 | ||
DK | 03.07.2013 | ||
EE | 03.07.2013 | ||
FI | 03.07.2013 | ||
IT | 03.07.2013 | ||
MC | 03.07.2013 | ||
NL | 03.07.2013 | ||
PL | 03.07.2013 | ||
RO | 03.07.2013 | ||
SE | 03.07.2013 | ||
SI | 03.07.2013 | ||
SK | 03.07.2013 | ||
TR | 03.07.2013 | ||
GR | 04.10.2013 | ||
ES | 14.10.2013 | ||
IE | 22.10.2013 | ||
CH | 31.10.2013 | ||
LI | 31.10.2013 | ||
PT | 04.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/48] | AT | 03.07.2013 | |
BE | 03.07.2013 | ||
CY | 03.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 03.07.2013 | ||
DK | 03.07.2013 | ||
EE | 03.07.2013 | ||
FI | 03.07.2013 | ||
IT | 03.07.2013 | ||
MC | 03.07.2013 | ||
NL | 03.07.2013 | ||
PL | 03.07.2013 | ||
RO | 03.07.2013 | ||
SE | 03.07.2013 | ||
SI | 03.07.2013 | ||
SK | 03.07.2013 | ||
GR | 04.10.2013 | ||
ES | 14.10.2013 | ||
IE | 22.10.2013 | ||
CH | 31.10.2013 | ||
LI | 31.10.2013 | ||
PT | 04.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/34] | AT | 03.07.2013 | |
BE | 03.07.2013 | ||
CY | 03.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 03.07.2013 | ||
DK | 03.07.2013 | ||
EE | 03.07.2013 | ||
FI | 03.07.2013 | ||
IT | 03.07.2013 | ||
MC | 03.07.2013 | ||
NL | 03.07.2013 | ||
PL | 03.07.2013 | ||
RO | 03.07.2013 | ||
SE | 03.07.2013 | ||
SI | 03.07.2013 | ||
SK | 03.07.2013 | ||
GR | 04.10.2013 | ||
ES | 14.10.2013 | ||
CH | 31.10.2013 | ||
LI | 31.10.2013 | ||
PT | 04.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/25] | AT | 03.07.2013 | |
BE | 03.07.2013 | ||
CY | 03.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 03.07.2013 | ||
DK | 03.07.2013 | ||
EE | 03.07.2013 | ||
FI | 03.07.2013 | ||
IT | 03.07.2013 | ||
MC | 03.07.2013 | ||
NL | 03.07.2013 | ||
PL | 03.07.2013 | ||
RO | 03.07.2013 | ||
SE | 03.07.2013 | ||
SI | 03.07.2013 | ||
SK | 03.07.2013 | ||
GR | 04.10.2013 | ||
ES | 14.10.2013 | ||
PT | 04.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/24] | AT | 03.07.2013 | |
BE | 03.07.2013 | ||
CY | 03.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 03.07.2013 | ||
DK | 03.07.2013 | ||
EE | 03.07.2013 | ||
FI | 03.07.2013 | ||
IT | 03.07.2013 | ||
NL | 03.07.2013 | ||
PL | 03.07.2013 | ||
RO | 03.07.2013 | ||
SE | 03.07.2013 | ||
SI | 03.07.2013 | ||
SK | 03.07.2013 | ||
GR | 04.10.2013 | ||
ES | 14.10.2013 | ||
PT | 04.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/23] | AT | 03.07.2013 | |
BE | 03.07.2013 | ||
CY | 03.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 03.07.2013 | ||
DK | 03.07.2013 | ||
EE | 03.07.2013 | ||
FI | 03.07.2013 | ||
NL | 03.07.2013 | ||
PL | 03.07.2013 | ||
RO | 03.07.2013 | ||
SE | 03.07.2013 | ||
SI | 03.07.2013 | ||
SK | 03.07.2013 | ||
GR | 04.10.2013 | ||
ES | 14.10.2013 | ||
PT | 04.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/22] | AT | 03.07.2013 | |
BE | 03.07.2013 | ||
CY | 03.07.2013 | ||
DK | 03.07.2013 | ||
FI | 03.07.2013 | ||
NL | 03.07.2013 | ||
PL | 03.07.2013 | ||
RO | 03.07.2013 | ||
SE | 03.07.2013 | ||
SI | 03.07.2013 | ||
GR | 04.10.2013 | ||
ES | 14.10.2013 | ||
PT | 04.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 03.07.2013 | |
BE | 03.07.2013 | ||
CY | 03.07.2013 | ||
DK | 03.07.2013 | ||
FI | 03.07.2013 | ||
NL | 03.07.2013 | ||
PL | 03.07.2013 | ||
SE | 03.07.2013 | ||
SI | 03.07.2013 | ||
GR | 04.10.2013 | ||
ES | 14.10.2013 | ||
PT | 04.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/14] | AT | 03.07.2013 | |
BE | 03.07.2013 | ||
CY | 03.07.2013 | ||
FI | 03.07.2013 | ||
NL | 03.07.2013 | ||
PL | 03.07.2013 | ||
SE | 03.07.2013 | ||
SI | 03.07.2013 | ||
GR | 04.10.2013 | ||
ES | 14.10.2013 | ||
PT | 04.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/12] | AT | 03.07.2013 | |
BE | 03.07.2013 | ||
CY | 03.07.2013 | ||
FI | 03.07.2013 | ||
PL | 03.07.2013 | ||
SE | 03.07.2013 | ||
SI | 03.07.2013 | ||
GR | 04.10.2013 | ||
ES | 14.10.2013 | ||
PT | 04.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | AT | 03.07.2013 | |
BE | 03.07.2013 | ||
CY | 03.07.2013 | ||
FI | 03.07.2013 | ||
PL | 03.07.2013 | ||
SE | 03.07.2013 | ||
SI | 03.07.2013 | ||
PT | 04.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | AT | 03.07.2013 | |
BE | 03.07.2013 | ||
CY | 03.07.2013 | ||
SE | 03.07.2013 | ||
SI | 03.07.2013 | ||
PT | 04.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | AT | 03.07.2013 | |
BE | 03.07.2013 | ||
SE | 03.07.2013 | ||
SI | 03.07.2013 | ||
PT | 04.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | SI | 03.07.2013 | |
PT | 04.11.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | SI | 03.07.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9013148 (CAMBRIDGE RES & INNOVATION [GB], et al) [A] 1* the whole document *; | [AD]EP0707022 (AT & T CORP [US]) [AD] 1 * the whole document *; | [X]US5817430 (HSIEH BING R [US]) [X] 1-42 * the whole document *; | [X] - TOYOSHIMA R ET AL, "SYNTHESIS AND PROPERTIES OF POLY(THIENYLENEVINYLENE) DERIVATIVES WITH HEXYL GROUPS", SYNTHETIC METALS, ELSEVIER SEQUOIA, LAUSANNE, CH, (19970101), vol. 84, no. 1-3, ISSN 0379-6779, pages 431 - 432, XP001077754 [X] 1-42 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0379-6779(97)80817-X | [X] - SAITO ET AL, "SYNTHESIS OF SOLUBLE POLYARYLENE VINYLENES ETC", MACROMOLECULES, WASHINGTON US, (19951120), vol. 4528, no. 24, pages 8363 - 8367, XP000539439 [X] 1-42 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ma00128a053 | by applicant | JPS504732B | - OTSU, J. POLYM. SCI., PART A: POLYM. CHEM., (2000), vol. 38, no. 12, page 2121 |