EP1464932 - Pressure regulator and device for the continuous measurement of a dynamical liquid consumption [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2004/41] | Method for the continuous measurement of a dynamical liquid consumption, pressure regulator and device for the continuous measurement of a dynamical liquid consumption | ||
[2017/29] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.10.2018 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 10.11.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 05.07.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.06.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, PT | published on 08.07.2020 [2020/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AVL List GmbH Hans-List-Platz 1 8020 Graz / AT | [2004/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wiesinger, Michael, Dr. Liliencrongasse 18 8010 Graz / AT | 02 /
Purkathofer, Ferdinand, Ing. Willersdorferstrasse 51 8061 St. Radegund / AT | [2004/41] | Representative(s) | Patentanwälte Pinter & Weiss OG Prinz-Eugen-Straße 70 1040 Wien / AT | [2014/42] |
Former [2012/44] | Pinter, Rudolf, et al Pinter & Weiss OG Patentanwälte Prinz-Eugen-Strasse 70 1040 Wien / AT | ||
Former [2009/26] | Laminger, Norbert, et al Pinter, Laminger & Weiss OG Patentanwälte Prinz-Eugen-Strasse 70 1040 Wien / AT | ||
Former [2004/41] | Laminger, Norbert, et al Prinz-Eugen-Strasse 70 1040 Wien / AT | Application number, filing date | 04450037.9 | 25.02.2004 | [2004/41] | Priority number, date | AT20030000198 | 21.03.2003 Original published format: AT 1982003 | [2004/41] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1464932 | Date: | 06.10.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/41] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1464932 | Date: | 02.05.2007 | [2007/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1464932 | Date: | 13.12.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.04.2007 | Classification | IPC: | F02M37/00, G01F9/00, G01F9/02, G05D16/06 | [2017/29] | CPC: |
G01F9/008 (EP,US);
F02M37/0029 (EP,US);
F02M37/0052 (EP,US);
G01F9/023 (EP,US);
G05D16/0655 (US);
G05D16/0663 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2007/18] | G01F9/00, G05D16/00 | ||
Former IPC [2004/41] | G01F9/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2017/50] |
Former [2004/41] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Druckregler und Vorrichtung zur kontinuierlichen Messung eines dynamischen Flüssigkeitsverbrauchs | [2017/29] | English: | Pressure regulator and device for the continuous measurement of a dynamical liquid consumption | [2017/29] | French: | Régulateur de pression et dispositif pour la mesure continue de la consommation dynamique de liquid | [2017/29] |
Former [2004/41] | Verfahren zur kontinuierlichen Messung eines dynamischen Flüssigkeitsverbrauchs, sowie Druckregler und Vorrichtung zur kontinuierlichen Messung eines dynamischen Flüssigkeitsverbrauchs | ||
Former [2004/41] | Method for the continuous measurement of a dynamical liquid consumption, pressure regulator and device for the continuous measurement of a dynamical liquid consumption | ||
Former [2004/41] | Procédé pour la mesure continue de la consommation dynamique de liquid, régulateur de pression et dispositif pour la mesure continue de la consommation dynamique de liquid | Examination procedure | 30.10.2007 | Examination requested [2007/50] | 09.06.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.12.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.09.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.03.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.07.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.01.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.07.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.11.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 02.11.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.11.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.06.2011 | Opposition(s) | 14.09.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 19.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 25.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 23.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 24.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 23.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 14 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 25.02.2004 | CY | 13.12.2017 | CZ | 13.12.2017 | DK | 13.12.2017 | EE | 13.12.2017 | FI | 13.12.2017 | MC | 13.12.2017 | NL | 13.12.2017 | PT | 13.12.2017 | RO | 13.12.2017 | SI | 13.12.2017 | SK | 13.12.2017 | TR | 13.12.2017 | AT | 25.02.2018 | IE | 25.02.2018 | LU | 25.02.2018 | BE | 28.02.2018 | CH | 28.02.2018 | LI | 28.02.2018 | BG | 13.03.2018 | GR | 14.03.2018 | [2020/28] |
Former [2020/16] | CY | 13.12.2017 | |
CZ | 13.12.2017 | ||
DK | 13.12.2017 | ||
EE | 13.12.2017 | ||
FI | 13.12.2017 | ||
MC | 13.12.2017 | ||
NL | 13.12.2017 | ||
RO | 13.12.2017 | ||
SI | 13.12.2017 | ||
SK | 13.12.2017 | ||
TR | 13.12.2017 | ||
AT | 25.02.2018 | ||
IE | 25.02.2018 | ||
LU | 25.02.2018 | ||
BE | 28.02.2018 | ||
CH | 28.02.2018 | ||
LI | 28.02.2018 | ||
BG | 13.03.2018 | ||
GR | 14.03.2018 | ||
Former [2019/23] | CY | 13.12.2017 | |
CZ | 13.12.2017 | ||
DK | 13.12.2017 | ||
EE | 13.12.2017 | ||
FI | 13.12.2017 | ||
MC | 13.12.2017 | ||
NL | 13.12.2017 | ||
RO | 13.12.2017 | ||
SI | 13.12.2017 | ||
SK | 13.12.2017 | ||
AT | 25.02.2018 | ||
IE | 25.02.2018 | ||
LU | 25.02.2018 | ||
BE | 28.02.2018 | ||
CH | 28.02.2018 | ||
LI | 28.02.2018 | ||
BG | 13.03.2018 | ||
GR | 14.03.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | CY | 13.12.2017 | |
CZ | 13.12.2017 | ||
DK | 13.12.2017 | ||
EE | 13.12.2017 | ||
FI | 13.12.2017 | ||
MC | 13.12.2017 | ||
NL | 13.12.2017 | ||
RO | 13.12.2017 | ||
SI | 13.12.2017 | ||
SK | 13.12.2017 | ||
IE | 25.02.2018 | ||
LU | 25.02.2018 | ||
BE | 28.02.2018 | ||
CH | 28.02.2018 | ||
LI | 28.02.2018 | ||
BG | 13.03.2018 | ||
GR | 14.03.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | CY | 13.12.2017 | |
CZ | 13.12.2017 | ||
DK | 13.12.2017 | ||
EE | 13.12.2017 | ||
FI | 13.12.2017 | ||
MC | 13.12.2017 | ||
NL | 13.12.2017 | ||
RO | 13.12.2017 | ||
SK | 13.12.2017 | ||
IE | 25.02.2018 | ||
LU | 25.02.2018 | ||
CH | 28.02.2018 | ||
LI | 28.02.2018 | ||
BG | 13.03.2018 | ||
GR | 14.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | CY | 13.12.2017 | |
CZ | 13.12.2017 | ||
DK | 13.12.2017 | ||
EE | 13.12.2017 | ||
FI | 13.12.2017 | ||
MC | 13.12.2017 | ||
NL | 13.12.2017 | ||
RO | 13.12.2017 | ||
SK | 13.12.2017 | ||
LU | 25.02.2018 | ||
CH | 28.02.2018 | ||
LI | 28.02.2018 | ||
BG | 13.03.2018 | ||
GR | 14.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | CY | 13.12.2017 | |
CZ | 13.12.2017 | ||
DK | 13.12.2017 | ||
EE | 13.12.2017 | ||
FI | 13.12.2017 | ||
MC | 13.12.2017 | ||
NL | 13.12.2017 | ||
RO | 13.12.2017 | ||
SK | 13.12.2017 | ||
CH | 28.02.2018 | ||
LI | 28.02.2018 | ||
BG | 13.03.2018 | ||
GR | 14.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/44] | CY | 13.12.2017 | |
CZ | 13.12.2017 | ||
EE | 13.12.2017 | ||
FI | 13.12.2017 | ||
MC | 13.12.2017 | ||
NL | 13.12.2017 | ||
RO | 13.12.2017 | ||
SK | 13.12.2017 | ||
BG | 13.03.2018 | ||
GR | 14.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/42] | CY | 13.12.2017 | |
CZ | 13.12.2017 | ||
EE | 13.12.2017 | ||
FI | 13.12.2017 | ||
NL | 13.12.2017 | ||
RO | 13.12.2017 | ||
SK | 13.12.2017 | ||
BG | 13.03.2018 | ||
GR | 14.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | CY | 13.12.2017 | |
CZ | 13.12.2017 | ||
EE | 13.12.2017 | ||
FI | 13.12.2017 | ||
NL | 13.12.2017 | ||
SK | 13.12.2017 | ||
BG | 13.03.2018 | ||
GR | 14.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/34] | FI | 13.12.2017 | |
NL | 13.12.2017 | ||
BG | 13.03.2018 | ||
GR | 14.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/26] | FI | 13.12.2017 | |
BG | 13.03.2018 | ||
GR | 14.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/22] | FI | 13.12.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]US5284120 (FUKUSHIMA SUSUMU [JP], et al) [Y] 1-6,8-11 * the whole document * [A] 7; | [XY]DE19846601 (WALBRO CORP [US]) [X] 4-6,8-10 * column 1 - column 5; figures 2-4 * [Y] 1-6,8-11; | [XA]US6178997 (ADAMS PAUL R [US], et al) [X] 4-6,8-10 * column 1 - column 2; figures 1,2A,2B *[A] 7; | [YA]EP1091197 (AVL LIST GMBH [AT]) [Y] 1-6,8-11 * column 6 - column 7; figure 2 * [A] 7 | by applicant | US5284120 | DE19846601 | US6178997 | EP1091197 |