EP1656916 - Tubular element for orthopedic cast [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.08.2007 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.08.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.09.2007 [2007/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Université Libre de Bruxelles Avenue Franklin Roosevelt, 50 CP 161 1050 Bruxelles / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/20] | For all designated states Université Libre de Bruxelles Avenue Franklin Roosevelt 50, CP 161 1050 Brussels / BE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schuind, Frédéric Leuvensebaan 28 3220 Holsbeek / BE | 02 /
Liegeois, Jean-Maire Moulin de Wadeleux 411 4654 Charneux / BE | 03 /
Dejaie, Laurent Rue Fusch 6 4000 Liège / BE | 04 /
Gerday, Jonathan Rue de la Drève 54 4560 Clavier / BE | 05 /
Moulart, Françoise Rue E. Delcourt 57 1070 Bruxelles / BE | [2006/20] | Representative(s) | Van Malderen, Joëlle, et al pronovem - Office Van Malderen Avenue Josse Goffin 158 1082 Bruxelles / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/20] | Van Malderen, Joelle, et al pronovem - Office Van Malderen Avenue Josse Goffin 158 1082 Bruxelles / BE | Application number, filing date | 04447247.0 | 10.11.2004 | [2006/20] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1656916 | Date: | 17.05.2006 | Language: | FR | [2006/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.08.2005 | Classification | IPC: | A61F13/04, A61F13/06, A61F13/10, A61F13/08 | [2006/20] | CPC: |
A61F13/04 (EP);
A61F13/041 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2007/04] |
Former [2006/20] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Schlauchförmiges Element zur orthopädischen Ruhigstellen | [2006/20] | English: | Tubular element for orthopedic cast | [2006/20] | French: | Elément tubulaire pour contention orthopedique | [2006/20] | Examination procedure | 18.11.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/39] | 16.04.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2007/39] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 23.01.2007 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 23.01.2007 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 23.01.2007 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 23.01.2007 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 23.01.2007 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 23.01.2007 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 23.01.2007 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 23.01.2007 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 23.01.2007 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 23.01.2007 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 23.01.2007 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 23.01.2007 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 23.01.2007 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 23.01.2007 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 23.01.2007 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 23.01.2007 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 23.01.2007 | IS   M01   Not yet paid | 23.01.2007 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 23.01.2007 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 23.01.2007 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 23.01.2007 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 23.01.2007 | PL   M01   Not yet paid | 23.01.2007 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 23.01.2007 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 23.01.2007 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 23.01.2007 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 23.01.2007 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 23.01.2007 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 23.01.2007 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2006 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DX]US3656475 (HANRAHAN JAMES R JR) [DX] 1 * column 4, lines 4-59; claim 1 *; | [X]EP0326285 (SMITH & NEPHEW [GB]) [X] 1* page 4, lines 7-36; examples 1,2 *; | [XA]US4940047 (RICHTER ROLAND [DE], et al) [X] 1 * column 2, lines 18-20 * * column 6, line 29 - column 7, line 54; claim 10 * [A] 2-15; | [XA]US5514080 (BLOTT PATRICK L [GB], et al) [X] 1 * column 2, lines 50-58 * * column 3, lines 41-50; example 1 * * column 10, line 36 - column 11, line 30 * [A] 2-15; | [A]WO0154639 (SMITH & NEPHEW INC [US]) [A] 1-15 * page 4, lines 7-17 *; | [A]US6544204 (BRANDHOFF STEFAN [DE]) [A] 1-15 * column 2, lines 30-48 *; | [A]US2004077980 (STESS RICHARD M [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0050] - [0052] * |