EP1561734 - Lighweight aggregate for production of concrete and process of production [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.03.2007 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.09.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 28.10.2009 [2009/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Partlic, Georg, Dipl.-Ing. Auweg 6 8652 Kindberg / AT | For all designated states Trenkwalder, Anton Rainhofsiedlung 39 8670 Krieglach / AT | [2005/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2005/32] | Representative(s) | Dungler, Karin, et al Patentanwälte Dipl.-Ing. Manfred Beer und Dipl.-Ing. Reinhard Hehenberger Postfach 264 1071 Wien / AT | [N/P] |
Former [2005/32] | Dungler, Karin, et al c/o Patentanwälte Dipl.-Ing. Manfred Beer und Dipl.-Ing. Reinhard Hehenberger Lindengasse 8 1070 Wien / AT | Application number, filing date | 04450013.0 | 20.01.2004 | [2005/32] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1561734 | Date: | 10.08.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1561734 | Date: | 29.03.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.06.2004 | Classification | IPC: | C04B18/02 | [2005/32] | CPC: |
C04B28/021 (EP);
C04B18/021 (EP);
C04B2111/00405 (EP);
Y02W30/91 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C04B18/021, C04B18/027, C04B18/085 (EP);
C04B28/021, C04B7/02, C04B38/02 (EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/32] | Extension states | AL | 17.02.2004 | LT | 17.02.2004 | LV | 17.02.2004 | MK | 17.02.2004 | Title | German: | Leichtzuschlag für die Betonherstellung sowie Verfahren zu dessen Herstellung | [2005/32] | English: | Lighweight aggregate for production of concrete and process of production | [2005/32] | French: | Agrégat léger pour la fabrication du béton et procédé de fabrication | [2005/32] | Examination procedure | 30.03.2004 | Examination requested [2005/32] | 06.07.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.08.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.12.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 01.12.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.01.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 29.03.2006 | CZ | 29.03.2006 | EE | 29.03.2006 | FI | 29.03.2006 | GB | 29.03.2006 | IE | 29.03.2006 | NL | 29.03.2006 | RO | 29.03.2006 | SI | 29.03.2006 | SK | 29.03.2006 | TR | 29.03.2006 | BG | 29.06.2006 | DK | 29.06.2006 | SE | 29.06.2006 | GR | 30.06.2006 | ES | 10.07.2006 | PT | 29.08.2006 | HU | 30.09.2006 | [2009/44] |
Former [2009/41] | CY | 29.03.2006 | |
CZ | 29.03.2006 | ||
EE | 29.03.2006 | ||
FI | 29.03.2006 | ||
GB | 29.03.2006 | ||
IE | 29.03.2006 | ||
NL | 29.03.2006 | ||
RO | 29.03.2006 | ||
SI | 29.03.2006 | ||
SK | 29.03.2006 | ||
BG | 29.06.2006 | ||
DK | 29.06.2006 | ||
SE | 29.06.2006 | ||
GR | 30.06.2006 | ||
ES | 10.07.2006 | ||
PT | 29.08.2006 | ||
HU | 30.09.2006 | ||
Former [2009/32] | CZ | 29.03.2006 | |
EE | 29.03.2006 | ||
FI | 29.03.2006 | ||
GB | 29.03.2006 | ||
IE | 29.03.2006 | ||
NL | 29.03.2006 | ||
RO | 29.03.2006 | ||
SI | 29.03.2006 | ||
SK | 29.03.2006 | ||
BG | 29.06.2006 | ||
DK | 29.06.2006 | ||
SE | 29.06.2006 | ||
GR | 30.06.2006 | ||
ES | 10.07.2006 | ||
PT | 29.08.2006 | ||
Former [2008/38] | CZ | 29.03.2006 | |
EE | 29.03.2006 | ||
FI | 29.03.2006 | ||
GB | 29.03.2006 | ||
IE | 29.03.2006 | ||
IT | 29.03.2006 | ||
NL | 29.03.2006 | ||
RO | 29.03.2006 | ||
SI | 29.03.2006 | ||
SK | 29.03.2006 | ||
BG | 29.06.2006 | ||
DK | 29.06.2006 | ||
SE | 29.06.2006 | ||
GR | 30.06.2006 | ||
ES | 10.07.2006 | ||
PT | 29.08.2006 | ||
Former [2008/29] | CZ | 29.03.2006 | |
FI | 29.03.2006 | ||
GB | 29.03.2006 | ||
IE | 29.03.2006 | ||
IT | 29.03.2006 | ||
NL | 29.03.2006 | ||
RO | 29.03.2006 | ||
SI | 29.03.2006 | ||
SK | 29.03.2006 | ||
BG | 29.06.2006 | ||
DK | 29.06.2006 | ||
SE | 29.06.2006 | ||
GR | 30.06.2006 | ||
ES | 10.07.2006 | ||
PT | 29.08.2006 | ||
Former [2008/21] | CZ | 29.03.2006 | |
GB | 29.03.2006 | ||
IE | 29.03.2006 | ||
IT | 29.03.2006 | ||
NL | 29.03.2006 | ||
RO | 29.03.2006 | ||
SI | 29.03.2006 | ||
SK | 29.03.2006 | ||
BG | 29.06.2006 | ||
DK | 29.06.2006 | ||
SE | 29.06.2006 | ||
GR | 30.06.2006 | ||
ES | 10.07.2006 | ||
PT | 29.08.2006 | ||
Former [2007/43] | GB | 29.03.2006 | |
IE | 29.03.2006 | ||
IT | 29.03.2006 | ||
NL | 29.03.2006 | ||
RO | 29.03.2006 | ||
SI | 29.03.2006 | ||
SK | 29.03.2006 | ||
BG | 29.06.2006 | ||
DK | 29.06.2006 | ||
SE | 29.06.2006 | ||
ES | 10.07.2006 | ||
PT | 29.08.2006 | ||
Former [2007/27] | GB | 29.03.2006 | |
IE | 29.03.2006 | ||
NL | 29.03.2006 | ||
SI | 29.03.2006 | ||
SK | 29.03.2006 | ||
BG | 29.06.2006 | ||
DK | 29.06.2006 | ||
SE | 29.06.2006 | ||
ES | 10.07.2006 | ||
PT | 29.08.2006 | ||
Former [2007/21] | IE | 29.03.2006 | |
NL | 29.03.2006 | ||
SI | 29.03.2006 | ||
SK | 29.03.2006 | ||
BG | 29.06.2006 | ||
DK | 29.06.2006 | ||
SE | 29.06.2006 | ||
ES | 10.07.2006 | ||
PT | 29.08.2006 | ||
Former [2007/15] | IE | 29.03.2006 | |
SI | 29.03.2006 | ||
SK | 29.03.2006 | ||
BG | 29.06.2006 | ||
DK | 29.06.2006 | ||
SE | 29.06.2006 | ||
ES | 10.07.2006 | ||
PT | 29.08.2006 | ||
Former [2007/03] | SI | 29.03.2006 | |
SK | 29.03.2006 | ||
BG | 29.06.2006 | ||
SE | 29.06.2006 | ||
ES | 10.07.2006 | ||
Former [2006/50] | SI | 29.03.2006 | |
BG | 29.06.2006 | ||
SE | 29.06.2006 | ||
ES | 10.07.2006 | ||
Former [2006/49] | SI | 29.03.2006 | |
BG | 29.06.2006 | ||
SE | 29.06.2006 | ||
Former [2006/46] | SI | 29.03.2006 | |
SE | 29.06.2006 | ||
Former [2006/40] | SI | 29.03.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP2001328852 ; | [A]JPS59128256 ; | [XY]US4741782 (STYRON ROBERT W [US]) [X] 1,3,7,9,10 * abstract * * column 3, line 54 - column 4, line 32 * * column 6, line 65 - column 7, line 17 * [Y] 4,8,11; | [X]US6334895 (BLAND ALAN E [US]) [X] 1-3,5-7,10 * the whole document *; | [YD]EP1188726 (PARTLIC GEORG DIPL ING [AT], et al) [YD] 8,11 * the whole document *; | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20020403), vol. 2002, no. 03, & JP2001328852 A 20011127 (SUMITOMO METAL MINING CO LTD) [X] 1,3,10 * abstract * * table 1 * | [Y] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS + INDEXES, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY. COLUMBUS, US, (19910128), ISSN 0009-2258, XP000188175 [Y] 4 * abstract * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1984, no. 35, Database accession no. 1984-217055, XP002279976 & JPS59128256 A 19840724 (NODA PLYWOOD MFG CO LTD) [A] 2 * abstract * |